MARTINEZ v. BARR et al
Petitioner: SANTOS LAZO MARTINEZ
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, RONALD D VITIELLO and Warden MICHAEL J DONAHUE
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2022cv00068
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2022 Filing 9 STATEMENT in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by SANTOS LAZO MARTINEZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(esl)
May 16, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D.O. Lydia Gainey, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Santos Lazo-Martinez, #3 Exhibit B - Order of the Immigration Judge, #4 Exhibit C - Warrant of Removal, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Intent/Decision to Reinstate Prior Order, #6 Exhibit E - Decision to Continue Detention Letter)(GRANTHAM, ROGER)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4/21/2022. (msg)
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL J DONAHUE, KEVIN K MCALEENAN, RONALD D VITIELLO (GRANTHAM, ROGER)
April 19, 2022 Filing 5 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4/19/2022. (msg)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by SANTOS LAZO MARTINEZ. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4/18/2022. (msg)
April 18, 2022 Filing fee Paid: Habeas $7.00; RECEIPT NUMBER: 42836 (tam)
April 15, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by SANTOS LAZO MARTINEZ. (Attachments: #1 Account Certification, #2 Filing fee paid / manual receipt, #3 Envelope). Motion referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(esl)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by SANTOS LAZO MARTINEZ (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf).
April 4, 2022 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by SANTOS LAZO MARTINEZ; You must either pay the filing fee or submit a properly completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis within 21 days from the date of this notice. Failure to comply with this notice may result in dismissal by the court. An application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit are enclosed (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTINEZ v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SANTOS LAZO MARTINEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: ROGER GRANTHAM, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN K MCALEENAN
Represented By: ROGER GRANTHAM, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: ROGER GRANTHAM, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden MICHAEL J DONAHUE
Represented By: ROGER GRANTHAM, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?