H AND L FARMS LLC et al v. SILICON RANCH CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: H AND L FARMS LLC, SHAUN HARRIS and AMIE HARRIS
Defendant: SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC and WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00134
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 319 NOTICE of Filing Supersedeas Bond by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, as Principal, re 316 Order on Motion to Stay. Original bond papers will be maintained in an envelope in the vault safe in the clerk's office.(esl)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 318 INJUNCTION ORDER - Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 6/5/2023. (esl)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 317 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #311 Motion for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #291 MOTION for Attorney Fees. The response is due by June 23, 2023. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 06/05/2023 (CCL)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 316 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #312 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment. The Court approves the supersedeas bond submitted by Defendants, and enforcement of the judgment is STAYED pursuant to the conditions of that bond. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 06/05/2023 (CCL) Modified on 6/5/2023 to highlight stayed. (esl).
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 315 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by HARRY ZACK RIPPEON on behalf of IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC(RIPPEON, HARRY)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 314 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by JEANNE MARIE HARRISON on behalf of IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC(HARRISON, JEANNE)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 313 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #311 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #291 MOTION for Attorney Fees (PHILYAW, DANIEL)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 312 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay Expedited Motion for Approval of Supersedeas Bond and to Stay Execution by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION filed by CHARLES E ROGERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Appeal Bond)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 311 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #291 MOTION for Attorney Fees by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION filed by ALYCEN A MOSS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MOSS, ALYCEN)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 310 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04-12-2023, before Judge Clay D. Land. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Drammeh. Volume Number: II. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (Drammeh, Joan)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 309 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04-11-2023, before Judge Clay D. Land. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Drammeh. Volume Number: I. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (Drammeh, Joan)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 308 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04-10-2023, before Judge Clay D. Land. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Drammeh. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (Drammeh, Joan)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by SILICON RANCH CORPORATION filed by ALYCEN A MOSS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(MOSS, ALYCEN)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC filed by CHARLES E ROGERS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Infrastructure and Energy Alternatives, Inc. and IEA Constructors, LLC's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the Alternative, a New Trial)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 305 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ANDREW T BAYMAN on behalf of SILICON RANCH CORPORATION Attorney ANDREW T BAYMAN added to party SILICON RANCH CORPORATION(pty:dft)(BAYMAN, ANDREW)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 304 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MICHAEL BRIAN TERRY on behalf of H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS Attorney MICHAEL BRIAN TERRY added to party H AND L FARMS LLC(pty:pla), Attorney MICHAEL BRIAN TERRY added to party AMIE HARRIS(pty:pla), Attorney MICHAEL BRIAN TERRY added to party SHAUN HARRIS(pty:pla)(TERRY, MICHAEL)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 303 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by FRANK M LOWREY, IV on behalf of H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS Attorney FRANK M LOWREY, IV added to party H AND L FARMS LLC(pty:pla), Attorney FRANK M LOWREY, IV added to party AMIE HARRIS(pty:pla), Attorney FRANK M LOWREY, IV added to party SHAUN HARRIS(pty:pla)(LOWREY, FRANK)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 302 NOTICE Notice Of Filing Exhibit 4 to Plaintiffs Submissions Regarding Injunction Order by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #301 Notice (Other),, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 4 - 2023-05-04 to 5-25 emails re confer about injunction order)(BUTLER, JAMES)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 301 NOTICE Submission of Plaintiff's regarding Injunction Order by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Plaintiffs FINAL Revised draft proposed INJUNCTION ORDER (5-30-23), #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - 2023-05-23 - Plaintiffs REVISED proposed Injunction Order, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Defendants 5-19-23 Response to Plaintiffs Initial proposed INJUNCTION ORDER dated 5-5-23 [Redline], #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Second Memorandum Re Compliance)(BUTLER, JAMES)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 300 NOTICE Submission of Defendants Regarding Injunction Order by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Proposed Injunction Order)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4/27/23 Trial Transcript Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 4/20/23 Trial Transcript Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 4/14/23 Trial Transcript Excerpts)(BUTLER, JAMES)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR.(BUTLER, JAMES)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER denying #294 IEA Defendants' Motion for unsecured Stay - Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 5/25/2023 (esl)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 296 REPLY to Response filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC re #294 MOTION to Stay Extend Automatic Stay of Execution Without a Bond Pending Resolution of Post-Trial Motions (ROGERS, CHARLES)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 295 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #294 MOTION to Stay Extend Automatic Stay of Execution Without a Bond Pending Resolution of Post-Trial Motions (BUTLER, JAMES)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MOTION to Stay Extend Automatic Stay of Execution Without a Bond Pending Resolution of Post-Trial Motions by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC filed by CHARLES E ROGERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Paul DiMarco, #2 Exhibit 1 - MasTec, Inc. 2022 Form 10-K)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 293 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting in part and denying in part #292 Motion for Leave to File 40-Page consolidated brief. In the Court's view, IEA Inc. and IEAC are similarly aligned on most issues but have different interests on a few. The Court thus finds that a 40-page brief or two separate 20-page briefs are unwarranted for IEA Inc. and IEAC's post-trial motion for judgment as a matter of law. Counsel should be able to communicate the necessary information effectively and concisely in 30 pages. The Court thus grants IEA Inc. and IEAC leave to file a consolidated 30-page brief in support of their forthcoming motion. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 05/23/2023 (CCL)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MOTION for Leave to File Single, Consolidated Memorandum of Law in Support of their Respective Post-Trial Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC filed by CHARLES E ROGERS.(ROGERS, CHARLES)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MOTION for Attorney Fees by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Damages Under 9-11-68e, #2 Appendix To Plaintiffs Motion for Damages Under 9-11-68e, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Amie Harris, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Caroline Schley, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Cooper Knowles, #6 Affidavit Affidavit of Dan Philyaw, #7 Affidavit Affidavit of Fred Overby, #8 Affidavit Affidavit of James E Butler Jr, #9 Affidavit Affidavit of Kim McCallister, #10 Affidavit Affidavit of Nick Giles, #11 Affidavit Affidavit of Sarah Andrews, #12 Affidavit Affidavit of Shaun Harris, #13 Affidavit Affidavit of Chase Gibson, #14 Exhibit PX 105A Solar Ground Lease, #15 Exhibit PX 253 6/3/21 Civil Construction Plans, #16 Exhibit PX 254 Joe Broom Linked In Page, #17 Exhibit PX 287 4/21/21 Parkman to Butler letter, #18 Exhibit PX 588 - 4/24/21 SRC site photograph, #19 Exhibit PX 625 Long Engineering Memo and email, #20 Exhibit PX 681- 7/8/22 ECF notification, #21 Exhibit PX 682 5/19/22 Butler to Shelton email, #22 Exhibit PX 683 1/13/23 Moss to Butler email, #23 Exhibit PX 684 2/27/23 Philyaw to Moss email)(BUTLER, JAMES)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 290 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying #289 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. As the Court stated in the 16/26 Order, page limit extension requests "generally reflect a failure to focus upon the relevant issues in a concise and thoughtful manner," so "extensions will only be granted in exceptional cases." 16/26 Order 9, ECF No. 17. The brief for which Plaintiffs seek extra pages is not an exceptional case. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 05/15/2023 (CCL)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 289 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' 9-11-68(e) Motion for Damages by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR.(BUTLER, JAMES)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER admonishing Matthew S. Effland, in-house counsel for IEA and IEAC, for disobeying the Courts sequestration order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 5/11/2023 (tlf).
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 287 NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order dated April 28, 2023 by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC re #274 Order for Response (ROGERS, CHARLES)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 286 JUDGMENT (esl)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER - Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 5/3/2023. (esl)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 284 NOTICE of Election Regarding Imputation of Liability by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS (BUTLER, JAMES)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Court's Exhibit #1 - Jury Notes/Questions(esl)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 280 COURT'S INSTRUCTIONS TO THE JURY - Phase I (Attachments: #1 Phase II)(esl)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER for Response. The parties shall submit a proposed injunction by May 26, 2023. Plaintiffs' brief in support of the claim for attorneys' fees under OCGA 9-11-68(e) is also due by May 26, 2023. Please see order for other deadlines. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 05/01/2023. (CCL)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Jury Trial (Day 14) Jury verdict reached in Phase I and II held on 4/28/2023. The Court will likely enter the Judgment. Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh. (glg)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 278 JURY VERDICT for Phase II.(glg)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 277 Jury Verdict Phase II (Un-redacted).(glg)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 276 JURY VERDICT Phase I redacted. (glg)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Jury Verdict Phase I(Un-redacted).(glg)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER for Response by Infrastructure and Energy Alternatives, Inc. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 04/28/2023. (CCL)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 282 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Jury Trial (day 13) held on 4/27/2023 Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh. (glg)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Jury Trial (day 12) held on 4/26/2023 Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh. (glg)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Jury Trial (Day 11) held on 4/25/2023. Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh. (glg)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 271 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Jury Trial (Day 10) held on 4/24/2023 Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh. (glg)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Jury Trial (Day 9) held on 4/21/2023 Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh. (glg)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 270 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Jury Trial (Day 8) held on 4/20/2023 Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh. (glg)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 268 TRIAL BRIEF by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS(BUTLER, JAMES)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 267 TRIAL BRIEF by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC(ROGERS, CHARLES)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 266 TRIAL BRIEF by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC(BAILEY, MELISSA)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MOTION Defendant Westwood's Motion for Directed Verdict by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC filed by MELISSA BAILEY.(BAILEY, MELISSA)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Jury Trial (day 7) held on 4/19/2023 Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh. (glg)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Jury Trial (Day 6) held on 4/18/2023 Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh. (glg)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER for trial briefs, due by April 20, 2023 at 5:00 p.m. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 04/18/2023. (CCL)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Trial Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Jury Trial (Day 5) held on 4/17/2023. Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh. (esl) (Main Document 261 replaced on 4/18/2023) (esl). Modified on 4/18/2023 to correct time in court (esl).
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Jury Trial (Day 4) held on 4/14/2023. On page two of the minute entry at 12:58 there is a typo, Exhibit P479.64 is INCORRECTLY titled exhibit 497.64. Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh. (glg) Modified on 4/18/2023-noted typo on page two of the minute entry at 12:58 there is a typo Exhibit P479.64 is INCORRECTLY titled exhibit 497.64 (glg).
