LITTLE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION and COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Claimant: Phillip Little
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2023cv00147
Filed: August 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to #4 Complaint (IFP) by COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Certification Page, #2 Court Transcript Index, #3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #4 Payment Documents and Decisions, #5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #6 Non Disability Related Development, #7 Disability Related Development, #8 Medical Records Part 1, #9 Medical Records Part 2, #10 Medical Records Part 3)(WETZEL, TYLER)Attorney TYLER J WETZEL added to party COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY(pty:dft)
August 29, 2023 Filing 13 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER noting payment of filing fees on August 22, 2023. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8/29/2023. (mlb)
August 29, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by PHILLIP LITTLE re #11 Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt Showing Payment)(WILLIAMS, MELANIE)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8/28/2023. (mlb)
August 22, 2023 Filing fee Paid: IFP Denied $402.00, receipt AGAMDC-4442495 (tlf).
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8/18/2023. (mlb)
August 18, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PHILLIP LITTLE filed by MELANIE N WILLIAMS.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(WILLIAMS, MELANIE)
August 17, 2023 Filing 8 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by PHILLIP LITTLE (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(WILLIAMS, MELANIE)
August 17, 2023 Filing 6 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by PHILLIP LITTLE (WILLIAMS, MELANIE)
August 17, 2023 Notice of Deficiency: Related documents: #6 Complaint (IFP) filed by PHILLIP LITTLE, #8 Complaint (IFP) filed by PHILLIP LITTLE; The complaint was re-filed twice. The CM/ECF procedures manual provides: Participants must not attempt to re-file a document incorrectly filed unless requested by the Court or the Clerks office. The Rule 9.2 certification was correctly re-filed as requested by the Clerk's office. The Court Ordered plaintiff to re-file a motion to proceed IFP within 7 days and is still pending (tlf).
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Response. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8/16/2023. (mlb)
August 16, 2023 Filing 4 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by PHILLIP LITTLE (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Required Form Social Security Identification Form)(WILLIAMS, MELANIE)
August 16, 2023 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to PHILLIP LITTLE (tlf).
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
August 16, 2023 Notice of Deficiency: Related document: #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by PHILLIP LITTLE; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Notice of Deficiency: You must submit Local Rule 9.2 Social Security Identification Form Notice of Deficiency: Complaint must be filed using event Civil Events, Initial Pleadings and Service, Attorney Initiating Documents, Complaint (IFP) (tlf).
August 16, 2023 Notice of Deficiency: Related document: #4 Complaint (IFP) filed by PHILLIP LITTLE; The Local Rule 9.2 Social Security Identification Form must be filed separately and not as an attachment to the complaint using the event Civil Events, Other Filings, Other Documents, Local Rule 9.2 Social Security Identification Form. Notice of Deficiency: Notice to Counsel: Melanie Williams. The e-mail address on the document does not match your e-mail address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your e-mail address via PACER (tlf).
August 15, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Phillip Little filed by MELANIE N WILLIAMS.(WILLIAMS, MELANIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LITTLE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: TYLER J WETZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Phillip Little
Represented By: MELANIE N WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?