EPPS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: VALERIA EPPS
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Not Classified By Court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2023cv00162
Filed: September 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 7422 Appeal from Administrative Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF Reply by VALERIA EPPS. (WHITLOCK, KATHRYN)
October 25, 2023 Notice of Deficiency: Related document: #10 Waiver of Reply filed by VALERIA EPPS; The document attached was not a waiver of service, but rather a request for waiver of service. Service of social security cases in the Middle District of Georgia is accomplished via the CM/ECF. No service documents should be filed. Local Rule 9.2 provides: " Service will be considered complete when CM/ECF generates electronic service of the Complaint and Social Security Identification Form on the U.S. Attorneys Office and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. The U.S. Attorneys Office for the Middle District of Georgia and the Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration agree not to raise insufficient service as a defense if service of those documents is made electronically through CM/ECF. " (tlf).
October 25, 2023 Notice of Deficiency (related document: #1 Complaint, filed by VALERIA EPPS); You must submit Local Rule 9.2 Social Security Identification Form.(esl)
September 29, 2023 Filing 9 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying #8 MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 9-29-23. (jdl)
September 29, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration re 5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VALERIA EPPS filed by KATHRYN S WHITLOCK. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(WHITLOCK, KATHRYN)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ANNA KING. (mdm)
September 26, 2023 Filing 6 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of VALERIA EPPS Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4468329, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Kathryn Whitlock 756233. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(KING, ANNA)
September 20, 2023 Filing 5 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 9/20/2023. (mlb)
September 19, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VALERIA EPPS filed by KATHRYN S WHITLOCK. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(WHITLOCK, KATHRYN)
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to VALERIA EPPS (esl)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (esl)
September 19, 2023 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by VALERIA EPPS ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.Other (The Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis was erroneously attached to the Complaint. For the motion to be considered by the court, the motion must be refiled and the supporting affidavit should be attached to that motion.)(esl)
September 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4462093, $402 filed by Valeria Epps (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(WHITLOCK, KATHRYN) (Attachment 3 replaced with a flattened version on 9/19/2023) (esl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EPPS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIA EPPS
Represented By: KATHRYN S WHITLOCK
Represented By: ANNA KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?