AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC et al v. ERICKSON et al
Plaintiff: ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC and AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC
Defendant: GH LOT HOLDINGS OF ATLANTA CORPORATION, GH LOT HOLDINGS OF SOUTH CAROLINA INC, GH LOT HOLDINGS INC, GRAYHAWK HOMES OF ATLANTA INC, GRAYHAWK HOMES OF SOUTH CAROLINA INC, DAVID B ERICKSON, TIGER CREEK DEVELOPMENT INC, CUSSETA ROAD LLC, SAGE DEVELOPMENT INC, ERICKSON INVESTMENTS INC, WINDSONG BONACRE LLC, GREY ROCK DEVELOPMENT LLC and CARROLLTON DEVELOPMENT LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00095
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Letter regarding Extension of Time re #31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (BUCHANAN, JERRY)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Clerk's granting of extension pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 as to #35 Letter and #31 MOTION TO DISMISS (tlf).
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JOHNATHON EARL SCHRONCE. (mdm) Modified on 8/2/2021 to edit date filed.(mdm)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by All Defendants Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3857256, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Robert T. Dumbacher - GA Bar No. 594903. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(SCHRONCE, JOHNATHON)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency; No need to re-file; Related document: #32 Letter ; Document was not converted into text-searchable PDF format. Please ensure that all future documents are text-searchable (tlf).
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 re: #32 Letter, #28 MOTION for Preliminary InjunctionMOTION for Hearing filed by AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC, ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC (tlf).
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Letter regarding Extension of Time re #28 MOTION for Preliminary InjunctionMOTION for Hearing (LOMAX, ROBERT)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CARROLLTON DEVELOPMENT LLC, CUSSETA ROAD LLC, DAVID B ERICKSON, ERICKSON INVESTMENTS INC, GH LOT HOLDINGS INC, GH LOT HOLDINGS OF ATLANTA CORPORATION, GH LOT HOLDINGS OF SOUTH CAROLINA INC, GREY ROCK DEVELOPMENT LLC, SAGE DEVELOPMENT INC, TIGER CREEK DEVELOPMENT INC, WINDSONG BONACRE LLC filed by ROBERT T QUACKENBOSS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Erickson in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 1 - December 20, 2020 Letter from D. Erickson to M. Coleman, #4 Exhibit 2 - December 30, 2020 Letter from D. Erickson to M. Coleman, #5 Exhibit 3 - April 8, 2021 Letter from J. Kramer to D. Erickson, #6 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Johnathon Schronce . Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(tlf)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ROBERT R LOMAX on behalf of All Defendants Attorney ROBERT R LOMAX added to party CARROLLTON DEVELOPMENT LLC(pty:dft), Attorney ROBERT R LOMAX added to party CUSSETA ROAD LLC(pty:dft), Attorney ROBERT R LOMAX added to party DAVID B ERICKSON(pty:dft), Attorney ROBERT R LOMAX added to party ERICKSON INVESTMENTS INC(pty:dft), Attorney ROBERT R LOMAX added to party GH LOT HOLDINGS INC(pty:dft), Attorney ROBERT R LOMAX added to party GH LOT HOLDINGS OF ATLANTA CORPORATION(pty:dft), Attorney ROBERT R LOMAX added to party GH LOT HOLDINGS OF SOUTH CAROLINA INC(pty:dft), Attorney ROBERT R LOMAX added to party GREY ROCK DEVELOPMENT LLC(pty:dft), Attorney ROBERT R LOMAX added to party SAGE DEVELOPMENT INC(pty:dft), Attorney ROBERT R LOMAX added to party TIGER CREEK DEVELOPMENT INC(pty:dft), Attorney ROBERT R LOMAX added to party WINDSONG BONACRE LLC(pty:dft)(LOMAX, ROBERT)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #29 Notice of Lis Pendens filed by AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC, ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC; Document was not converted into a text-searchable PDF format. Please ensure all future documents are text-searchable. No need to re-file (tlf).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC, ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC(BUCHANAN, JERRY)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction(, ), MOTION for Hearing by AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC, ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC filed by JERRY A BUCHANAN. