AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS v. CINQUEMANI
Petitioner: AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS
Respondent: ADRIANA OLIVIERI CINQUEMANI
Case Number: 4:2022cv00031
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2022 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/4/2022, before Judge Clay D. Land. Court Reporter/Transcriber Betsy Peterson. Volume Number: I of I. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (Peterson, Betsy)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order and FINAL JUDGMENT requiring respondent to submit any and all claims relating to her contractual engagement with AFLAC to arbitration and enjoining her from taking further steps in prosecuting any claims regarding her contractual engagement with AFLAC other than through arbitration. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 03/09/2022 (tlf).
March 4, 2022 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND: Motion Hearing held on 3/4/2022 re #8 MOTION for Hearing filed by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS (Court Reporter Betsy Peterson.)Plaintiff- Brooks Suttle. AFLAC in house counsel- Catherin C Jinks. Megan E Ross, Respondents counsel in the related California case observed the hearing, spoke but has not made in appearance in the case. Respondent challenges Jurisdiction in this matter. The Court made a ruling and will issue a written Order. Plaintiff will provide the Court a proposed Order. For more detailed information please see official transcript. Court Reporter: Betsy Peterson. (glg)
February 28, 2022 Filing 10 Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2022 02:00 PM EASTERN time via ZOOM video conference before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTION for an Expedited Hearing on Petition to Compel Arbitration will occur via VIDEOCONFERENCE. Counsel will receive connection information by separate email. Interested parties may obtain dial information by emailing Columbus.ecf@gamd.uscourts.gov. (glg)
February 25, 2022 Filing 9 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #8 Motion for Hearing on Petition to Compel Arbitration. A hearing shall be held via ZOOM on March 4, 2022 beginning at 2:00 P.M. Counsel for Plaintiff shall make sure this order for hearing is promptly served electronically upon Defendant and her counsel. The parties will be notified how to connect to the remote hearing. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on February 25, 2022 (CDL)
February 23, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Hearing by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS filed by BROOKS A SUTTLE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Hearing on Petition to Compel Arbitration, #2 Affidavit Suttle Declaration)(SUTTLE, BROOKS)
February 8, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS as to ADRIANA OLIVIERI CINQUEMANI. (SUTTLE, BROOKS)
February 8, 2022 Filing 6 Replaced by D.E. #7 . CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS re #1 Complaint, #4 Memorandum in Support, #5 Summons Issued (SUTTLE, BROOKS) Modified on 2/8/2022 (tlf).
February 8, 2022 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #6 Certificate of Service filed by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS ); Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Civil Events, Initial Pleadings and Service, Service of Process, Summons Returned Executed (tlf).
February 4, 2022 Filing 5 Summons issued as to ADRIANA OLIVIERI CINQUEMANI (tlf).
February 4, 2022 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Complaint, Petition to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ensor Declaration, #2 Affidavit Strickland Declaration, #3 Exhibit Relevant Court Orders)(SUTTLE, BROOKS)
February 4, 2022 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS (SUTTLE, BROOKS)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS identifying Corporate Parent AFLAC INCORPORATED, Other Affiliate AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE CO. OF NEW YORK for AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS. (SUTTLE, BROOKS)
February 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adriana Olivieri Cinquemani Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4009673, $402 filed by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(SUTTLE, BROOKS)
February 4, 2022 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS v. CINQUEMANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF COLUMBUS
Represented By: R STEVE ENSOR
Represented By: BROOKS A SUTTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ADRIANA OLIVIERI CINQUEMANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?