BRYANT v. CALVARY CHRISTIAN SCHOOL OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA INC
Plaintiff: JAKETRA BRYANT
Defendant: CALVARY CHRISTIAN SCHOOL OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA INC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00205
Filed: November 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 2/1/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 12/21/2021 (tlf).
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CALVARY CHRISTIAN SCHOOL OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA INC (NGUYEN, HIEU)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CALVARY CHRISTIAN SCHOOL OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA INC.(NGUYEN, HIEU)
December 20, 2021 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #5 Answer to Complaint filed by CALVARY CHRISTIAN SCHOOL OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA, INC.; All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1 (tlf).
December 8, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond re #1 Complaint, by CALVARY CHRISTIAN SCHOOL OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA INC (NGUYEN, HIEU)
November 20, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by JAKETRA BRYANT (EDMONDS, ANGELIK)
November 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons issued as to CALVARY CHRISTIAN SCHOOL OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA, INC. (tlf).
November 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CALVARY CHRISTIAN SCHOOL OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA INC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3948809, $402 filed by JAKETRA BRYANT (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(EDMONDS, ANGELIK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRYANT v. CALVARY CHRISTIAN SCHOOL OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAKETRA BRYANT
Represented By: ANGELIK EDMONDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALVARY CHRISTIAN SCHOOL OF COLUMBUS GEORGIA INC
Represented By: HIEU M NGUYEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?