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Lee Darnold, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BUCHANAN, JERRY)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CARROLLTON DEVELOPMENT LLC, CUSSETA ROAD LLC, DAVID B ERICKSON, ERICKSON INVESTMENTS INC, GH LOT HOLDINGS INC, GH LOT HOLDINGS OF ATLANTA CORPORATION, GH LOT HOLDINGS OF SOUTH CAROLINA INC, GREY ROCK DEVELOPMENT LLC, SAGE DEVELOPMENT INC, TIGER CREEK DEVELOPMENT INC, WINDSONG BONACRE LLC (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION of Extension of Time and Acknowledgment of Service re #15 Amended Complaint/Petition,,, by CARROLLTON DEVELOPMENT LLC, CUSSETA ROAD LLC, DAVID B ERICKSON, ERICKSON INVESTMENTS INC, GH LOT HOLDINGS INC, GH LOT HOLDINGS OF ATLANTA CORPORATION, GH LOT HOLDINGS OF SOUTH CAROLINA INC, GREY ROCK DEVELOPMENT LLC, SAGE DEVELOPMENT INC, TIGER CREEK DEVELOPMENT INC, WINDSONG BONACRE LLC (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC, ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC(BUCHANAN, JERRY)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC, ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC(BUCHANAN, JERRY)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC, ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC(BUCHANAN, JERRY)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Summons Issued as to CARROLLTON DEVELOPMENT LLC. (mdm)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Summons Issued as to GREY ROCK DEVELOPMENT LLC. (mdm)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Summons Issued as to WINDSONG BONACRE LLC. (mdm)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Summons Issued as to ERICKSON INVESTMENTS INC. (mdm)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Summons Issued as to SAGE DEVELOPMENT INC. (mdm)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Summons Issued as to CUSSETA ROAD LLC. (mdm)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Summons Issued as to TIGER CREEK DEVELOPMENT INC. (mdm)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED #1 Complaint,, against All Defendants by AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC, ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Asset Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit Land Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit Trademark Assignment Agreement, #4 Exhibit Copyright Assignment Agreement, #5 Exhibit Erickson Consulting Agreement, #6 Exhibit Erickson Employment Agreement, #7 Exhibit Sycamore Plans, #8 Exhibit Willow Plans, #9 Summons Summons-Carrollton Development, #10 Summons Summons-Cusseta Road LLC, #11 Summons Summons-Erickson Investments Inc, #12 Summons Summons-Grey Rock Development LLC, #13 Summons Summons-Sage Development Inc, #14 Summons Summons-Tiger Creek Development, #15 Summons Summons-Winsong Bonacre LLC)(BUCHANAN, JERRY)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC, ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acceptance of Service)(BUCHANAN, JERRY)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ROBERT T DUMBACHER on behalf of All Defendants Attorney ROBERT T DUMBACHER added to party DAVID B ERICKSON(pty:dft), Attorney ROBERT T DUMBACHER added to party GH LOT HOLDINGS INC(pty:dft), Attorney ROBERT T DUMBACHER added to party GH LOT HOLDINGS OF ATLANTA CORPORATION(pty:dft), Attorney ROBERT T DUMBACHER added to party GH LOT HOLDINGS OF SOUTH CAROLINA INC(pty:dft)(DUMBACHER, ROBERT)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #12 Notice of Attorney Appearance, filed by DAVID B ERICKSON, GH LOT HOLDINGS OF SOUTH CAROLINA INC, GH LOT HOLDINGS OF ATLANTA CORPORATION, GH LOT HOLDINGS INC ); Notice to Counsel: Robert Quackenboss. Your email address in CM/ECF does not match the e mail upon the pleading. Please update your email address via PACER (tlf).
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert T. Quackenboss on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Robert T. Quackenboss added to party DAVID B ERICKSON(pty:dft), Attorney Robert T. Quackenboss added to party GH LOT HOLDINGS INC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert T. Quackenboss added to party GH LOT HOLDINGS OF ATLANTA CORPORATION(pty:dft), Attorney Robert T. Quackenboss added to party GH LOT HOLDINGS OF SOUTH CAROLINA INC(pty:dft)(Quackenboss, Robert)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JACOB A KRAMER. (mdm)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JACOB A KRAMER. (mdm)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC, ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3819651, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Jerry A. Buchanan, Ga. Bar No. 092200. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (D. Md.))(KRAMER, JACOB)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC, ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # BGAMDC-3819438, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Jerry A. Buchanan, Ga. Bar No. 092200. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from D. Md.)(KRAMER, JACOB)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons issued as to GH LOT HOLDINGS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC. (tlf).
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons issued as to GH LOT HOLDINGS OF ATLANTA CORPORATION (tlf).