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Jury Trial (day 3) held on 4/13/2023 Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh. (glg)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Jury Trial (day 2) held on 4/12/2023 Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh. (glg)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Jury Selection and Jury Trial (day 1) held on 4/11/2023. Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh. (glg)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER memorializing and clarifying the Court's April 10, 2023 ruling on #251 Motion in Limine. In addition, the Court terminates #247 Motion in Limine and #249 Motion in Limine; the Court ruled on those motions during the April 10, 2023 telephone hearing. Please see transcript for details. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 04/11/2023 (CCL)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 256 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Status Conference held on 4/10/2023. The Court made several rulings during this hearing. The Court discussed Jury selection and a normal trial day for this trial. See the official transcript for more information. Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh. (glg)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 254 By Order of Judge Land, the Courtroom deputy clerk provides the Parties with the Jury seating chart for Voir Dire. Please note some Jurors listed may not be present.(glg)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 253 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER In order to advise the jury of the nature of this case during voir dire, the Court intends to read the attached exhibit. The parties should review this exhibit and inform the Court of any inaccuracies at our 2:00 P.M. conference today. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 04/10/2023. (CCL)
April 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Proposed Jury Instructions/Requests to Charge by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS(BUTLER, JAMES)
April 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Status Conference set for 4/10/2023 02:00 PM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. NOTICE OF SETTING hearing. Hearing will occur via VIDEOCONFERENCE. Counsel will receive connection information by separate email. Interested parties may obtain dial information by emailing Columbus.ecf@gamd.uscourts.gov. (glg)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MOTION in Limine regarding Defs Silicon Ranch Corporation, SR Lumpkin, IEA, and IEA Contructors' Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs Newly Raised Clean Water Act claim, Georgia Water Quality Control Act claim, and Statutory Employer-Imputed Liability claim by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC filed by ALYCEN A MOSS.(MOSS, ALYCEN)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 250 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTIFICATION OF AVAILABILITY OF JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES. If you have already entered a CERTIFICATION RE: JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES, it is not necessary to enter another Certification. If you have not entered a CERTIFICATION RE: JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES, you must do so in order to obtain access. (Hughes, Cassidy)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Counsel for WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC hereby certifies that the juror information forms and the information obtained therefrom are privileged and shall be kept confidential and not shared with anyone other than his or her client or other members of his or her law firm or Federal Defender organization without written consent of the United States District Court. This information shall be used only for selecting the jury. Further, counsel certifies in accordance with U.S. District Court, Middle District of Georgia, Local Rule 48, that, immediately after trial, he or she will destroy all copies of completed juror information forms and any other documents containing information obtained from the completed form and shall not use juror information for any purpose(BAILEY, MELISSA)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Counsel for H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS hereby certifies that the juror information forms and the information obtained therefrom are privileged and shall be kept confidential and not shared with anyone other than his or her client or other members of his or her law firm or Federal Defender organization without written consent of the United States District Court. This information shall be used only for selecting the jury. Further, counsel certifies in accordance with U.S. District Court, Middle District of Georgia, Local Rule 48, that, immediately after trial, he or she will destroy all copies of completed juror information forms and any other documents containing information obtained from the completed form and shall not use juror information for any purpose(BUTLER, JAMES)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): Certification re: Jury Questionnaires - COUNSEL DOES NOT NEED TO FILE ANOTHER CERTIFICATE. ALL ATTORNEYS WHO PREVIOUSLY FILED ONE NOW HAVE ACCESS TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL QUESTIONNAIRES FILED TODAY (4/7/2023). (esl)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MOTION in Limine regarding Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Silicon Ranch & IEA Untimely Produced Documents and Trial Exhibits and Motion for Sanctions by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2023-04-05 Email from Stearns to All Counsel (sending newly produced docs, #2 Exhibit 2021-11-22 SR Lumpkin's Responses to Plaintiff's 1st RPDs-excerpts, #3 Exhibit 2021-11-22 IEACs RPD Responses to Plaintiffs - excerpt, #4 Exhibit 2023-01-13 Email Between All Counsel (exchanging exhibits, #5 Exhibit 2023-01-27 Harris Pretrial Conference Transcript-excerpts)(BUTLER, JAMES)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 248 This is a text only entry; no document issued.ORDER The Court finds it advisable to hold a zoom conference on Monday, April 10, 2023, beginning at 2:00 P.M. to tie up any loose ends before the trial begins on April 11, 2023. Information for connecting to the zoom conference will be forthcoming. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on April 6, 2023. (CDL)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MOTION in Limine regarding Defendant Westwood Professional Services, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude IEA's and SRC's Newly Produced Evidence by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC filed by MELISSA BAILEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Exhibit A - Email)(BAILEY, MELISSA)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 246 DEPOSITION of Craig Zeller taken on 4/11/22 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #242 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #222 Pretrial Order,.(BUTLER, JAMES)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 245 DEPOSITION of Austin Fednander taken on 5/24/22 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #242 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #222 Pretrial Order,.(BUTLER, JAMES)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 244 DEPOSITION of John Britt taken on 9/1/22 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #242 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #222 Pretrial Order,.(BUTLER, JAMES)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 243 This is a text only entry; no document issued.ORDER Counsel for Plaintiff has emailed the Court's Courtroom Deputy Clerk inquiring as to how to get a matter before the Court. In his email inquiry, counsel describes what he seeks--a ruling by the Court that he may use the depositions at trial of certain witnesses who are more than 100 miles from the Court. Certain Defendants responded to the request with their own email objecting to the request based upon the Court's stated preference at the pretrial conference for witnesses to testify live if they are available. Preliminarily, the Court advises counsel that it tries to follow the rules. Those rules provide that "a request for a court order must be made by motion." And the motion must generally be in writing, state with particularity the grounds supporting the request, and state the relief sought. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7(b). Making rulings in response to email inquiries to the courtroom deputy clerk is not authorized by the Rules. To the extent that any party decides to file a motion on this subject, they should understand that the Court will follow the rules. Those rules address whether a deposition can be used if the witness is more than 100 miles from the place of hearing. Fed.R.Civ.P 32(a)(4)(B). To the extent that any statement by the Court during the pretrial conference expressing a preference for in-court live testimony over deposition testimony conflicts with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure shall apply. The Court's consistent admonition to counsel through the years has been that it generally will not permit the use of deposition testimony by agreement of counsel if the witness is available (which has assumed that the witness was within the subpoena power of the court), which is consistent with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. That admonition, however, obviously does not apply when it would conflict with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or the Federal Rules of Evidence. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on April 6, 2023. (CDL)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Certificate of Need to File Discovery Depositions by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #222 Pretrial Order,.(BUTLER, JAMES)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Counsel for SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC hereby certifies that the juror information forms and the information obtained therefrom are privileged and shall be kept confidential and not shared with anyone other than his or her client or other members of his or her law firm or Federal Defender organization without written consent of the United States District Court. This information shall be used only for selecting the jury. Further, counsel certifies in accordance with U.S. District Court, Middle District of Georgia, Local Rule 48, that, immediately after trial, he or she will destroy all copies of completed juror information forms and any other documents containing information obtained from the completed form and shall not use juror information for any purpose(MOSS, ALYCEN)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 241 INITIAL NOTIFICATION OF ELECTRONIC AVAILABILITY OF JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES. In order to obtain access to the attached juror questionnaires, you must docket CERTIFICATION RE: JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES. (Hughes, Cassidy)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Counsel for H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS hereby certifies that the juror information forms and the information obtained therefrom are privileged and shall be kept confidential and not shared with anyone other than his or her client or other members of his or her law firm or Federal Defender organization without written consent of the United States District Court. This information shall be used only for selecting the jury. Further, counsel certifies in accordance with U.S. District Court, Middle District of Georgia, Local Rule 48, that, immediately after trial, he or she will destroy all copies of completed juror information forms and any other documents containing information obtained from the completed form and shall not use juror information for any purpose(BUTLER, JAMES)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Counsel for WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC hereby certifies that the juror information forms and the information obtained therefrom are privileged and shall be kept confidential and not shared with anyone other than his or her client or other members of his or her law firm or Federal Defender organization without written consent of the United States District Court. This information shall be used only for selecting the jury. Further, counsel certifies in accordance with U.S. District Court, Middle District of Georgia, Local Rule 48, that, immediately after trial, he or she will destroy all copies of completed juror information forms and any other documents containing information obtained from the completed form and shall not use juror information for any purpose(BAILEY, MELISSA)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Counsel for IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC hereby certifies that the juror information forms and the information obtained therefrom are privileged and shall be kept confidential and not shared with anyone other than his or her client or other members of his or her law firm or Federal Defender organization without written consent of the United States District Court. This information shall be used only for selecting the jury. Further, counsel certifies in accordance with U.S. District Court, Middle District of Georgia, Local Rule 48, that, immediately after trial, he or she will destroy all copies of completed juror information forms and any other documents containing information obtained from the completed form and shall not use juror information for any purpose(ROGERS, CHARLES)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order ***DISREGARD - Refiled below to correct typographical error in docket text regarding party representation*** Counsel for IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC hereby certifies that the juror information forms and the information obtained therefrom are privileged and shall be kept confidential and not shared with anyone other than his or her client or other members of his or her law firm or Federal Defender organization without written consent of the United States District Court. This information shall be used only for selecting the jury. Further, counsel certifies in accordance with U.S. District Court, Middle District of Georgia, Local Rule 48, that, immediately after trial, he or she will destroy all copies of completed juror information forms and any other documents containing information obtained from the completed form and shall not use juror information for any purpose(MOSS, ALYCEN) Modified on 4/5/2023 to add ***docket text*** (esl).
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 240 DEPOSITION of Jeffrey Ames Doubrava taken on 6/17/2022 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #239 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #237 Order.(BUTLER, JAMES)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Certificate of Need to File Discovery by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #237 Order.(BUTLER, JAMES)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #238 Notice (Other) filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS ); Other (REMINDER for future reference, please file a Certificate of Need to File Discovery and then file the deposition using the DEPOSITION event). (esl)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE Deposition Transcript of Jeffrey Doubrava by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS (BUTLER, JAMES)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER ruling on objections to deposition designations (ECF Nos. #234 & #235 ). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 03/31/2023. (CCL) Modified docket text on 4/3/2023 (esl).
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER re #172 MOTION Exclude Testimony of Erin Harris, #173 MOTION Exclude Testimony of Tony Greco. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 03/30/2023. (CCL)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE Defendants IEA, IEAC, SRC and SRL's Objections to Plaintiffs' Narrowed Deposition Designations by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #230 Notice (Other) (ROGERS, CHARLES)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Counter Designations to Defendants' Revised Deposition Designations and Objections Thereto by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #233 Notice (Other), #229 Notice (Other) (BUTLER, JAMES)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 233 NOTICE Notice of Deposition Designations by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC (MENDEL, COREY)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 232 TRIAL BRIEF by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS(BUTLER, JAMES)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 231 TRIAL BRIEF by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt from January 27, 2023 Final Pretrial Conference, #2 Exhibit B - General NPDES Permit No. GAR100001, #3 Exhibit C - Erin Harris CV, #4 Exhibit D - Westwood's Rule 26(A)(2) Expert Disclosure, #5 Exhibit E - Erosion, Sedimentation & Pollution Control Plan Checklist)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 230 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Notice of Narrowed Deposition Designations per 3-24-23 Order by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS (BUTLER, JAMES)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE Defendants IEA, IEAC, SRC and SRL's Deposition Designations by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC (ROGERS, CHARLES)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Letter regarding Notice of Conflict re Jury Trial Dates (BAILEY, MELISSA)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 227 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER CLARIFYING 224 Order on Motion to Quash. The Court's text order erroneously states that it relates to a subpoena directed to Brian Anderson. The witness's name is Brian Alfredson. The ruling and the reasoning behind it remained unchanged: the motion to quash is moot. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 03/27/2023. (CCL)
March 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 226 This is a text only entry; no document issued.ORDER The trial of this case is scheduled to begin at 9:00 A.M. on Tuesday, April 11, 2023. The Court has decided that in light of the expected length of the trial and to accommodate jurors, it will run a condensed trial day schedule as follows. The first day will be spent on jury selection in the morning with counsel to be prepared to give opening statements in the afternoon. Starting on Wednesday, April 12, 2023 and for each day thereafter, Monday through Friday, the trial day shall begin at 8:00 A.M.. with a mid-morning 15 minutes break from 9:45 to 10:00 A.M. Trial will resume at 10:00 A.M. and proceed until 11:45 A.M., at which time the Court will take a 30 minute break until 12:15 P.M. The trial will resume at 12:15 and proceed until 2:00 P.M., at which time the jury will be excused for the day. For this schedule to work, any matters that need to be addressed outside the presence of the jury should be taken up after 2:00 P.M. when the jury is excused for the day. Counsel should anticipate any issues that may arise the following day so that they can be resolved after the jury has been excused for the day. The jury will be advised that there will be no "lunch break" since they are being released at 2:00 P.M., but if they wish to bring a lunch or substantial snack that they can consume during the last 30 minute break, they may do so. Counsel should also plan accordingly, There will not be time to go out to lunch until court is adjourned for the day at 2:00 P.M. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on March 26, 2023. (CDL)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 225 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER The parties were previously ordered to narrow their deposition designations to reflect the depositions they actually plan to use at trial. It is not clear that the deposition designations attached to the pretrial order were narrowed, and they do not list primary designations for all the parties (it's not clear whether this is intentional or an oversight). By noon on Tuesday, March 28, 2023, each party shall file a notice of its narrowed deposition designations. By noon on Thursday, March 30, 2023, the parties shall file a notice of objections to deposition designations (clearly labeled on the docket as "objections to deposition designations"), along with any counter-designations. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 03/24/2023. (CCL)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 224 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER finding as moot #223 Motion to Quash. If a witness is listed in the final pretrial order on the "will call list," as is the case with Mr. Brian Anderson, opposing counsel may rely upon the fact that the witness will be made available at trial. If Plaintiffs seek to call Mr. Anderson in their case in chief, IEA should work with counsel to make sure Mr. Anderson is present for providing that testimony. In light of Mr. Anderson being listed on the will call list, the pending motion to quash the subpoena directed to him is moot. Mr. Anderson shall comply with the subpoena with the understanding that counsel for Plaintiffs will work with opposing counsel to provide an estimated time for him to appear so that his inconvenience is minimized. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 03/24/2023 (CCL)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MOTION to Quash the Subpoena of Mr. Brian Alfredson by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC filed by CHARLES E ROGERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Brian Alfredson)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 222 PRETRIAL ORDER Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 2/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Facts, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition Designations, #3 Exhibit C - Exhibit Lists, #4 Exhibit D - Verdict Forms)(esl)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Proposed Pretrial Order Received and forwarded to chambers (esl)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER ruling on pending motions (ECF Nos. #120 , #155 , #166 , #168 , #172 , #173 , #174 , #177 , #179 , #180 , #182 , #183 , #184 , #185 , #186 , #187 ). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 02/07/2023 (CCL)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 220 REPLY to Response filed by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC re #172 MOTION Exclude Testimony of Expert Erin Harris, #173 MOTION Exclude Testimony of Expert Tony Greco (BAILEY, MELISSA)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 219 NOTICE Defendants IEA, IEAC, SRC and SRL's Deposition Designations by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC (ROGERS, CHARLES)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re: #120 MOTION in Limine regarding Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Lee Walters (ROGERS, CHARLES)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 217 DEPOSITION of Lee Walters taken on September 1, 2022 filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC. Related document: #216 Certificate of Need to File Discovery, filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, SR LUMPKIN LLC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, #120 MOTION in Limine regarding Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Lee Walters filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC.(ROGERS, CHARLES)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Certificate of Need to File Discovery by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC. Related document: #120 MOTION in Limine regarding Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Lee Walters filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC.(ROGERS, CHARLES)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 215 NOTICE Plaintiffs Notice of Depositions Plaintiffs Intend to Use at Trial by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS (BUTLER, JAMES)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 214 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #174 MOTION in Limine regarding Def Westwood Professional Services, Inc.'s Motions in Limine, #186 MOTION in Limine regarding Defendants SRC, SRL, IEA, and IEACs Motion in Limine to Exclude Photographs and Videos Taken Illegally and Without Permission, #180 MOTION in Limine regarding Limiting and Excluding Certain Testimony of Brian Wellington, #185 MOTION in Limine regarding Defendants SRC, SRL, IEA, and IEACs Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of and Reference to Non-Lumpkin Solar Facilities and Sites, #179 MOTION in Limine regarding Excluding Duplicative and Improper Expert Testimony, #182 MOTION in Limine regarding Its Retention of Law Firms and Alleged Misconduct During Discovery, #184 MOTION in Limine regarding Defs SRC, SRL, IEA, and IEACs Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of or Reference to Unrelated Affiliated Companies and or the use of Derogatory Terms Referring to Defendants, #183 MOTION in Limine regarding Excluding Evidence Regarding Defendants' Financial Status, Size and/or Wealth, #187 MOTION in Limine regarding Defendants SRC, SRL, IEA, and IEACs Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of and Reference to Insurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX 623 GA EPD Presentation, #2 Exhibit PX 32 12/4/20 Farr Affidavit, #3 Exhibit PX 33 12/4/20 Authorization of Property Owner, #4 Exhibit PX 132 Memorandum of Understanding)(BUTLER, JAMES)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 213 REPLY to Response filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #177 MOTION in Limine regarding Plaintiffs Motions in Limine (BUTLER, JAMES)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #212 Notice (Other), filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, SR LUMPKIN LLC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION ); Wrong event used. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager. The correct event is (Reply to Response to Motion).(esl)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 212 REPLY to Response filed by by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #186 Motion in Limine (MOSS, ALYCEN) Modified on 2/3/2023 to correct docket text and correct link to motion (esl).
