JAMES et al v. CITY OF CUTHBERT, GEORGIA et al
Plaintiff: DORIS EDWARDS JAMES, KOREN EDWARDS and CHARLIE NUNNALLY
Defendant: KEVIN BRIAN FLOWERS, DAVID WAYNE HUNNICUT, JR and CUTHBERT GEORGIA
Case Number: 4:2022cv00077
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Filing 12 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 1/27/2023. Dispositive motions due by 3/13/2023. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 6/10/2022 (tlf).
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by TIFFANY L CARPENTER (tam)
May 16, 2022 Filing 10 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by All Plaintiffs Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4088498, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: William S. Stone, GSBN: 684636. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing COGS for Tiffany W. Carpenter)(CARPENTER, TIFFANY)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by HIRLYE R RYAN LUTZ, III. (mdm)
May 12, 2022 Filing 8 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by All Plaintiffs Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4087271, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: William S. Stone, GSBN: 684636. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing COGS for Hirlye R. Lutz, III)(LUTZ, HIRLYE)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by LEILA H WATSON (mdm)
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by All Plaintiffs Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4086924, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: William S. Stone, GSBN: 684636. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing COGS for Leila Watson)(WATSON, LEILA)
May 9, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint by CUTHBERT GEORGIA, KEVIN BRIAN FLOWERS. (CHOY, SUN)
April 28, 2022 Filing 4 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 6/9/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 4/28/2022 (tlf).
April 27, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, by CUTHBERT GEORGIA, KEVIN BRIAN FLOWERS with Jury Demand.(CHOY, SUN)
April 27, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, by DAVID WAYNE HUNNICUT, JR with Jury Demand.(HYDE, W)
April 27, 2022 Second Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #2 Answer to Complaint filed by DAVID WAYNE HUNNICUT JR.; Notice to Counsel: W. Brent Hyde. The e-mail address on the document does not match your e mail address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your e mail address via PACER (tlf).
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against KOREN EDWARDS, DORIS E. JAMES Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4069777, $402 filed by CITY OF CUTHBERT, GEORGIA, KEVIN BRIAN FLOWERS (Attachments: #1 Removal Documents Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Superior Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case.(GRUNBERG, STEVEN)
April 20, 2022 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Notice of Removal filed by KEVIN BRIAN FLOWERS; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager (tlf).
April 20, 2022 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Notice of Removal filed by KEVIN BRIAN FLOWERS; Notice to Counsel: W. Brent Hyde. The e mail address on the document does not match your e mail address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your e mail address via PACER (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAMES et al v. CITY OF CUTHBERT, GEORGIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DORIS EDWARDS JAMES
Represented By: WILLIAM S STONE
Represented By: HIRLYE R RYAN LUTZ, III
Represented By: LEILA H WATSON
Represented By: TIFFANY L CARPENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KOREN EDWARDS
Represented By: WILLIAM S STONE
Represented By: HIRLYE R RYAN LUTZ, III
Represented By: LEILA H WATSON
Represented By: TIFFANY L CARPENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLIE NUNNALLY
Represented By: WILLIAM S STONE
Represented By: HIRLYE R RYAN LUTZ, III
Represented By: LEILA H WATSON
Represented By: TIFFANY L CARPENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN BRIAN FLOWERS
Represented By: SUN S CHOY
Represented By: STEVEN LIAM GRUNBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID WAYNE HUNNICUT, JR
Represented By: W BRENT HYDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUTHBERT GEORGIA
Represented By: SUN S CHOY
Represented By: STEVEN LIAM GRUNBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?