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons issued as to GH LOT HOLDINGS, INC. (tlf).
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons issued as to DAVID B. ERICKSON (tlf).
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC identifying Corporate Parent ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC for ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC. (BUCHANAN, JERRY)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Southern Homes Holdings LLC identifying Corporate Parent AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC for American Southern Homes Holdings LLC. (BUCHANAN, JERRY)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3819091, $402 filed by American Southern Homes Holdings LLC, ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Asset Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit Land Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit Trademark Assignment Agreement, #4 Exhibit Copyright Assignment Agreement, #5 Exhibit Erickson Consulting Agreement, #6 Exhibit Erickson Employment Agreement, #7 Exhibit Sycamore Plans, #8 Exhibit Willow Plans, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons Summons - Erickson, #11 Summons Summons = GHAtlantaCorporation, #12 Summons Summons-GHLotHoldings, #13 Summons Summons - GHSouthCarolina)(BUCHANAN, JERRY)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Jacob A. Kramer. Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing may be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements (tlf).
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC, ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. No need to re-file corrected by case manager (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC et al v. ERICKSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GH LOT HOLDINGS OF ATLANTA CORPORATION
Represented By: ROBERT T QUACKENBOSS
Represented By: JOHNATHON EARL SCHRONCE
Represented By: ROBERT T DUMBACHER
Represented By: ROBERT R LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GH LOT HOLDINGS OF SOUTH CAROLINA INC
Represented By: ROBERT T QUACKENBOSS
Represented By: JOHNATHON EARL SCHRONCE
Represented By: ROBERT T DUMBACHER
Represented By: ROBERT R LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GH LOT HOLDINGS INC
Represented By: ROBERT T QUACKENBOSS
Represented By: JOHNATHON EARL SCHRONCE
Represented By: ROBERT T DUMBACHER
Represented By: ROBERT R LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAYHAWK HOMES OF ATLANTA INC
Represented By: ROBERT T QUACKENBOSS
Represented By: JOHNATHON EARL SCHRONCE
Represented By: ROBERT T DUMBACHER
Represented By: ROBERT R LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAYHAWK HOMES OF SOUTH CAROLINA INC
Represented By: ROBERT T QUACKENBOSS
Represented By: JOHNATHON EARL SCHRONCE
Represented By: ROBERT T DUMBACHER
Represented By: ROBERT R LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID B ERICKSON
Represented By: ROBERT T QUACKENBOSS
Represented By: JOHNATHON EARL SCHRONCE
Represented By: ROBERT T DUMBACHER
Represented By: ROBERT R LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIGER CREEK DEVELOPMENT INC
Represented By: ROBERT T QUACKENBOSS
Represented By: JOHNATHON EARL SCHRONCE
Represented By: ROBERT T DUMBACHER
Represented By: ROBERT R LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUSSETA ROAD LLC
Represented By: ROBERT T QUACKENBOSS
Represented By: JOHNATHON EARL SCHRONCE
Represented By: ROBERT T DUMBACHER
Represented By: ROBERT R LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAGE DEVELOPMENT INC
Represented By: ROBERT T QUACKENBOSS
Represented By: JOHNATHON EARL SCHRONCE
Represented By: ROBERT T DUMBACHER
Represented By: ROBERT R LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERICKSON INVESTMENTS INC
Represented By: ROBERT T QUACKENBOSS
Represented By: JOHNATHON EARL SCHRONCE
Represented By: ROBERT T DUMBACHER
Represented By: ROBERT R LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINDSONG BONACRE LLC
Represented By: ROBERT T QUACKENBOSS
Represented By: JOHNATHON EARL SCHRONCE
Represented By: ROBERT T DUMBACHER
Represented By: ROBERT R LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREY ROCK DEVELOPMENT LLC
Represented By: ROBERT T QUACKENBOSS
Represented By: JOHNATHON EARL SCHRONCE
Represented By: ROBERT T DUMBACHER
Represented By: ROBERT R LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARROLLTON DEVELOPMENT LLC
Represented By: ROBERT T QUACKENBOSS
Represented By: JOHNATHON EARL SCHRONCE
Represented By: ROBERT T DUMBACHER
Represented By: ROBERT R LOMAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASH-GRAYHAWK LLC
Represented By: JERRY A BUCHANAN
Represented By: JACOB A KRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOMES HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: JERRY A BUCHANAN
Represented By: JACOB A KRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?