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Jury Selection and Jury trial set to begin TUESDAY 4/11/2023 08:30 AM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. NOTICE OF SETTING hearing. Hearing will occur IN-PERSON. Counsel, parties, and members of the public and press should review Standing Order 2022-03, available on the courts website, regarding courthouse entrance procedures due to COVID-19. (glg)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 210 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #186 MOTION in Limine regarding Defendants SRC, SRL, IEA, and IEACs Motion in Limine to Exclude Photographs and Videos Taken Illegally and Without Permission (BUTLER, JAMES)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Pretrial Conference held on 1/27/2023. This case will proceed to trial on TUESDAY April 11, 2023. See the official transcript for more information. Court Reporter: Betsy Peterson. (glg)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 209 RESPONSE filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #177 MOTION in Limine regarding Plaintiffs Motions in Limine (ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 208 RESPONSE filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #174 MOTION in Limine regarding Def Westwood Professional Services, Inc.'s Motions in Limine (ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 207 RESPONSE filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #173 MOTION Exclude Testimony of Expert Tony Greco (ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 206 RESPONSE filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #172 MOTION Exclude Testimony of Expert Erin Harris (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Erin Harris's June 21, 2022 Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Erin Harris's CV)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 205 RESPONSE filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #168 MOTION Exclude Testimony of Employees Butler and Herfurth (ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 204 RESPONSE filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #166 MOTION Exclude Testimony of IEA Employees (ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 203 NOTICE Objections to Westwood's Notice Pursuant to Paragraph 8 of December 16, 2022 Order by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #169 Notice (Other) (ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice Pursuant to Paragraph 8 of December 16, 2022 Order by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #167 Notice (Other) (ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER setting agenda for pretrial conference. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 01/26/2023. (CCL)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE Defendants Silicon Ranch Corporation, SR Lumpkin, LLC, IEA Constructors, and Infrastructure and Energy Alternatives, Inc.s Objection to Plaintiffs Objections to the Designations by SRC/IEA and Counter-Counter Designations from the May 9, 2022 Deposition of Reagan Farr by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #195 Notice (Other) (MOSS, ALYCEN)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC identifying Corporate Parent IEA ENERGY SERVICES, LLC, Corporate Parent MASTEC, INC., Corporate Parent IEA INTERMEDIARY HOLDCO, LLC, Corporate Parent INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES, INC., Other Affiliate IEA ENGINEERING, LLC, Other Affiliate IEA ENGINEERING NORTH CAROLINA, LLC, Other Affiliate AMERICAN CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS WEST COAST, LLC, Other Affiliate AMERICAN CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS, LLC, Other Affiliate CLINTON RE HOLDINGS (DELAWARE), LLC, Other Affiliate CONSOLIDATED CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS I LLC, Other Affiliate CONSOLIDATED CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS II LLC, Other Affiliate H.B. WHITE CANADA CORP., Other Affiliate IEA ENGINEERING (DBA), Other Affiliate IEA EQUIPMENT MANAGEMENT, LLC, Other Affiliate IEA MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., Other Affiliate IEA SOLAR DEVCO, LLC, Other Affiliate MEADOW VALLEY CONTRACTORS, INC., Other Affiliate WILLIAM CHARLES, INC., Other Affiliate MEADOW VALLEY CORPORATION, Other Affiliate MEADOW VALLEY PARENT CORP., Other Affiliate MEADOW VALLEY TRUCKING, INC., Other Affiliate SAIIA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC, Other Affiliate SAIIA HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate WHITE CONSTRUCTION ENERGY SERVICES, LLC, Other Affiliate WHITE CONSTRUCTION, LLC, Other Affiliate BIANCHI ELECTRIC, LLC, Other Affiliate ENVIRONMENTAL CONTRACTORS, LLC, Other Affiliate ROCKFORD BLACKTOP CONSTRUCTION CO, LLC, Other Affiliate JOHN'S STONE, LLC, Other Affiliate PORTER BROTHERS, LLC, Other Affiliate ILLINOIS CCDD OPERATING CO., LLC, Other Affiliate JOHNSTON QUARRY HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate EAST STATE STONE, LLC, Other Affiliate BELIVIDERE STONE, LLC, Other Affiliate PORTER'S STONE, LLC, Other Affiliate WILLIAM CHARLES CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC, Other Affiliate RAGNAR BENSON, LLC, Other Affiliate FOREST CITY LOGISTICS, LLC, Other Affiliate STRUCTORS, INC., Other Affiliate WILLIAM CHARLES PURCHASING, Other Affiliate DPK, LLC, Other Affiliate MULFORD STONE, LLC, Other Affiliate WILLIAM CHARLES ELECTRIC, LLC for IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC; Corporate Parent MASTEC, INC., Other Affiliate IEA ENERGY SERVICES, LLC, Other Affiliate IEA ENGINEERING, LLC, Other Affiliate IEA ENGINEERING NORTH CAROLINA, LLC, Other Affiliate IEA INTERMEDIARY HOLDCO, LLC, Other Affiliate AMERICAN CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS WEST COAST, LLC, Other Affiliate AMERICAN CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS, LLC, Other Affiliate CLINTON RE HOLDINGS (DELAWARE), LLC, Other Affiliate CONSOLIDATED CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS I LLC, Other Affiliate CONSOLIDATED CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS II LLC, Other Affiliate H.B. WHITE CANADA CORP., Other Affiliate IEA ENGINEERING (DBA), Other Affiliate IEA EQUIPMENT MANAGEMENT, LLC, Other Affiliate IEA MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., Other Affiliate IEA SOLAR DEVCO, LLC, Other Affiliate MEADOW VALLEY CONTRACTORS, INC., Other Affiliate WILLIAM CHARLES, INC., Other Affiliate MEADOW VALLEY CORPORATION, Other Affiliate MEADOW VALLEY PARENT CORP., Other Affiliate MEADOW VALLEY TRUCKING, INC., Other Affiliate SAIIA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC, Other Affiliate SAIIA HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate WHITE CONSTRUCTION ENERGY SERVICES, LLC, Other Affiliate WHITE CONSTRUCTION, LLC, Other Affiliate BIANCHI ELECTRIC, LLC, Other Affiliate ENVIRONMENTAL CONTRACTORS, LLC, Other Affiliate ROCKFORD BLACKTOP CONSTRUCTION CO, LLC, Other Affiliate JOHN'S STONE, LLC, Other Affiliate PORTER BROTHERS, LLC, Other Affiliate ILLINOIS CCDD OPERATING CO., LLC, Other Affiliate JOHNSTON QUARRY HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate EAST STATE STONE, LLC, Other Affiliate BELIVIDERE STONE, LLC, Other Affiliate PORTER'S STONE, LLC, Other Affiliate WILLIAM CHARLES CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC, Other Affiliate RAGNAR BENSON, LLC, Other Affiliate FOREST CITY LOGISTICS, LLC, Other Affiliate STRUCTORS, INC., Other Affiliate WILLIAM CHARLES PURCHASING, Other Affiliate DPK, LLC, Other Affiliate MULFORD STONE, LLC, Other Affiliate WILLIAM CHARLES ELECTRIC, LLC, Other Affiliate IEA CONSTRUCTORS, LLC for INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC. (ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 198 RESPONSE in Opposition re #111 Deposition,, #110 Deposition,, #106 Deposition, #112 Deposition, (BAILEY, MELISSA)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 197 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #183 MOTION in Limine regarding Excluding Evidence Regarding Defendants' Financial Status, Size and/or Wealth (BUTLER, JAMES)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER to facilitate pretrial conference. The Court will take up the motions to exclude witnesses at the pretrial conference. Each party will be recognized to argue no more than three additional motions in limine. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 01/26/2023. (CCL)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE Plaintiffs Objections and Counter Designations to Deposition of Reagan Farr by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS (BUTLER, JAMES)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE Notice of Disagreement with Proposed Pretrial Order Submitted by IEA and SRC by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC re #157 Notice of Pretrial Conference, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit January 18 Email, #2 Exhibit January 20 Bailey Email, #3 Exhibit January 20 Email Exchange, #4 Exhibit January 20 Emails to Court, #5 Exhibit January 24 Emails between Counsel)(BAILEY, MELISSA)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE of "Disagreements" with the Joint Submission by SRC & IEA of What Was Claimed to be a "Complete" Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - 2023-01-12- Butler response to Rogers statement about settlement, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - 2022-08-22 SRC Responses to Plaintiff's Fifth RPD, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - 2022-08-22 Def IEA Resp to Pltfs 4th RPDS, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - 2023-01-13 - Moss email agreeing to accept SOP of trial subpoena to Farr and Thompson)(BUTLER, JAMES)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Proposed Voir Dire Questions by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS(BUTLER, JAMES)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BRENT J BEAVER on behalf of IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC Attorney BRENT J BEAVER added to party IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC(pty:dft), Attorney BRENT J BEAVER added to party INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC(pty:dft)(BEAVER, BRENT)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Proposed Pretrial Order Received and forwarded to chambers (esl)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #178 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS ); Other (There is no signature block. Document must be re-filed with a proper signature block.)(esl)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Proposed Jury Instructions/Requests to Charge by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC(ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Proposed Voir Dire Questions by SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC(MOSS, ALYCEN)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Proposed Voir Dire Questions by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC(ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MOTION in Limine regarding Defendants SRC, SRL, IEA, and IEACs Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of and Reference to Insurance by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC filed by ALYCEN A MOSS.(MOSS, ALYCEN)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MOTION in Limine regarding Defendants SRC, SRL, IEA, and IEACs Motion in Limine to Exclude Photographs and Videos Taken Illegally and Without Permission by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC filed by ALYCEN A MOSS.(MOSS, ALYCEN)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MOTION in Limine regarding Defendants SRC, SRL, IEA, and IEACs Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of and Reference to Non-Lumpkin Solar Facilities and Sites by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC filed by ALYCEN A MOSS.(MOSS, ALYCEN)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MOTION in Limine regarding Defs SRC, SRL, IEA, and IEACs Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of or Reference to Unrelated Affiliated Companies and or the use of Derogatory Terms Referring to Defendants by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC filed by ALYCEN A MOSS.(MOSS, ALYCEN)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION in Limine regarding Excluding Evidence Regarding Defendants' Financial Status, Size and/or Wealth by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC filed by CHARLES E ROGERS.(ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION in Limine regarding Its Retention of Law Firms and Alleged Misconduct During Discovery by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC filed by CHARLES E ROGERS.(ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Proposed Jury Instructions/Requests to Charge by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS(BUTLER, JAMES)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MOTION in Limine regarding Limiting and Excluding Certain Testimony of Brian Wellington by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC filed by CHARLES E ROGERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Aug. 6, 2021 Affidavit of Dr. Brian Wellington, #2 Exhibit B - Nov. 29, 2021 Affidavit and Rule 26(a)(2) Report of Dr. Brian Wellington, #3 Exhibit C - Jun. 8, 2022 Second Affidavit and Supplemental Rule 26(a)(2) Report of Dr. Brian Wellington)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION in Limine regarding Excluding Duplicative and Improper Expert Testimony by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC filed by CHARLES E ROGERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Nov. 30, 2021 Expert Report of Stacy Mote, #2 Exhibit B - Nov. 30, 2021 Expert Report of Erin Bouthillier, #3 Exhibit C - Stacy Mote Apr. 28, 2022 Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D - Nov. 22, 2021 Expert Report of Les Ager)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Proposed Voir Dire Questions by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS(BUTLER, JAMES)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MOTION in Limine regarding Plaintiffs Motions in Limine by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR.(BUTLER, JAMES)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Proposed Jury Instructions/Requests to Charge by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC(BAILEY, MELISSA)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Proposed Voir Dire Questions by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC(BAILEY, MELISSA)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION in Limine regarding Def Westwood Professional Services, Inc.'s Motions in Limine by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC filed by MELISSA BAILEY.(BAILEY, MELISSA)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MOTION Exclude Testimony of Expert Tony Greco by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC filed by MELISSA BAILEY.(BAILEY, MELISSA)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MOTION Exclude Testimony of Expert Erin Harris by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC filed by MELISSA BAILEY.(BAILEY, MELISSA)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER denying #99 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #100 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #102 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #103 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #121 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #122 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #125 Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating #153 Motion to Strike. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 01/17/2023 (CCL)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE Defendants IEA, IEAC, SRC and SRL's Deposition Designations pursuant to December 16, 2022 Order by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC (ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE Defendant Westwood's Depo Testimony Designations re Dkt 157 by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC re #157 Notice of Pretrial Conference, (BAILEY, MELISSA)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MOTION Exclude Testimony of Employees Butler and Herfurth by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC filed by MELISSA BAILEY.(BAILEY, MELISSA)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE pursuant to December 16, 2023 Order re Deposition Testimony and Designations by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS (BUTLER, JAMES)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION Exclude Testimony of IEA Employees by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC filed by MELISSA BAILEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Supplemental Disclosures of IEA-SRC, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Email 010423, #3 Exhibit Ex C - Email 011123)(BAILEY, MELISSA)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER deferring ruling on #120 Motion to Exclude Lee Walters; denying #126 Motion to Exclude Robert Behar; denying #134 Motion to Exclude John Britt; deferring ruling on #155 Motion to Exclude Vance Smith. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 1/12/2023 (CCL)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 164 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying #163 Motion for Leave to File. The Court denies Plaintiffs leave to file supplemental briefing on the summary judgment motions. If Plaintiffs wish to object to evidence as being untimely disclosed or on other grounds, they should file a motion in limine by the deadline set in the notice of pretrial conference. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 01/10/2023 (CCL)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12/27/22 IEA and IEAC's Supplement to Initial Disclosures)(BUTLER, JAMES)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 162 RESTRICTED,Exhibit to IEA, IEAC, SRC and SRL's Reply Plaintiffs' Response to Vance Smith Daubert Motion by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, , SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #161 Reply to Response to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Long Engineering ESA and ESA Work Authorization)(ROGERS, CHARLES) Modified on 1/4/2023 to clarify filers(tlf).
