ANDERSON v. US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, et al.
Petitioner: VASKA CLAUDE ANDERSON
Respondent: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Intervenor: KELLY MCDOUGALD and DEJONEE ANDERSON
Case Number: 4:2020cv00306
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 14 Mail Returned - #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by KELLY MCDOUGALD, DEJONEE ANDERSON, #12 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus filed by US IMMIGRATION AND C sent to petitioner returned as Not at this Facility (tlf).
January 8, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by KELLY MCDOUGALD, DEJONEE ANDERSON, #12 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus filed by US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus filed by US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 1-8-21. (jdl)
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT filed by AMELIA G HELMICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form I-205, Warrant of Removal). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
January 4, 2021 Filing 11 Mail sent to petitioner returned as undeliverable. (tlf)
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene filed by KELLY MCDOUGALD and DEJONEE ANDERSON. Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned - #8 Order for Response to Motion, sent to Vaska Claude Anderson returned as undeliverable. (sbd)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Response to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus filed by US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 12-15-20. (jdl)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT filed by AMELIA G HELMICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Removal Order dated 10-14-2004, #2 Exhibit B - Form I-871, Notice of Intent/Decision to Reinstate Prior Order, #3 Exhibit C - SDFL Conviction Documents, #4 Exhibit D - Petitioner's Detention History, #5 Exhibit E - Order granting compassionate release). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HELMICK, AMELIA)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by VASKA CLAUDE ANDERSON. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 12-9-20. (jdl)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (esl)
December 9, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND and US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES. (esl)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00284. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
December 9, 2020 Case transferred to District of Middle District of Georgia, Columbus Division. Original file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent. (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 12/9/2020.]
December 9, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Vaska Claude Anderson re #2 Order. (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 12/9/2020.]
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 NINTH AMENDMENT IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/2020. (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 12/9/2020.]
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this action to the United States District court for the Middle District of Georgia, Columbus Division and to close the pending case in this Court. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/8/2020. (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 12/9/2020.]
December 8, 2020 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller for IFP and Frivolity Review. (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 12/9/2020.]
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Vaska Claude Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 12/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDERSON v. US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: AMELIA G HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VASKA CLAUDE ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: KELLY MCDOUGALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: DEJONEE ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?