WRENN et al v. OUTBACK CARE GROUP LLC et al
Plaintiff: SHARAH TOLBERT, THOMAS WRENN, SIOVHAN SHORTER, SNAPPER UPSHAW and KARA STRICKLAND
Defendant: OUTBACK CARE GROUP LLC and KEN BLACKMON
Case Number: 4:2021cv00061
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE Notice of Substitute Service on Defendant Outback Care Group LLC by SIOVHAN SHORTER, Kara Strickland, SHARAH TOLBERT, SNAPPER UPSHAW, THOMAS WRENN (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Scott Declaration in Support of Notice of Substitute Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Scott Declaration)(FORREST, MICHAEL)
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 Consent to Join Action (FLSA). Kara Strickland added as Opt-In Plaintiff(s) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Form)(FORREST, MICHAEL)
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by SIOVHAN SHORTER, SHARAH TOLBERT, SNAPPER UPSHAW, THOMAS WRENN re 9 Order on Motion for Service by Publication,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc), #8 MOTION for Service by PublicationMOTION for Extension of Time to File. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Ga. Secretary of State Information, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Service Affidavits, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Proposed Notice of Publication, #4 Proposed Order Amended Proposed Order on Motion for Service by Publication)(FORREST, MICHAEL)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER deferring ruling on #8 Motion for Service by Publication. If Plaintiffs wish to pursue service by publication on Defendant Ken Blackmon, they shall supplement their motion with an affidavit that satisfies the statutory requirements of O.C.G.A. 9-11-4(f)(1)(A). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 06/11/2021 (CCL)
June 10, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Service by Publication by SIOVHAN SHORTER, SHARAH TOLBERT, SNAPPER UPSHAW, THOMAS WRENN filed by MICHAEL DAVID FORREST. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Service via Publication, #2 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Service via Publication, #3 Proposed Notice of Publication, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Service via Publication)(FORREST, MICHAEL). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File on 6/10/2021 (tlf).
June 10, 2021 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #8 Motion for Service by Publication; Motion included multiple reliefs yet only one was selected during the filing process. The CM/ECF procedures manual provides as follows: "Motions with Multiple Reliefs Requested. When a motion requests multiple or alternative reliefs, it is especially important to select multiple reliefs when filing. For instance, with a combined motion to dismiss and motion to strike, you must select both reliefs to dismiss' and 'to strike. You do this by clicking on each motion relief from the drop down menu. You cannot select only the motion to dismiss and then type in the text box and motion to strike. It is imperative that all relief categories are specifically selected. The Case Management/Electronic Case Filing system will then track each relief as a separate request for action. This helps the court ensure that all matters are properly addressed. Failure to comply with this requirement may result in a request for relief that is not tracked on the pending motion reports used in case management. " Corrected by case manager, no need to re-file (tlf).
May 28, 2021 Filing 7 Consent to Join Action (FLSA) (Scott, Justin)
May 28, 2021 Notice of Deficiency; No need to re-file; Related documents: #6 and #7 Consents to Join Action (FLSA); Exhibits were made a continuing part of the document and not properly "attached" nor identified in sufficient detail as required by the CM/ECF procedures manual. Please bear this in mind in the future as it may require re-filing if not properly filed (tlf).
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 Consent to Join Action (FLSA) (Scott, Justin)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE Filing of Consent to Join by SHARAH TOLBERT, THOMAS WRENN (Scott, Justin)
April 27, 2021 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #5 Notice (Other) filed by SHARAH TOLBERT, THOMAS WRENN; Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Civil Events, Other Filings, Other Documents, Consent to Join Action (FLSA). Filer should not select the current parties but add the person consenting as a plaintiff (tlf).
April 23, 2021 Notice of Deficiency to Counsel MICHAEL DAVID FORREST. Contact information, specifically the phone number, in the signature block of #4 Notice does not match the phone number in CM/ECF. Please immediately review and make changes via PACER. Thank you.(tlp)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE Filing of Consent to Join by SHARAH TOLBERT, THOMAS WRENN (Scott, Justin)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons issued as to OUTBACK CARE GROUP, LLC (tlf).
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons issued as to KEN BLACKMON (tlf).
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEN BLACKMON, OUTBACK CARE GROUP LLC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3775260, $402 filed by THOMAS WRENN, SHARAH TOLBERT (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Join - Wrenn, #3 Consent to Join - Tolbert, #4 Summons Proposed Summons to Outback Care Group LLC, #5 Summons Proposed Summons to Ken Blackmon)(Scott, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRENN et al v. OUTBACK CARE GROUP LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OUTBACK CARE GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN BLACKMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARAH TOLBERT
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID FORREST
Represented By: Justin M. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS WRENN
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID FORREST
Represented By: Justin M. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIOVHAN SHORTER
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID FORREST
Represented By: Justin M. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SNAPPER UPSHAW
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID FORREST
Represented By: Justin M. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARA STRICKLAND
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID FORREST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?