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 161 REPLY to Response filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #155 MOTION in Limine regarding excluding testimony of Plaintiffs' expert Vance Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Placeholder - Long Engineering ESA and ESA Work Authorization)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document: #162 Exparte Exhibit); Wrong event used. Please do not re-file, access corrected by case manager. The correct event is (Restricted Document - Pursuant to Protective Order).(esl)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #155 MOTION in Limine regarding excluding testimony of Plaintiffs' expert Vance Smith, Jr. (BUTLER, JAMES)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 RESPONSE filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #153 MOTION to Strike #140 RESPONSE to Court Order,, Response to Motion, (ROGERS, CHARLES)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 REPLY to Response filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #134 MOTION in Limine regarding Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert John Britt (ROGERS, CHARLES)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/20/2023. NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Attachments: #1 JOINT PROPOSED PRETRIAL ORDER - JURY, #2 JERS information)(glg)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #134 MOTION in Limine regarding Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert John Britt (BUTLER, JAMES)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 JOINT MOTION in Limine regarding excluding testimony of Plaintiffs' expert Vance Smith, Jr. by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC filed by CHARLES E ROGERS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support in Support of Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Vance Smith, Jr., #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit and Rule 26(a)(2) Report of Vance Smith, Jr., #3 Exhibit B - Deposition of Vance Smith, Jr., #4 Exhibit C - Amended Affidavit and Rule 26(a)(2) Report of Vance Smith, Jr.)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency; Document must be re-filed; Related document(s): #150 Motion in Limine, filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, SR LUMPKIN LLC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION; Document attached is not a motion but raher a reply to a motion. Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Civil Events, Motions and Related Filings, Responses/Replies/Other, Reply to Response to Motion (tlf).
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 REPLY to Response filed by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC re #121 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (BAILEY, MELISSA)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION to Strike #140 RESPONSE to Court Order,, Response to Motion, by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC filed by MELISSA BAILEY.(BAILEY, MELISSA)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 DEPOSITION of Vance Smith, Jr. taken on August 31, 2022 filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC. Related document: #151 Certificate of Need to File Discovery, filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, SR LUMPKIN LLC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, #150 MOTION in Limine regarding excluding testimony of Plaintiffs' expert Vance Smith, Jr. filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, SR LUMPKIN LLC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION.(ROGERS, CHARLES)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Certificate of Need to File Discovery by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC. Related document: #155 MOTION in Limine regarding excluding testimony of Plaintiffs' expert Vance Smith, Jr. filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, SR LUMPKIN LLC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION.(ROGERS, CHARLES) Modified on 12/5/2022 to link to re-filed motion (tlf).
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Re-filed at D.E. #155 . JOINT MOTION in Limine regarding excluding testimony of Plaintiffs' expert Vance Smith, Jr. by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC filed by CHARLES E ROGERS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Vance Smith, Jr., #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit and Rule 26(a)(2) Report of Vance Smith, Jr., #3 Exhibit B - Deposition of Vance Smith, Jr., #4 Exhibit C - Amended Affidavit and Rule 26(a)(2) Report of Vance Smith, Jr.)(ROGERS, CHARLES) Modified on 12/5/2022 (tlf).
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 REPLY to Response filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #126 MOTION to Strike (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - March 14, 2022 IEA Response Letter to Caroline Walker's February 28, 2022 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - February 28, 2022 Letter from Caroline Walker to IEA, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Second Requests for Production of Documents to IEA, #4 Exhibit D - SRC's Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Requests for Production of Documents, #5 Exhibit E - IEA and IEAC's Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Requests for Production of Documents)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 REPLY to Response filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cumulative Plan of the Day)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 REPLY to Response filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (BUTLER, JAMES)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 REPLY to Response filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC re #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IEA 2022 10-K Form, #2 Exhibit B - IEA 2021 10-K Form, #3 Exhibit C - IEA 2020 10-K Form)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 REPLY to Response filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #120 MOTION in Limine regarding Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Lee Walters (ROGERS, CHARLES)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 REPLY to Response filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (BUTLER, JAMES)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 REPLY to Response filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #102 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (BUTLER, JAMES)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 REPLY to Response filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpt from IEAs Interrogatory Responses, #2 Exhibit IEA Insurance Policy Declaration, #3 Exhibit IEA Management Services, Inc. SOS Information)(BUTLER, JAMES)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ***IGNORE - replaced by #147 *** Reply to Response filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (BUTLER, JAMES) Modified on 12/2/2022 to modify docket text (esl).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, RESPONSE filed by SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC (Attachments: #1 Stmt of Material Facts Resp in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant Silicon Ranch's Liability for Trespass to Plaintiffs and their Property)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 RESPONSE filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC re #103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Stmt of Material Facts Resp in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendants Infrastructure and Energy Alternatives, Inc.'s and IEA Constructors, LLC's Liability for Trespass to Plaintiffs and their Property, #2 Exhibit A - 11/22/21 Les Ager Rule 26 Report, #3 Exhibit B - 11/29/21 Brian Wellington Rule 26 Report)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Stmt of Material Facts Resp, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Exhibit Ex. A 2021 Form 10-K excerpt, #4 Exhibit Ex. B 6/2/21 Butler to Parkman letter, #5 Exhibit Ex. C 7/9/21 SHV to IEAC letter, #6 Exhibit Ex. D 2020 Form 10-K excerpt, #7 Exhibit 9/16/21 Change Order, #8 Exhibit Ex. F IEA & IEAC Res to Plfs 2nd RPDs)(BUTLER, JAMES)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 RESPONSE filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC re #102 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Stmt of Material Facts Resp in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on SRC and IEA's Defenses and Notice of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault, #2 Exhibit A - 2/17/21 Plan of the Day Cumulative, #3 Exhibit B - 11/12/20 Butler Email to Wooten, #4 Exhibit C - 2/19/21 Echols Email to Burdette and Wooten, #5 Exhibit D - 3/5/21 Bontrager Email regarding Dozer, #6 Exhibit E - 12/30/21 Declaration of Tony Greco, #7 Exhibit F - 11/29/21 Craig Zeller Rule 26 Report, #8 Exhibit G - 11/30/21 Stacy Mote Rule 26 Report, #9 Exhibit H - 4/28/22 Deposition Transcript of Stacy Mote)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC re: #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (ROGERS, CHARLES)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RESPONSE filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC re #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (ROGERS, CHARLES)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION in Limine regarding Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert John Britt by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC filed by CHARLES E ROGERS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants Infrastructure and Energy Alternatives, Inc., IEA Constructors, LLC, Silicon Ranch Corporation, and SR Lumpkin, LLC's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert John Britt, #2 Exhibit A - 9/1/22 Deposition Transcript of John Britt)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #121 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Stmt of Material Facts Resp PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES, INC.S STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS TO WHICH THERE IS NO GENUINE DISPUTE TO BE TRIED, #2 Statement of Material Facts PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS TO WHICH RESPONDENTS CONTEND THERE EXISTS A GENUINE DISPUTE TO BE TRIED IN RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES, INC. (DOC. 121), #3 Exhibit Ex 1 - Mlynek Depo Ex E- 2021-03-10 WW Mlynek to Detar re Updated Auth to disturb, #4 Exhibit Ex 2 - Mlynek Depo Ex 19A - 2021-05-04 EPD to SR EPC re NOV)(BUTLER, JAMES)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #120 MOTION in Limine regarding Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Lee Walters (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A 6/20/22 Mellette Expert Report, #2 Exhibit Exh. B 12/9/21 Vance Smith Expert Report, #3 Exhibit Exh. C 12/30/21 Mellette Expert Report)(BUTLER, JAMES)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #126 MOTION to Strike (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A 4/29/22 Robert Behar Depo, #2 Exhibit Exh. B 11/22/21 SRC Res to Plfs 1st RPDs, #3 Exhibit Exh. C 11/22/21 SRL's Res to Plfs 1st RPDs, #4 Exhibit Exh. D 10/22/21 Plfs 1st RPDs to IEA, #5 Exhibit Exh. E 10/22/21 Plfs 1st RPDs to IEAC, #6 Exhibit Exh. F 5/20/22 Alycen Moss to Jim Butler email, #7 Exhibit Exh. G 7/25/22 Inside Indiana Business Article, #8 Exhibit PX 602 - SRC Notices of Exempt Offerings of Securities, #9 Exhibit PX 603A 2021 IEA 10-K Report excerpt)(BUTLER, JAMES)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Stmt of Material Facts Resp, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Appendix Case Law, #4 Exhibit Exh. B - Collection of Photographs, #5 Exhibit Exh. C GA General NPDES Permit, #6 Exhibit Exh. D 6/7/22 Les Ager Supp Report, #7 Exhibit Exh. E Scott Badcock Affidavit, #8 Exhibit Exh. F 3rd Shaun Harris Affidavit, #9 Exhibit Exh. G 3/30/22 Amie Harris Depo, #10 Exhibit Exh. H 11/22/21 Les Ager Report, #11 Exhibit Exh. I 3/10/21 Worsham Appraisal excerpt, #12 Exhibit Exh. J 9/7/22 Jason Ball Depo, #13 Exhibit Exh. K 5/3/21 Jim Butler to Henry Parkman letter, #14 Exhibit Exh. L Henry Parkman to Jim Butler letter, #15 Exhibit Exh. M 5/12/21 Henry Parkman to Jim Butler letter, #16 Exhibit PX 65 7/9/21 Fednander to Taylor email, #17 Exhibit PX 85 Collection of One Environmental Reports, #18 Exhibit PX 106 6/16/21 Leasehold Deed to Secure Debt, #19 Exhibit PX 117A 3/10/21 Cain Doubrava email, #20 Exhibit PX 122 Cain to Matthews email, #21 Exhibit PX 136 5/3/21 IEA Lumpkin Solar Facility Chart, #22 Exhibit PX 161 8/2/21 Fednander to Allen email, #23 Exhibit PX 197 IEA Linked In, #24 Exhibit PX 247 1/15/21 Echols to Burdette email, #25 Exhibit PX 248 2/4/21 Burdette to Echols email)(BUTLER, JAMES)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by MARTIN A SHELTON on behalf of IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC(SHELTON, MARTIN)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #127 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses to all pending motions that were filed on or before October 18, 2022 are due by November 14, 2022, and the replies are due by December 2, 2022. There shall be no additional extensions of briefing deadlines. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 10/26/2022 (CCL)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File TO FILE RESPONSES AND REPLIES TO MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC filed by MARTIN A SHELTON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(SHELTON, MARTIN)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION to Strike by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC filed by MARTIN A SHELTON. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support IEA.IEAC. SRC Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Behar Report 11.23.21, #3 Exhibit Behar Supplemental report 05.20.22, #4 Exhibit Hearing Transcript, #5 Exhibit Behar Depo)(SHELTON, MARTIN)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC filed by MARTIN A SHELTON. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support IEAC and SRC Memo in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Material Facts IEAC and SRC Statement of Facts, #3 Exhibit H&L Warranty Deed, #4 Exhibit H&L Quit Claim deed, #5 Exhibit H&L Settlement Statement, #6 Exhibit H&L 30B6 Deposition, #7 Exhibit Nutter Supplemental Report 06.21.22, #8 Exhibit Erin Harris, Nutter, deposition, #9 Exhibit Nutter Report 12.30.21, #10 Exhibit Lee Walters Report, #11 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Response to IEA's Request for Admission, #12 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Response to Interrogatories, #13 Exhibit Amie Harris Deposition, #14 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Response to SRC interrogatories, #15 Exhibit Joel Wooten Deposition, #16 Exhibit 02.19.07 Pope letter, #17 Exhibit 05.01.07 Snipes letter, #18 Exhibit Alfredson Declaration, #19 Exhibit Plan of the day 03.30.21, #20 Exhibit 03.09.21 Butler letter to Echols, #21 Exhibit 02.12.21 Echols email, #22 Exhibit 02.22.21 Burdette email to Echols, #23 Exhibit Russell email, #24 Exhibit Lee Walters Deposition)(SHELTON, MARTIN)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency as to #124 Motion for Summary Judgment - filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC. Main document is not a motion, and is the same document as attachment #1, memorandum in support. Please refile the correct document and attachments. (tlp)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ***re-filed correctly at ECF 125*** Motion for Summary Judgment by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC filed by MARTIN A SHELTON. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support IEAC and SRC Memo in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Material Facts IEAC and SRC Statement of Facts, #3 Exhibit H&L Warranty Deed, #4 Exhibit H&L Quit Claim deed, #5 Exhibit H&L Settlement Statement, #6 Exhibit H&L 30B6 Deposition, #7 Exhibit Nutter Supplemental Report 06.21.22, #8 Exhibit Erin Harris, Nutter, deposition, #9 Exhibit Nutter Report 12.30.21, #10 Exhibit Lee Walters Report, #11 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Response to IEA's Request for Admission, #12 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Response to Interrogatories, #13 Exhibit Amie Harris Deposition, #14 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Response to SRC interrogatories, #15 Exhibit Joel Wooten Deposition, #16 Exhibit 02.19.07 Pope letter, #17 Exhibit 05.01.07 Snipes letter, #18 Exhibit Alfredson Declaration, #19 Exhibit Plan of the day 03.30.21, #20 Exhibit 03.09.21 Butler letter to Echols, #21 Exhibit 02.12.21 Echols email, #22 Exhibit 02.22.21 Burdette email to Echols, #23 Exhibit Russell email, #24 Exhibit Lee Walters Deposition)(SHELTON, MARTIN) Modified on 10/19/2022 (esl).
