HENDERSON v. CHATTAHOOCHEE SLEEP CENTER LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: JEANNE M HENDERSON
Defendant: BRYANT HOUSTON, LETITIA HOUSTON, COLUMBUS SLEEP CLINIC, LLC and CHATTAHOOCHEE SLEEP CENTER LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00086
Filed: May 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Filing 10 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/30/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 7/19/2021. (esl)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHATTAHOOCHEE SLEEP CENTER LLC (MULLIN, C)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by CHATTAHOOCHEE SLEEP CENTER LLC, BRYANT HOUSTON, LETITIA HOUSTON with Jury Demand.(MULLIN, C)Attorney C MORRIS MULLIN added to party CHATTAHOOCHEE SLEEP CENTER LLC(pty:dft), Attorney C MORRIS MULLIN added to party BRYANT HOUSTON(pty:dft), Attorney C MORRIS MULLIN added to party LETITIA HOUSTON(pty:dft)
July 2, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEANNE M HENDERSON as to BRYANT HOUSTON. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEANNE M HENDERSON as to LETITIA HOUSTON. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEANNE M HENDERSON as to CHATTAHOOCHEE SLEEP CENTER LLC. (MARTIN, THOMAS) Modified on 7/6/2021 to edit docket text (vs).
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BRYANT HOUSTON. (esl)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LETITIA HOUSTON. (esl)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CHATTAHOOCHEE SLEEP CENTER LLC. (esl)
June 1, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by JEANNE M HENDERSON ); Other (Typo identified as to one defendant. Following conversation with counsel, the error has been corrected. No need to re-file.).(esl)
May 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3807734, $402 filed by JEANNE M HENDERSON (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 Summons CHATTAHOOCHEE SLEEP CENTER LLC, #3 Summons LETITIA HOUSTON, #4 Summons BRYANT HOUSTON)(MARTIN, THOMAS) Modified on 6/1/2021 (esl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HENDERSON v. CHATTAHOOCHEE SLEEP CENTER LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYANT HOUSTON
Represented By: C MORRIS MULLIN
Represented By: DAVID R HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LETITIA HOUSTON
Represented By: C MORRIS MULLIN
Represented By: DAVID R HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBUS SLEEP CLINIC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHATTAHOOCHEE SLEEP CENTER LLC
Represented By: C MORRIS MULLIN
Represented By: DAVID R HELMICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANNE M HENDERSON
Represented By: THOMAS FRANCIS MARTIN
Represented By: KIMBERLY N MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?