MANORS AT INNISBROOK HOA INC v. AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: MANORS AT INNISBROOK HOA INC
Defendant: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2022cv00040
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2022 Filing 8 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 12/5/2022. Dispositive motions due by 1/19/2023. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 4/5/2022. (esl)
March 8, 2022 Filing 7 Jurisdictional Statement by MANORS AT INNISBROOK HOA INC (MULLIN, C)
March 8, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MANORS AT INNISBROOK HOA INC (MULLIN, C)
February 22, 2022 Filing 5 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 4/5/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 2/22/2022. (esl)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 Jurisdictional Statement by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (PHILLIPS, JESSICA)
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate HOME-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate PROPERTY-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate AUTO-OWNERS LIFE INSURANCE, Other Affiliate AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY for AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PHILLIPS, JESSICA)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand.(PHILLIPS, JESSICA)Attorney JESSICA M PHILLIPS added to party AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4020858, $402 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal - Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate)(PHILLIPS, JESSICA)
February 18, 2022 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Notice of Removal; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager. All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1 (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MANORS AT INNISBROOK HOA INC v. AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANORS AT INNISBROOK HOA INC
Represented By: C MORRIS MULLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JESSICA M PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?