GLOVER v. BLACK et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL A GLOVER
Defendant: Warden REAGAN BLACK, Deputy Warden L BURKS, Ms. BYRD, Ms. SINGLETON and Deputy Warden CONNIE MOODY
Case Number: 4:2021cv00003
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #14 Letter ); Pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, every pleading, written motion and other papers must be signed by a party personally if the party is unrepresented. You must refile your signed document within 21 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal of your case by the Court (tlf).
March 5, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Plaintiff regarding truthfulness of allegations re #8 Recast Complaint/Petition (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf).
March 4, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from Plaintiff as to #8 Recast Complaint/Petition (Attachments: #1 Synopsis of Steps Taken by Plaintiff, #2 Envelope) (tlf).
February 23, 2021 Filing 12 Letter from plaintiff to Commissioner Ward (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf).
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from plaintiff to Judge Hyles re #8 Recast Complaint/Petition (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf).
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MICHAEL A GLOVER. Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by MICHAEL A GLOVER. Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 RECAST #1 Complaint against REAGAN BLACK, L BURKS, BYRD, SINGLETON, CONNIE MOODY by MICHAEL A GLOVER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Prison Documents, #3 Envelope) (tlf).
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from plaintff regarding prison conditions re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf).
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Plaintiff regarding notary services (Attachments: #1 Witness Statements, #2 Envelope) (tlf).
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned - #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge sent to plaintiff returned as undeliverable. Corrected GDC and re-mailed (tlf).
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by MICHAEL A GLOVER. Motion referred referred to US Magistrate Judge STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MICHAEL A. GLOVER. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement). Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by MICHAEL A GLOVER against REAGAN BLACK, L BURKS, BYRD, SINGLETON (Attachments: #1 Grievances and Statements, #2 Envelope) (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLOVER v. BLACK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL A GLOVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden REAGAN BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden L BURKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. BYRD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden CONNIE MOODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?