WALKER v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: Anthony Walker
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Not Classified By Court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2021cv00054
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANTHONY WALKER as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (COMERFORD, IDA)
May 10, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Civil Process Clerk regarding improper service as to USA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(esl)
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANTHONY WALKER as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (COMERFORD, IDA)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ANTHONY WALKER (esl)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (esl)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (esl)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Walker filed by IDA COMERFORD.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(COMERFORD, IDA)
April 16, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ANTHONY WALKER); Other - Motion #4 appears to be a duplicate of Motion #2 , does not contain a case number and has not been revised to comply with Order #3 . MOTION MUST BE RE-FILED.(esl)
April 16, 2021 Filing Fee (IFP Denied) Paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3770681, $402 (COMERFORD, IDA)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to recast motion to proceed IFP. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4-15-21. (jdl)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Walker filed by IDA COMERFORD. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(COMERFORD, IDA)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by Anthony Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit UFD, #2 Exhibit AC DENIAL, #3 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(COMERFORD, IDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALKER v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Walker
Represented By: IDA COMERFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?