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Restricted Document Notice of Filing Confidential Material re #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed pursuant to a protective order. The attached document is restricted to court users and attorneys of record in the case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Engineering Procurement and Construction Agreement, #2 Exhibit Engineering Services Agreement, #3 Exhibit ESA Work Authorization)(SHELTON, MARTIN)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC filed by MARTIN A SHELTON. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support IEA's Memo in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Material Facts IEA's Statement of Facts, #3 Exhibit Alfredson Declaration (IEAC), #4 Exhibit Plan of the Day 03.30.21, #5 Exhibit Erin Harris, Nutter, Deposition, #6 Exhibit Nutter Report 12.30.21, #7 Exhibit Nutter Supplemental Report 06.21.22, #8 Exhibit H&L Farms 30B6 Deposition, #9 Exhibit Hanson Declaration (IEA))(SHELTON, MARTIN)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC filed by MELISSA BAILEY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Material Facts Statement of Material Facts, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Allen Deposition, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Taylor Deposition, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Weekly and Daily Inspection Reports, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D - Nelson Deposition, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E - Mylnek Deposition)(BAILEY, MELISSA)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION in Limine regarding Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Lee Walters by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC filed by MARTIN A SHELTON. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support Daubert Motion Exclude Walters, #2 Exhibit Walters Report, #3 Exhibit Walters Deposition, #4 Exhibit USPAP, #5 Exhibit Wellington Photo, #6 Exhibit Mote Photo, #7 Exhibit Mote Photo)(SHELTON, MARTIN)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Restricted Document re #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #118 Deposition,,, filed pursuant to a protective order. The attached document is restricted to court users and attorneys of record in the case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1/21 Lumpkin Solar Preliminary Stormwater Management Report)(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 DEPOSITION of Andrew Nelson taken on September 13, 2022 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #105 Certificate of Need to File Discovery,, filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6/8/21 Riley Gardner email, #2 Exhibit 2/21 Lumpkin Solar Prelimnary Stormwater Management Report, #3 Exhibit 6/21 Lumpkin Solar Prelimnary Stormwater Management Report, #4 Exhibit 7/21 Lumpkin Solar Prelimnary Stormwater Management Report, #5 Exhibit 1/22/21 Lumpkin Solar Prelimnary Hydrology Study, #6 Exhibit 6/21 Lumpkin Solar Prelimnary Hydrology Study, #7 Exhibit Placeholder 1/21 6/21 Lumpkin Solar Prelimnary Stormwater Management Report)(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 DEPOSITION of Brad White taken on June 17, 2022 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #105 Certificate of Need to File Discovery,, filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS.(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 DEPOSITION of John Thompson taken on May 9, 2022 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #105 Certificate of Need to File Discovery,, filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX 20 3/11/21 Allen to Thompson email)(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 DEPOSITION of Aaron Mylnek taken on September 14, 2022 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #105 Certificate of Need to File Discovery,, filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. J Project Schedule)(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 DEPOSITION of James Melton taken on June 20, 2022 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #105 Certificate of Need to File Discovery,, filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #102 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS.(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 DEPOSITION of Shaun Harris taken on March 29, 2022 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #105 Certificate of Need to File Discovery,, filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #102 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS.(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 DEPOSITION of Erin Harris taken on May 31, 2022 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #105 Certificate of Need to File Discovery,, filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS.(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 DEPOSITION of Tony Greco taken on April 25, 2022 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #105 Certificate of Need to File Discovery,, filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #102 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX 50 Nutter Expert Report, #2 Exhibit 3/16/22 Shelton email, #3 Exhibit PX 63A Stormwater Turbidity Table)(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 DEPOSITION of Reagan Farr taken on May 9, 2022 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #105 Certificate of Need to File Discovery,, filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #102 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6/3/21 ESPC Plan, #2 Exhibit Limited Warranty Deed)(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 DEPOSITION of Philip Exley taken on June 21, 2022 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #105 Certificate of Need to File Discovery,, filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #102 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS.(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 DEPOSITION of Stephen Burdette taken on June 20, 2022 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #105 Certificate of Need to File Discovery,, filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #102 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Def Ex 42A Harvest Compliance Report)(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 DEPOSITION of James Allen taken on May 21, 2022 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #105 Certificate of Need to File Discovery,, filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX 20 3/11/21 Allen to Thompson email, #2 Exhibit PX 21 6/3/21 ESPC Plan, #3 Exhibit PX 45 Lumpkin Solar Sign)(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 DEPOSITION of Brian Alfredson taken on June 14, 2022 filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #105 Certificate of Need to File Discovery,, filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS.(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Certificate of Need to File Discovery by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS. Related document: #99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #102 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS.(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/27/2022, before Judge Clay D. Land. Court Reporter/Transcriber Betsy Peterson. Volume Number: I of I. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (Peterson, Betsy)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs Partial Summary Judgment on Defendants Infrastructure and Energy Alternatives, Inc.'s and IEA Constructors, LLC's Liability for Trespass To Plaintiffs and Their Property, #2 Statement of Material Facts In Support of Plaintiffs Partial Summary Judgment on Defendants Infrastructure and Energy Alternatives, Inc.'s and IEA Constructors, LLC's Liability for Trespass To Plaintiffs and Their Property)(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support In Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment On SRC and IEA's Affirmative Defenses and Notice of Non-Parties Potentially At Fault, #2 Statement of Material Facts In Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment On SRC and IEA's Affirmative Defenses and Notice of Non-Parties Potentially At Fault, #3 Exhibit 12/15/20 Echols to Burdette email, #4 Exhibit 12/17/20 Echols to Burdette email, #5 Exhibit 3/10/21 Mylnek to EPD Letter, #6 Exhibit Cody Hale website Bio, #7 Exhibit Lane Rivenbark website Bio, #8 Exhibit Limited Warranty Deed - Kawikee Two to SRC, #9 Exhibit Map)(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Restricted Document re #100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed pursuant to a protective order. The attached document is restricted to court users and attorneys of record in the case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit James Allen Employment Offer, #2 Exhibit James Allen Photo and Video Release, #3 Exhibit Allen Resignation Letter, #4 Exhibit Delegation of Authority Review Allen, #5 Exhibit Orellana Offer Letter, #6 Exhibit PX 112 SRC Owner Parent Company Guaranty, #7 Exhibit PX 113 Contractor Parent Guaranty, #8 Exhibit PX 116 Engineering Procurement and Construction Agreement, #9 Exhibit PX 116A Engineering Procurement and Construction Agreement Excerpt, #10 Exhibit PX 134 Engineering Procurement and Construction Agreement Excerpt)(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on IEA Defendants' Second Affirmative Defense, #2 Stmt of Material Facts Resp Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on IEA Defendants' Second Affirmative Defense, #3 Exhibit IEA Constructors LLC GA SOS, #4 Exhibit IEA Website Contact Info, #5 Exhibit Robert Behar Supplemental Report, #6 Exhibit 4. IEAC and WW ESA Work Authorization, #7 Exhibit 2021-01-22 Civil Construction Plans - Preliminary Plans for Permit, #8 Exhibit 2021-06-03 Civil Construction Plans - Issued for Construction, #9 Exhibit Joe Broom Linked In, #10 Exhibit 2020-12-18 Zaccaria to Mlynek Email, #11 Exhibit 2021-05-14 Candelario to John Thompson, #12 Exhibit 2021-04-27 - Kruppenbacher IEA email, #13 Exhibit Al Downes Linked In, #14 Exhibit Henry Cabuhay Linked In, #15 Exhibit IEA Facebook about Lauren Arecchi, #16 Exhibit Broom to Pierre email, #17 Exhibit 2021-10-15 Email Broom to Cain, #18 Exhibit Placeholder - Allen Employment offer, #19 Exhibit Placeholder - Allen Photo and Video Release, #20 Exhibit Allen Resignation Letter, #21 Exhibit Placeholder - Delegation of Authority Review - Allen, #22 Exhibit Orellana Offer Letter, #23 Exhibit 2022-10-10 IEA Website - Chris Hanson, #24 Exhibit 2021-08-25 La Point to Fowler email, #25 Exhibit EPD GEOS File, #26 Exhibit 2021-06-29 IEA Allen to EPD, #27 Exhibit PX 34 2021-01-22 Notice of Intent, #28 Exhibit PX 35 2021-05-26 Notice of Intent, #29 Exhibit PX 36 2021-06-04 Notice of Intent, #30 Exhibit PX 89 IEA Legal Entity Structure, #31 Exhibit PX 91 State of Wisconsin Disregarded Entities, #32 Exhibit PX 92 IRS Single Member LLC, #33 Exhibit PX 99 James Allen Linked In, #34 Exhibit PX 112 Placeholder Owner Parent Company Guaranty, #35 Exhibit PX 113 Contractor Parent Guaranty, #36 Exhibit PX 116 Engineering Procurement and Construction Agreement - Signature Page, #37 Exhibit PX 116A Engineering Procurement and Construction Agreement - Excerpts, #38 Exhibit PX 134 Engineering Procurement and Construction Agreement - Excerpts, #39 Exhibit PX 152 2022-03-27 Shelton email, #40 Exhibit PX 154 Brian Alfredson Linked In, #41 Exhibit PX 162 2021-08-23 Orellana to Fednander email, #42 Exhibit PX 202 2021-11-19 Orellana email, #43 Exhibit PX 207 2021-09-16 Francisco Garcia Candelario LinkedIn, #44 Exhibit PX 208 Jeff LaPoint Linked In, #45 Exhibit PX 509 2021-10-26 White to IEA email, #46 Exhibit PX 512 White to IEA emails)(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion for Partial SJ On Silicon Ranch Corporation's Liability For Trespass To Plaintiffs and Their Property, #2 Statement of Material Facts In Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment On SRCs Liability for Trespass to Plaintiffs and Their Property, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Shaun Harris, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Amie Harris)(BUTLER, JAMES)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying #89 Motion to Compel. Per the Court's oral ruling from the bench on September 27, 2022, the motion to compel is denied. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 9/28/2022 (CCL)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Motion Hearing held on 9/27/2022 re #89 MOTION to Compel and Motion to Modify Scheduling Order filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC. Counsel Plaintiff- James Butler, Jr., C Cooper Knowles, Daniel Philyaw. Defendant- Alycen Moss, Melissa Bailey, Kent Stair, Steve Stuart, Martin Shelton and Charles Rogers. (Court Reporter Betsy Peterson.) See official transcript for more information. Court Reporter: Betsy Peterson. (glg)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by SARAH CARPENTER (nop)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #93 Motion to Seal Documents. The Clerk shall seal the EXHIBITS to #89 MOTION to Compel (ECF Nos. 89-2 to 89-54). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 09/27/2022 (CCL)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 RESPONSE filed by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC re #89 MOTION to Compel and Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 11-17-21 email from Horowitz, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - March 2022 Email Exchange with Moss, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Westwood Discovery Responses, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Bailey Ltr. to Moss 08-24-22, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - 09-19-22 Email to Moss, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - 09-14-22 Email to Moss, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - January 2022 Emails between Bailey and Moss, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Discovery Dispute Ltr. from Moss 08-19-22, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Excerpts of IEA and SRC Discovery Responses, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J - SRC Discovery Requests, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K - 08-11-22 Email to Counsel)(BAILEY, MELISSA)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION to Seal Document(s) #89 MOTION to Compel and Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR.(BUTLER, JAMES)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #89 MOTION to Compel and Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 2022-06-13 Plfs Res to SRC's 2nd RPDS, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - 2021-12-30 Westwood, Disclosure, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - 2022-01-28 Def Westwood Rebuttal Expert Disclosure - Ridley Mlynek Nelson, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - 2022-09-14 Moss to JB2 re comms need to produced in their entirety which includes attmts, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E 2022-09-20 Pogorzelski to Moss encl sharefile links re WW comm prod, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - 2022-09-13 Moss for SRC only - emails re deps and extend disc - WW and Ps responses, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - 2022-08-31 Kim email, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - 2022-09-14 Sarah and Jim emails to Moss et al re demands for dox shared with WW, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - 2022-09-22 Mandy email)(BUTLER, JAMES)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4190855, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: 612175. