STARZETSKI et al v. SATA GMBH & CO KG et al
Plaintiff: JENNIFER STARZETSKI and JEVIN STARZETSKI
Defendant: DAN-AM COMPANY, SATA GMBH & CO. KG, FINISHMASTER, INC., FINISHMASTER INC, DANAM COMPANY and SATA GMBH & CO KG
Case Number: 4:2021cv00008
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by THOMAS J GALLIGAN (nop)
March 10, 2021 Filing 15 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by THOMAS J. GALLIGAN for DANAM COMPANY. Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3736854, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: FREDERICK N SAGER, Jr., Bar # 622070. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(GALLIGAN, THOMAS) Modified on 3/10/2021 (tlp) - for clarification
March 10, 2021 Notice of Deficiency as to #15 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice. Documents are to be converted into text-searchable PDF format before e-filing; therefore, in the future, please verify documents meet this requirement before filing. No need to refile #15 Petition. Thank you. (tlp)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ARND N VON WALDOW (nop)
February 23, 2021 Filing 13 Jurisdictional Statement by DANAM COMPANY (SAGER, FREDERICK)
February 23, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DANAM COMPANY (SAGER, FREDERICK)
February 22, 2021 Filing 11 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by DANAM COMPANY Attorney ARND VON WALDOW. Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3719110, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Fredercik N. Sager Jr. 622070. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(VON WALDOW, ARND) Modified on 2/23/2021 (tlp) - to clarify.
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by JOSHUA A ROMAN (nop)
February 20, 2021 Notice of Deficiency to Counsel B KOWALZYK. It appears the phone number in the CM/ECF database is not included on the pleadings - #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement or #9 Jurisdictional Statement. For future filings, please make sure all contact information is included on documents and up-to-date in CM/ECF. Thank you.(tlp)
February 20, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL JOSHUA A ROMAN - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled.(tlp)
February 20, 2021 Notice of Deficiency to Counsel F. SAGER JR and J ROMAN. Contact information on #7 Answer to Complaint appears to have an incomplete address. Please review future documents for complete and accurate contact information before filing. (tlp)
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 Jurisdictional Statement by FINISHMASTER INC (NORTH, RICHARD)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FINISHMASTER INC identifying Corporate Parent UNI-SELECT INC for FINISHMASTER INC. (NORTH, RICHARD)
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by DANAM COMPANY with Jury Demand.(SAGER, FREDERICK)Attorney FREDERICK N SAGER, Jr added to party DANAM COMPANY(pty:dft)
February 17, 2021 Notice of Deficiency to Counsel RICHARD B NORTH as to #6 Answer to Complaint. Please immediately review contact information in CM/ECF, specifically phone numbers, and update via PACER. Phone number(s) on pleading and in CM/ECF do not match. (tlp)
February 17, 2021 Notice of Deficiency as to Counsel RICHARD B NORTH and BRANDEE J KOWALZYK as to #6 Answer to Complaint filed by FINISHMASTER INC. Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement, and pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must also be filed. (tlp)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by FINISHMASTER INC with Jury Demand.(NORTH, RICHARD)Attorney RICHARD B NORTH, JR added to party FINISHMASTER INC(pty:dft)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by JEVIN STARZETSKI, JENNIFER STARZETSKI as to SATA GMBH & CO KG. (CRAWFORD, JASON)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEVIN STARZETSKI, JENNIFER STARZETSKI as to DANAM COMPANY. (CRAWFORD, JASON)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiffs as to FINISHMASTER INC. (CRAWFORD, JASON)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as ALL DEFENDANTS: SATA GMBH &CO KG, DANAM COMPANY, and FINISHMASTER INC (Attachments: #1 Summons - DANAM, #2 Summons - FINISHMASTER INC)(tlp)
January 19, 2021 Notice of Deficiency to Counsel JASON CRAWFORD as to #1 Complaint. Punctuation, such as periods and commas, was used in party names which is not permitted. Please see the STYLE GUIDE which is located on our website: https://www.gamd.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Also, the cause of action on the civil cover sheet and the complaint did not match. All corrections have been made and no action required. (tlp)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3682259, $402 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Air Regulator Product Description, #2 Exhibit B-Photo-SATA/Dan-Am filter with end cap, #3 Exhibit C-Photo-Damaged End Cap, #4 Exhibit D-Recall Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Summons-SATA GMBH & CO. KG, #7 Summons Summons-DAN-AM COMPANY, #8 Summons Summons-FINISHMASTER, INC.)(CRAWFORD, JASON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STARZETSKI et al v. SATA GMBH & CO KG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER STARZETSKI
Represented By: JASON L CRAWFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEVIN STARZETSKI
Represented By: JASON L CRAWFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAN-AM COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SATA GMBH & CO. KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FINISHMASTER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FINISHMASTER INC
Represented By: RICHARD B NORTH, JR
Represented By: BRANDEE J KOWALZYK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANAM COMPANY
Represented By: FREDERICK N SAGER, Jr.
Represented By: THOMAS J GALLIGAN
Represented By: ARND N VON WALDOW
Represented By: JOSHUA A ROMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SATA GMBH & CO KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?