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CARPENTER, SARAH)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2022 02:00 PM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTION re #89 MOTION to Compel and Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Hearing will occur IN-PERSON. Counsel, parties, and members of the public and press should review Standing Order 2022-03, available on the courts website, regarding courthouse entrance procedures due to COVID-19. (glg)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Compel and Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC filed by CHARLES E ROGERS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants Infrastructure and Energy Alternatives, Inc., IEA Constructors, LLC, Silicon Ranch Corporation, and SR Lumpkin, LLC's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit 1 - Emails 01/04/22, #3 Exhibit 2 - Subpoena to Kent Stair to Testify at a Deposition, #4 Exhibit 3 - Letter to Kent Stair, Melissa Bailey and Corey Mendel from Alycen Moss 08/19/22, #5 Exhibit 4 - Letter to Alycen Moss from Melissa Bailey 08/24/22, #6 Exhibit 5 - Text Messages 05/15/22, #7 Exhibit 6 - Emails 06/10/22, #8 Exhibit 7 - Email 08/23/22, #9 Exhibit 8 - Emails 01/04/22, #10 Exhibit 9 - Emails 01/26/22, #11 Exhibit 10 - Email 03/14/22, #12 Exhibit 11 - Email 03/15/22, #13 Exhibit 12 - Email 03/30/22, #14 Exhibit 13 - Email 04/18/22, #15 Exhibit 14 - Email 05/04/22, #16 Exhibit 15 - Emails 05/07/22, #17 Exhibit 16 - Email 05/16/22, #18 Exhibit 17 - Emails 04/06/22, #19 Exhibit 18 - Email 04/25/22, #20 Exhibit 19 - Text Messages 04/20/22, #21 Exhibit 20 - Text Messages 04/01/22, #22 Exhibit 21 - Emails 04/22/22, #23 Exhibit 22 - Email 05/04/22, #24 Exhibit 23 - Emails 05/18/22, #25 Exhibit 24 - Emails 05/27/22, #26 Exhibit 25 - Emails 05/27/22, #27 Exhibit 26 - Email 04/28/22, #28 Exhibit 27 - Email 05/04/22, #29 Exhibit 28 - Emails 06/04/22, #30 Exhibit 29 - Email 06/08/22, #31 Exhibit 30 - Emails 01/03/22, #32 Exhibit 31 - Emails 01/04/22, #33 Exhibit 32 - Emails 01/14/22, #34 Exhibit 33 - Text Messages 05/04/22, #35 Exhibit 34 - Email 02/10/22, #36 Exhibit 35 - Emails 04/11/22, #37 Exhibit 36 - Emails 04/09/22, #38 Exhibit 37 - Email 05/19/22, #39 Exhibit 38 - Emails 02/10/22, #40 Exhibit 39 - Emails 05/26/22, #41 Exhibit 40 - Emails 05/26/22, #42 Exhibit 41 - Emails 05/27/22, #43 Exhibit 42 - Email 05/07/22, #44 Exhibit 43 - Emails 04/28/22, #45 Exhibit 44 - Emails 03/08/22, #46 Exhibit 45 - Email 06/08/22, #47 Exhibit 46 - Text Messages 04/28/22, #48 Exhibit 47 - Email 05/04/22, #49 Exhibit 48 - Text Messages 06/21/22, #50 Exhibit 49 - Email 07/13/22, #51 Exhibit 50 - Emails 04/29/22, #52 Exhibit 51 - Emails 04/13/22, #53 Exhibit 52 - Emails 12/19/21, #54 Exhibit 53 - Plaintiffs' Responses to Silicon Ranch Corporation's Second Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs, #55 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Infrastructure and Energy Alternatives, Inc., IEA Constructors, LLC, Silicon Ranch Corporation, and SR Lumpkin, LLC's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Motion to Compel)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JEANNE MARIE HARRISON on behalf of IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC Attorney JEANNE MARIE HARRISON added to party IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC(pty:dft), Attorney JEANNE MARIE HARRISON added to party INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC(pty:dft)(HARRISON, JEANNE)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CHARLES E ROGERS on behalf of IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC Attorney CHARLES E ROGERS added to party IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC(pty:dft), Attorney CHARLES E ROGERS added to party INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC(pty:dft)(ROGERS, CHARLES)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by STEVEN J STUART on behalf of IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC Attorney STEVEN J STUART added to party IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC(pty:dft), Attorney STEVEN J STUART added to party INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC(pty:dft)(STUART, STEVEN)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by HARRY ZACK RIPPEON on behalf of IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC Attorney HARRY ZACK RIPPEON added to party IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC(pty:dft), Attorney HARRY ZACK RIPPEON added to party INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC(pty:dft)(RIPPEON, HARRY)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/21/2022, before Judge Clay D. Land. Court Reporter/Transcriber Betsy Peterson. Volume Number: I of I. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (Peterson, Betsy)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER finding as moot #81 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs filed a motion for an extension of time to produce documents in response to SRC's second requests for production. Before counsel filed the motion, SRC's counsel clearly agreed to the requested extension, which gives Plaintiffs until August 31, 2022 to respond. Plaintiffs' counsel inexplicably misinterpreted the response "This is fine assuming we are getting a full and complete production" to mean that SRCs counsel declined the extension request. The motion for extension is moot given that opposing counsel consented to the requested extension. Counsel are reminded of their obligation to confer in good faith before burdening the Court with unnecessary motions. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 08/12/2022 (CCL)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RESPONSE filed by SILICON RANCH CORPORATION re #81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defs RPDs per Court Order (Doc 54). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Exchange re: Consent to the Extension)(MOSS, ALYCEN)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defs RPDs per Court Order (Doc 54). by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - Proposed Order)(BUTLER, JAMES)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Motion Hearing held via Zoom on 7/21/2022 re #43 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, #63 MOTION to Compel John Britt Deposition filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, #61 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, #49 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, #45 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, #54 MOTION to Compel and for Fees and Expenses filed by SILICON RANCH CORPORATION (Court Reporter Betsy Peterson-via zoom.) No parties were present in the Courtroom. Everyone appeared via Zoom. Plaintiff's Shaun and Amie Harris were present. Counsel Plaintiff- Dan Philyaw, Jim Butler, Cooper Knowles and Fred Overby were present. Defense- Melissa Bailey, Alycen Moss, Corey Mendel, Charles Reed, Ryan Wilhelm and Keith Kodosky were present via zoom. The Court made several rulings, extended discovery and ruled on depositions. Please see the official transcript for more information. Court Reporter: Betsy Peterson-via zoom. (glg)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #43 Motion for Protective Order; granting #43 Motion to Quash; denying #45 Motion to Compel; granting #49 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to the extent described during the hearing (Discovery to be complete by 9/14/2022., Dispositive motions due by 10/14/2022.) No extensions to the briefing schedule will be permitted; granting #54 Motion to Compel; denying #61 Motion to Disqualify Counsel; granting #63 Motion to Compel to the extent described during the hearing. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 7/21/2022. Please see hearing transcript for details. (esl).
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Filing of Declarations by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC re #63 MOTION to Compel John Britt Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Shelton Declaration, #2 Exhibit Kodosky Declaration)(SHELTON, MARTIN)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CHARLES K REED on behalf of IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC Attorney CHARLES K REED added to party IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC(pty:dft), Attorney CHARLES K REED added to party INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC(pty:dft)(REED, CHARLES)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPLY to Response filed by SILICON RANCH CORPORATION re #54 MOTION to Compel and for Fees and Expenses (MOSS, ALYCEN)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order REMARK: Exhibit A, Deposition of John Britt Audio Excerpt, referenced in ECF #74 and #75 , has been received and downloaded into the Court's digital vault. (esl)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE Manual Filing by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #74 Response to Motion, #63 MOTION to Compel John Britt Deposition (BUTLER, JAMES)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #63 MOTION to Compel John Britt Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Placeholder - Audio John Britt Deposition)(BUTLER, JAMES)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 This is a text only entry; no document issued.ORDER The CDC has recently designated Muscogee County/Columbus as a Covid high infection area, and their official guidance recommends that masks be worn in public spaces. Confessing its lack of medical training and reluctance to impose its political beliefs upon others, this Court has attempted to follow CDC guidance throughout the Covid era. Accordingly, masks will be required in this Court's courtroom when recommended by the CDC. Furthermore, for non-evidentiary civil hearings where no live testimony will be presented, the Court will hold such hearings remotely via Zoom, which quite frankly will likely be more effective than having attorneys present live trying to argue with masks on. Therefore, the hearing scheduled for July 21, 2022 at 9:30 A.M. shall be held remotely via zoom. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk shall notify counsel for the parties how to connect to the hearing. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on July 18, 2022. (CDL)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 SURREPLY filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #43 MOTION for Protective OrderMOTION to Quash (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A- Exh. A - 6-21-22 1053 pm email from IEA serving suppl reports of Nutter - Erin Harris - and Mellette, #2 Exhibit Ex B- Excerpts Exley depo, #3 Exhibit Ex C-Excerpts Melton depo, #4 Exhibit Ex D- 2022-06-21 Suppl Report of Erin Harris & Nutter & Associates, #5 Exhibit Ex E-2021-11-30 Shaun Harris Affidavit, #6 Exhibit Ex F- Excerpts Shaun Harris depo, #7 Exhibit Ex G- Excerpts Wooten depo, #8 Exhibit PX 4 - 2021-02-12 Email between JOW and Echols, #9 Exhibit PX 5 - 2020-10-30 Exh B revised - Timber Sale Map - ZONE 1 south of pipeline drains into Harris, #10 Exhibit PX 94 - page vii Nutter Report - Exec Summary - map of SRC property and watershed, #11 Exhibit PX 198 - 2019-12-04 Google Earth photo - watershed N of pipeline was open ground)(BUTLER, JAMES)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 DEPOSITION of John Britt taken on June 15, 2022 filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC. Related document: #70 Certificate of Need to File Discovery, filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, 68 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEF 1. Report w/o photos, #2 Exhibit DEF 2. article, #3 Exhibit DEF 3.revegetation article, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's EX 1. screen shot of docs and TABS, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Ex 2. screen capture of texts)(SHELTON, MARTIN) Modified on 7/15/2022 (esl).
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Certificate of Need to File Discovery by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC. Related document: #63 MOTION to Compel John Britt Deposition filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC.(SHELTON, MARTIN)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #60 Amended Motion. Plaintiffs may file the supplemental brief. It must be filed by noon on Monday, July 18, 2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 07/13/2022 (CCL)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER re 64 Notice of Hearing on Motion. The parties are hereby notified that they should be prepared to address ALL pending motions at the hearing. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 07/13/2022. (CCL)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #67 Restricted Document - Pursuant to Protective Order); The signature block does not include the e mail address of the filer. Please do not re-file, for future reference only. See Fed.R.Civ.P 11.(tam)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Restricted Document re #54 MOTION to Compel and for Fees and Expenses, #66 Response to Motion, filed pursuant to a #37 protective order. The attached document is restricted to court users and attorneys of record in the case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B [PROTECTIVE ORDER] IEA H&L-D-IEA 03088-3107, #2 Exhibit [PO] Ex D Pt 1 CONFIDENTIAL H&L-D-IEA 03116-3563 red sz, #3 Exhibit [PO] Ex D Pt 2.1 CONFIDENTIAL H&L-D-IEA 03116-3563, #4 Exhibit [PO] Ex D Pt 2.2.2 CONFIDENTIAL H&L-D-IEA 03116-3563 red sz, #5 Exhibit [PO] Ex D Pt 2.3 CONFIDENTIAL H&L-D-IEA 03116-3563 red sz, #6 Exhibit [PO] Ex D Pt 3 CONFIDENTIAL H&L-D-IEA 03116-3563 red sz, #7 Exhibit [PO] Ex D Pt 4 CONFIDENTIAL H&L-D-IEA 03116-3563 red sz)(BAILEY, MELISSA) Modified on 7/13/2022 (tam).
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RESPONSE filed by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC re #54 MOTION to Compel and for Fees and Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A D&I letter 11.29.2021, #2 Exhibit B PO Protected, #3 Exhibit C Nutter & Associates Initial Report, #4 Exhibit D PO Protected, #5 Exhibit E Supplemental Nutter Report Lumpkin Solar ESPCP Evaluation_21054.02_06-21-2022_, #6 Exhibit F 2022-06-07 Supplemental Report of John Britt, #7 Exhibit G 2022-06-08 Vance Smith Supplemental Report, #8 Exhibit H 2022-06-07 Supplemental Report of Consolidated Resources LLC, #9 Exhibit I 2022-06-08 - Supplemental Report of Brian Wellington_notarized, #10 Exhibit J Brian Wellington-CT, #11 Exhibit K Ball, Exhibit 1 Report)(BAILEY, MELISSA)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #54 MOTION to Compel and for Fees and Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Greco Dep excerpts, #2 Exhibit Nutter Suppl Report excerpts, #3 Exhibit Harris Dep excerpts, #4 Exhibit Alfredson Dep excerpts, #5 Exhibit PX 37 - 2022-01-06 - NOI for Clay County project - Owner IEAC - Operator Brian Alfredson, #6 Exhibit PX 45 - Lumpkin Solar Sign on Trotman Road, #7 Exhibit PX 102 - 2021-01-14 IEA Press Release, #8 Exhibit PX 104- SRC press release, #9 Exhibit PX 205 - ESPC - owner responsibilities, #10 Exhibit PX 206A - Excerpts OE Weekly Reports, #11 Exhibit PX 404 - Photo, #12 Exhibit PX 405 - Photo, #13 Exhibit PX 413 - Photo, #14 Exhibit PX 415 - Photo, #15 Exhibit PX 445 - Photo, #16 Exhibit PX 446 - Photo, #17 Exhibit PX 501 - 2021-06-22 Statement of Work Task Order)(BUTLER, JAMES)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Motions Hearing set for 7/21/2022 09:30 AM (eastern time) in Columbus, Ga before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTIONs re #45 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions, #49 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, #43 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Quash. Hearing will occur via ZOOM. Counsel, parties, and members of the public and press should review Standing Order 2022-03, available on the courts website, regarding courthouse entrance procedures due to COVID-19. Counsel should be prepared to present ORAL argument. Counsel will be emailed the dial-in information on 7/18/2022. (glg) Modified on 7/18/2022- to change it to a Zoom hearing (glg).
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION to Compel John Britt Deposition by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC filed by KEITH M KODOSKY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Britt report, #3 Exhibit email notice, #4 Exhibit Britt Supplemental report, #5 Exhibit emails)(KODOSKY, KEITH)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document: #62 Motion to Compel, filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC ); Document must be re-filed to include a description of attachment(s). A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. An example of a properly identified attachment would be Exhibit A Letter from A. Hamilton to A. Burr. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 13.(esl)
July 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Replaced by #63 . MOTION to Compel by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC filed by KEITH M KODOSKY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(KODOSKY, KEITH) Modified on 7/13/2022 (tlf).
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC filed by KEITH M KODOSKY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Wooten Depo, #3 Exhibit Deed, #4 Exhibit modification, #5 Exhibit email, #6 Exhibit Pope letter, #7 Exhibit Fisher letter, #8 Exhibit Closing Statement, #9 Exhibit Access Agreement, #10 Exhibit Timberland Agreement, #11 Exhibit Timber Cutting, #12 Exhibit Perkins email, #13 Exhibit Nutter Memo, #14 Exhibit Echols email, #15 Exhibit Burdett email, #16 Exhibit Real Estate Sales, #17 Exhibit Warranty Deed, #18 Exhibit Quit Claim Deed, #19 Exhibit Settlement Statement, #20 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Response to Interrogatories, #21 Exhibit email, #22 Exhibit Farr Depo, #23 Exhibit email, #24 Exhibit Lumpkin Plans)(KODOSKY, KEITH)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document: #60 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS); Wrong event used. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager. The correct event is AMENDED MOTION since the filing was made to correct the omission of the certificate of service; however, PLEASE NOTE: A certificate of service is only required when a document is served by means other than the court's electronic filing system. (esl)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 AMENDED MOTION re: #59 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR.(BUTLER, JAMES) Modified on 7/5/2022 (esl). amended to add COS
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR.(BUTLER, JAMES) Modified on 7/5/2022 (esl). replaced by motion #60
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document: #58 Notice of Leave of Absence). Pursuant to LR 83.1.5 Leaves of Absence: "Formal applications by attorneys for leaves of absence should not be filed and will not be acted upon..." Should a notice of hearing be issued for which counsel has a conflict, a motion should be filed. No action needed at this time. (esl)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Notice of Leave of Absence(BUTLER, JAMES)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPLY to Response filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC re #45 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails, #2 Exhibit Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit Email)(KODOSKY, KEITH)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY to Response filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC re #49 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails, #2 Exhibit Email and notices)(SHELTON, MARTIN)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Certificate of Need to File Discovery Materials by SILICON RANCH CORPORATION. Related document: #54 MOTION to Compel and for Fees and Expenses filed by SILICON RANCH CORPORATION.(MOSS, ALYCEN)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION to Compel and for Fees and Expenses by SILICON RANCH CORPORATION filed by ALYCEN A MOSS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A SRs 2nd RPDs to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit B Plaintiffs Res to SRCs 2nd RPDs, #4 Exhibit C SRs First RPDs to Westwood, #5 Exhibit D Westwoods Responses to SRCs First RPDs, #6 Exhibit E Email to J. Butler dated 6.14.22, #7 Exhibit F Email to K. Stair dated 6.14.22, #8 Exhibit G Email from J. Butler dated 6.16.22, #9 Exhibit H Email from K. Stair dated 6.16.22, #10 Exhibit I Email from A. Moss dated 6.16.22, #11 Exhibit J Email exchange dated 6.17.22, #12 Silicon Ranch Corporations Certification of Good Faith)(MOSS, ALYCEN)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPLY to Response filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #43 MOTION for Protective OrderMOTION to Quash (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Shaun Harris deposition excerpts, #2 Exhibit Joel Wooten deposition excerpts, #3 Exhibit Amie Harris deposition excerpts, #4 Exhibit Reagan Farr deposition excerpts, #5 Exhibit DX 22 Echols to Burdette email)(BUTLER, JAMES)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE TO MOTION filed by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC re #49 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (BAILEY, MELISSA) Modified text on 6/22/2022 (sbd).
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #45 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena served on Joel Wooten by SRC, #2 Exhibit Shaun Harris Condensed depo transcript)(BUTLER, JAMES)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS re #49 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Excerpts - Erin Harris, #2 Exhibit 1/11/22 email Butler to Moss, #3 Exhibit 3/17/22 email Butler to defense counsel, #4 Exhibit 5/26/22 Butler email, #5 Exhibit 10/22/21 Order Courtland v Union Carbide, #6 Exhibit 3/1/22 Butler letter to IEA SRC, #7 Exhibit 2/18/22 Order Courtland v Union Carbide, #8 Exhibit 5/27/22 Union Carbide response, #9 Exhibit District Court Daybook Entry Courtland v Union Carbide, #10 Exhibit PX 21 Erosion Plan, #11 Exhibit PX 27 6/3/21 Civil Construction Plan, #12 Exhibit 7/3/21 Caudill to White email, #13 Exhibit PX 174 photos)(BUTLER, JAMES)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC filed by MARTIN A SHELTON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Draft Order)(SHELTON, MARTIN)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE filed by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC re #43 MOTION for Protective OrderMOTION to Quash (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Butler, #2 Exhibit Design Plans, #3 Exhibit Wooten Depo, #4 Exhibit Feb 2021 emails, #5 Exhibit Closing. May 2020, #6 Exhibit Closing. Nov. 2020, #7 Exhibit Timberland Service Agreement, #8 Exhibit Interfor Agreement, #9 Exhibit Wayback Agreement, #10 Exhibit Access Agreement, #11 Exhibit Non Party Subpoenas, #12 Exhibit Wooten letter 2014, #13 Exhibit Deed 2012, #14 Exhibit Modification 2020, #15 Exhibit January 2021 email, #16 Exhibit Butler letter 03.09.21, #17 Exhibit Feb 2021 email, #18 Exhibit H&L Farms Depo)(SHELTON, MARTIN)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs' reply brief shall not exceed fifteen pages. If Plaintiffs' reply brief raises new issues not raised in their original brief in support of the motion to quash/motion for protective order, then Defendants shall be permitted to file a 10-page sur-reply 14 days after Plaintiffs file their reply brief. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 06/02/2022 (CCL)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FIRST MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR.(BUTLER, JAMES)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC filed by MARTIN A SHELTON. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Email. Harris Notices, #3 Exhibit Email. H&L Notice, #4 Exhibit Butler email, #5 Exhibit CNA Shaun Harris)(SHELTON, MARTIN)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document: #43 Motion for Protective Order filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS ); Other (The motion seeks two reliefs, but only one was selected at the time of filing. NO NEED TO RE-FILE as the Motion to Quash event has been added by the case manager.) Additionally, the Affidavit, attachment #1 to ECF #43 , was fine as originally filed, but has been re-filed separately at ECF #44 . (esl)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT re #43 MOTION for Protective Order Joel O. Wooten by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX 4 2/12/21 Wooten to Echols email, #2 Exhibit PX 5 10/30/20 Exh B Revised Map, #3 Exhibit PX 25 Map showing property lines, #4 Exhibit PX 26 11/9/20 SRC Plat)(BUTLER, JAMES)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash Subpoena by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A Affidavit of Joel Wooten, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Tony Greco Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit Reagan Farr Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit John Thompson Deposition Excerpts, #5 Exhibit Shaun Harris Deposition Excerpts, #6 Exhibit PX 1 - 3/9/21 Russell to Butler email, #7 Exhibit PX 13 - 4/2/21 photo, #8 Exhibit PX 14 - 4/2/21 photo, #9 Exhibit PX 18 3/9/21 Butler to Silicon Ranch letter, #10 Exhibit PX 20 3/11/21 Allen to Thompson email, #11 Exhibit PX 21 6/3/21 ESPC Intermediate Plan, #12 Exhibit PX 27 6/3/21 Civil Construction Plan, #13 Exhibit 7/3/21 Caudill to White email, #14 Exhibit PX 98 Echols to Wooten email, #15 Exhibit 3/15/21 Baute to Allen and Thompson email, #16 Exhibit PX 124 3/11/21 Thompson to Howe email, #17 Exhibit 5/20/21 Johnson to Butler email)(BUTLER, JAMES). Added MOTION to Quash on 5/17/2022 (esl).
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Non-Parties Potentially at Fault by SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC (MOSS, ALYCEN)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE Non-Parties Potentially at Fault by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC (SHELTON, MARTIN)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #40 Notice (Other) filed by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC ); Discovery is not filed in the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not file discovery in the future. Do not file certificates regarding discovery. See Local Rule 5.1 and the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 15.(esl)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE Notice of Deposition of Erin Harris by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC (BAILEY, MELISSA)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by KENT T STAIR on behalf of WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC Attorney KENT T STAIR added to party WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC(pty:dft)(STAIR, KENT)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE Notice of Substitution of Counsel by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC (BAILEY, MELISSA)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #38 Notice (Other) filed by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES, INC.; This pleading was not signed by Attorney Daenecke and thus, said attorney has not been added to the case. Jordan Teich will be removed from the case. Additionally, it does not appear Kent Stair has ever signed a pleading and is not currently an attorney of record. See Local Rule 83.1.3 and F.R.Civ.P. 5(d)(3)(C) (tlf).
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 2/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement)(esl)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC filed by MARTIN A SHELTON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order)(SHELTON, MARTIN)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan B. Wilhelm on behalf of IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC Attorney Ryan B. Wilhelm added to party IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan B. Wilhelm added to party INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC(pty:dft)(Wilhelm, Ryan)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MARTIN A SHELTON on behalf of IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC Attorney MARTIN A SHELTON added to party IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC(pty:dft), Attorney MARTIN A SHELTON added to party INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC(pty:dft)(SHELTON, MARTIN)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by KEITH M KODOSKY on behalf of IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC Attorney KEITH M KODOSKY added to party IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC(pty:dft), Attorney KEITH M KODOSKY added to party INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC(pty:dft)(KODOSKY, KEITH)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Discovery to be complete by 6/21/2022. Dispositive motions due by 7/21/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 1/28/2022 (esl)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motion to Amend Scheduling Order)(BUTLER, JAMES)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CAROLINE WALKER on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney CAROLINE WALKER added to party H AND L FARMS LLC(pty:pla), Attorney CAROLINE WALKER added to party AMIE HARRIS(pty:pla), Attorney CAROLINE WALKER added to party SHAUN HARRIS(pty:pla)(WALKER, CAROLINE)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #28 Motion To Serve Additional Requests for Production of Documents. Each party may propound five additional requests for production of documents and things. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/06/2021 (CCL)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CONSENT MOTION To Serve Additional Requests for Production of Documents by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR.(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 3/7/2022. Dispositive motions due by 4/6/2022. The motion to supplement the scheduling order (ECF No. #26 ) is denied. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 10/18/2021. (CCL)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION Supplement Joint Report & Proposed Scheduling Order by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS filed by JAMES E BUTLER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Compilation - Harris Complaint with Defendants' Answers)(BUTLER, JAMES)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JORDAN TEICH. (mdm)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3918196, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Melissa Bailey 804341. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing - J. Teich)(TEICH, JORDAN)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Jurisdictional Statement by SR LUMPKIN LLC (MOSS, ALYCEN)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SR LUMPKIN LLC identifying Other Affiliate SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, Other Affiliate SR GEORGIA PORTFOLIO II LESSOR, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MANAGING MEMBER, LLC for SR LUMPKIN LLC. (MOSS, ALYCEN)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Jurisdictional Statement by SILICON RANCH CORPORATION (MOSS, ALYCEN)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SILICON RANCH CORPORATION identifying Other Affiliate CENTRAL ANTELOPE DRY RANCH B LLC, Other Affiliate CHICKASAW SOLAR, LLC, Other Affiliate COMMERCE WAY, LLC, Other Affiliate CUMBERLAND LAND HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate ELKTON, LLC, Other Affiliate ENERGIZE RIPLEY, LLC, Other Affiliate ENFINITY ARIZONA 1 SHOW LOW LLC, Other Affiliate ENFINITY CENTRALVAL 1 LLC, Other Affiliate ENFINITY CENTRALVAL 2 PARLIER LLC, Other Affiliate ENFINITY CENTRALVAL 3 GREENFIELD LLC, Other Affiliate ENFINITY CENTRALVAL 4 CUSD LLC, Other Affiliate ENFINITY CENTRALVAL 6 TAFT LLC, Other Affiliate ENFINITY CENTRALVAL 7 KJUHSD LLC, Other Affiliate GIBSON SOLAR, LLC, Other Affiliate HATTIESBURG FARM BP, LLC, Other Affiliate HATTIESBURG FARM HOLDINGS TIER A, LLC, Other Affiliate HATTIESBURG FARM HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate HATTIESBURG FARM, LLC, Other Affiliate HAYWOOD SOLAR, LLC, Other Affiliate HKCR, LLC, Other Affiliate JMR, LLC, Other Affiliate KISMET SOLAR SANTA MARIA LLC, Other Affiliate LANCASTER SOLAR LLC, Other Affiliate LANCASTER SOLAR HOLDINGS MM, LLC, Other Affiliate LEE SOLAR, LLC, Other Affiliate MARDOM LLC, Other Affiliate ODOM SOLAR LLC, Other Affiliate OKOLONA SOLAR, LLC, Other Affiliate PJLD, LLC, Other Affiliate PROVIDENCE SOLAR CENTER, LLC, Other Affiliate PS LAUDERDALE, LLC, Other Affiliate REGENERATIVE ENERGY, LLC, Other Affiliate RIPLEY SEPI, LLC, Other Affiliate RUSSELLVILLE SOLAR, LLC, Other Affiliate SELMER NORTH I, LLC, Other Affiliate SELMER NORTH II, LLC, Other Affiliate SELMER NORTH MT, LLC, Other Affiliate SILICON RANCH INVESTMENTS, INC., Other Affiliate SIMON SOLAR FARM LLC, Other Affiliate SR ADAMSVILLE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR AGRICENTER, LLC, Other Affiliate SR AILEY, LLC, Other Affiliate SR ARLINGTON, LLC, Other Affiliate SR ARLINGTON II, LLC, Other Affiliate SR ARLINGTON II MT, LLC, Other Affiliate SR BACON, LLC, Other Affiliate SR BAXLEY, LLC, Other Affiliate SR BELL BUCKLE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR BLUFFTON, LLC, Other Affiliate SR BOLIVAR, LLC, Other Affiliate SR BOURBON, LLC, Other Affiliate SR BROWNSVILLE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR BYERS, LLC, Other Affiliate SR CAMDEN MT, LLC, Other Affiliate SR CAMDEN, LLC, Other Affiliate SR CANADAVILLE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR CARROLL, LLC, Other Affiliate SR CEDAR SPRINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SR CLARKSVILLE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR CLARKSVILLE II, LLC, Other Affiliate SR CLAY, LLC, Other Affiliate SR CLINCH, LLC, Other Affiliate SR COLUMBUS, LLC, Other Affiliate SR COPELAND, LLC, Other Affiliate SR DESOTO, LLC, Other Affiliate SR DESOTO I, LLC, Other Affiliate SR DESOTO II, LLC, Other Affiliate SR ENTERPRISE SOUTH, LLC, Other Affiliate SR EPC, LLC, Other Affiliate SR FAYETTE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR FINCO, LLC, Other Affiliate SR FINCO II, LLC, Other Affiliate SR FRANKLIN, LLC, Other Affiliate SR GARRARD, LLC, Other Affiliate SR GEORGIA PORTFOLIO I, LLC, Other Affiliate SR GEORGIA PORTFOLIO I MT, LLC, Other Affiliate SR GEORGIA PORTFOLIO II LESSEE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR GEORGIA PORTFOLIO II LESSOR, LLC, Other Affiliate SR GREENEVILLE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR GREENEVILLE II, LLC, Other Affiliate SR GRUNDY, LLC, Other Affiliate SR HARVEST, LLC, Other Affiliate SR HAZLEHURST, LLC, Other Affiliate SR HAZLEHURST III, LLC, Other Affiliate SR HOUSTON, LLC, Other Affiliate SR HOUSTON HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SR INNOVATION, LLC, Other Affiliate SR JACKSON, LLC, Other Affiliate SR JENKINS, LLC, Other Affiliate SR JONESBOROUGH, LLC, Other Affiliate SR JONESBOROUGH II, LLC, Other Affiliate SR KEMPER, LLC, Other Affiliate SR KERSEY, LLC, Other Affiliate SR KERSEY II, LLC, Other Affiliate SR LAMBERT I, LLC, Other Affiliate SR LAMBERT II, LLC, Other Affiliate SR LIGHTWIND ACQUISITIONS, LLC, Other Affiliate SR LITCHFIELD, LLC, Other Affiliate SR LOUISVILLE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR LUMPKIN, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MADISON, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MANAGING MEMBER, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MARION, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MAVERICKS, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MCKELLAR, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MEMPHIS, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MERIDIAN I, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MERIDIAN II, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MERIDIAN III, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MERIDIAN III BP, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MERIDIAN III HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MERIDIAN IV, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MERIDIAN LEASE HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SR METTER I, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MIDDLETON, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MILLINGTON, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MILLINGTON II, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MONROE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR MONTGOMERY, LLC, Other Affiliate SR NEW ALBANY A, LLC, Other Affiliate SR NEW ALBANY B, LLC, Other Affiliate SR NORTH STONINGTON, LLC, Other Affiliate SR OKOLONA, LLC, Other Affiliate SR OPERATING HOLDCO I, LLC, Other Affiliate SR OPERATING HOLDCO I-A, LLC, Other Affiliate SR OPERATING HOLDCO I-B, LLC, Other Affiliate SR OPERATING HOLDCO I-C, LLC, Other Affiliate SR OPERATING HOLDCO I-D, LLC, Other Affiliate SR OPERATING HOLDCO I-E, LLC, Other Affiliate SR P11C, LLC, Other Affiliate SR PARIS, LLC, Other Affiliate SR PARK PLAZA, LLC, Other Affiliate SR PERRY, LLC, Other Affiliate SR PLATTE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR PG FINANCE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR PUEBLO, LLC, Other Affiliate SR PULASKI, LLC, Other Affiliate SR PURYEAR, LLC, Other Affiliate SR QUINCY VALLEY, LLC, Other Affiliate SR RATTLESNAKE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR REFL LESSEE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR REFL LESSEE II, LLC, Other Affiliate SR REFL LESSEE III, LLC, Other Affiliate SR REFL PLEDGOR, LLC, Other Affiliate SR REFL PLEDGOR II, LLC, Other Affiliate SR REFL PLEDGOR III, LLC, Other Affiliate SR RIPLEY, LLC, Other Affiliate SR RIPLEY II, LLC, Other Affiliate SR RUSSELLVILLE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR SABINE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR SCOTFORD INC., Other Affiliate SR SIMON SOLAR, LLC, Other Affiliate SR SKYLARK B, LLC, Other Affiliate SR SKYLARK C, LLC, Other Affiliate SR SNIPESVILLE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR SNIPESVILLE II, LLC, Other Affiliate SR SNIPESVILLE III, LLC, Other Affiliate SR SOMERVILLE, LLC, Other Affiliate SR SOUTH LOVING HOLDINGS TIER A, LLC, Other Affiliate SR SOUTH LOVING HOLDINGS TIER B, LLC, Other Affiliate SR SOUTH LOVING LLC, Other Affiliate SR TERRELL, LLC, Other Affiliate SR TURKEY CREEK, LLC, Other Affiliate SR TULLAHOMA, LLC, Other Affiliate SR VIDALIA I, LLC, Other Affiliate SR WALKER EAST, LLC, Other Affiliate SR WASHINGTON I, LLC, Other Affiliate SR WASHINGTON II, LLC, Other Affiliate SR WHITE OAK, LLC, Other Affiliate SR WHITE PINE, LLC, Other Affiliate SRC SUNCO, LLC, Other Affiliate SUNE AZ2, LLC, Other Affiliate SUNE EPE2, LLC, Other Affiliate SUNE P11A HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SUNE P11B HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SUNE P11C HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SUNE P11D HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SUNE P11E HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SUNE P11F HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SUNE P11G HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SUNE P11H HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SUNE P11I HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SUNE P11J HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SUNE P11K HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SUNE P11N HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SUNE P11O HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate SUNE P1M HOLDINGS, LLC for SILICON RANCH CORPORATION. (MOSS, ALYCEN)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document: #18 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, #19 Jurisdictional Statement filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC ); Notice to Counsel - (Andrew Horowitz) Your email address in CM/ECF is not current and/or does not match that reflected on the documents referenced above. Please update your email address via PACER.(esl)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Jurisdictional Statement by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC (HOROWITZ, ANDREW)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC identifying Other Affiliate IEA Engineering, LLC, Other Affiliate IEA Engineering North Carolina, LLC for IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC; Other Affiliate IEA, Other Affiliate Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Other Affiliate IEA Energy Services, LLC for INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC. (HOROWITZ, ANDREW)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/15/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 9/3/2021. (tlp)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE Notice of Filing by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC re #10 Answer to Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification)(HOROWITZ, ANDREW)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Jurisdictional Statement by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC (BAILEY, MELISSA)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC identifying Corporate Parent WESTWOOD BUYER, INC., Other Affiliate WESTWOOD PARENT, INC., Other Affiliate ENDURANCE ENGINEERING PARTNERS LP, Other Affiliate OLAYAN GROUP for WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC. (BAILEY, MELISSA)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related documents: #10 Answer to Complaint, filed by INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, #11 Answer to Complaint filed by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC, #12 Answer to Complaint filed by SILICON RANCH CORPORATION and #13 Answer to Complaint filed by SR LUMPKIN LLC); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. Additionally, pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed by each corporate party.(esl)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by SR LUMPKIN LLC.(MOSS, ALYCEN)Attorney ALYCEN A MOSS added to party SR LUMPKIN LLC(pty:dft)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by SILICON RANCH CORPORATION.(MOSS, ALYCEN)Attorney ALYCEN A MOSS added to party SILICON RANCH CORPORATION(pty:dft)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC with Jury Demand.(BAILEY, MELISSA)Attorney MELISSA BAILEY added to party WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC(pty:dft)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC with Jury Demand.(HOROWITZ, ANDREW)Attorney ANDREW D HOROWITZ added to party IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC(pty:dft), Attorney ANDREW D HOROWITZ added to party INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC(pty:dft)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, H AND L FARMS LLC as to IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC. (BUTLER, JAMES)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, H AND L FARMS LLC as to WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC. (BUTLER, JAMES)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, H AND L FARMS LLC as to SR LUMPKIN LLC. (BUTLER, JAMES)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, H AND L FARMS LLC as to SILICON RANCH CORPORATION. (BUTLER, JAMES)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS, H AND L FARMS LLC as to INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC. (BUTLER, JAMES)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to all Defendants (SILICON RANCH CORPORATION, SR LUMPKIN LLC, INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC, IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC, and WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC.) (Attachments: #1 Summons SR Lumpkin, LLC, #2 Summons Infrastructure and Energy Alternatives, Inc., #3 Summons IEA Constructors, LLC, #4 Summons Westwood Professional Services, Inc.)(esl)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by H AND L FARMS LLC (BUTLER, JAMES)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by H AND L FARMS LLC (BUTLER, JAMES)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 12/19/19 Article Walton EMC and Silicon Ranch Announce 125 MWs, #4 Exhibit 1/14/20 Infrastructure and Energy Alternatives press release, #5 Exhibit 1/14/21 IEA Press Release, #6 Exhibit 6/11/21 Memorandum of Solar Ground Release, #7 Exhibit 2020 IEA ESG Report, #8 Exhibit 1/19/21 Construction Review Online Article, #9 Exhibit Locations Westwood Professional Services, #10 Exhibit 1/22/21 Lumpkin Solar Notice of Intent, #11 Exhibit 3/9/21 Email Paul Russell to Jim Butler, #12 Exhibit 5/7/21 IEA Constructors to GA EPD, #13 Exhibit GA SOS Registered Silicon Ranch and SR Corporations, #14 Exhibit 6/16/21 Lumpkin Solar Substation Notice of Intent, #15 Exhibit 4/13/21 Web Soil Survey, #16 Exhibit Affidavit of Dr. Wellington)(BUTLER, JAMES)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document: #1 Complaint (IFP) filed by H AND L FARMS LLC, AMIE HARRIS, SHAUN HARRIS); Complaint filed using the wrong event - COMPLAINT (IFP) resulting in the failure to pay the filing fee. Filing party must immediately pay the filing fee using the event Filing Fee (IFP Denied).(esl)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing Fee (IFP Denied) Paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3864600, $402 (BUTLER, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H AND L FARMS LLC et al v. SILICON RANCH CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H AND L FARMS LLC
Represented By: C COOPER KNOWLES
Represented By: CHARLES FREDERICK OVERBY
Represented By: DANIEL EVAN PHILYAW
Represented By: JAMES E BUTLER, JR
Represented By: CAROLINE WALKER
Represented By: CAROLINE SCHLEY
Represented By: FRANK M LOWREY, IV
Represented By: MICHAEL BRIAN TERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAUN HARRIS
Represented By: C COOPER KNOWLES
Represented By: CHARLES FREDERICK OVERBY
Represented By: DANIEL EVAN PHILYAW
Represented By: JAMES E BUTLER, JR
Represented By: CAROLINE WALKER
Represented By: CAROLINE SCHLEY
Represented By: FRANK M LOWREY, IV
Represented By: MICHAEL BRIAN TERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMIE HARRIS
Represented By: C COOPER KNOWLES
Represented By: CHARLES FREDERICK OVERBY
Represented By: DANIEL EVAN PHILYAW
Represented By: JAMES E BUTLER, JR
Represented By: CAROLINE WALKER
Represented By: CAROLINE SCHLEY
Represented By: FRANK M LOWREY, IV
Represented By: MICHAEL BRIAN TERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILICON RANCH CORPORATION
Represented By: ALYCEN A MOSS
Represented By: DANIELLE C LE JEUNE
Represented By: ANDREW T BAYMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SR LUMPKIN LLC
Represented By: ALYCEN A MOSS
Represented By: DANIELLE C LE JEUNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INFRASTRUCTURE AND ENERGY ALTERNATIVES INC
Represented By: ANDREW D HOROWITZ
Represented By: Burke A. Noble
Represented By: JENNIFER E PARROTT
Represented By: BURKE A NOBLE
Represented By: CHARLES E ROGERS
Represented By: CHARLES K REED
Represented By: HARRY ZACK RIPPEON
Represented By: JEANNE MARIE HARRISON
Represented By: KEITH M KODOSKY
Represented By: MARTIN A SHELTON
Represented By: RYAN B WILHELM
Represented By: STEVEN J STUART
Represented By: SARAH CARPENTER
Represented By: BRENT J BEAVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IEA CONSTRUCTORS LLC
Represented By: ANDREW D HOROWITZ
Represented By: Burke A. Noble
Represented By: JENNIFER E PARROTT
Represented By: BURKE A NOBLE
Represented By: CHARLES E ROGERS
Represented By: CHARLES K REED
Represented By: HARRY ZACK RIPPEON
Represented By: JEANNE MARIE HARRISON
Represented By: KEITH M KODOSKY
Represented By: MARTIN A SHELTON
Represented By: RYAN B WILHELM
Represented By: STEVEN J STUART
Represented By: BRENT J BEAVER
Represented By: SARAH CARPENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTWOOD PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC
Represented By: COREY ROTHSCHILD MENDEL
Represented By: MELISSA BAILEY
Represented By: KENT T STAIR
Represented By: JORDAN TEICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?