FARLEY v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC et al
Plaintiff: ANGELA FARLEY
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC doing business as WINTHROP US and CARACO PHARMACEUTICAL LABORATORIES, LTD.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00184
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 18 Mail Returned- Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement sent to Attorney DARIN LEE SCHANKER of Colorado returned as undeliverable. (tlp)
December 5, 2023 Filing 17 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER In light of the notice of voluntary dismissal as to all defendants except Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC and Sanofi US Services, Inc. (ECF No. 4475 in 2:16-md-2740 (E.D. La. Oct. 2, 2018)), the Clerk is instructed to terminate Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. as a defendant in this action. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/05/2023. (CCL)
December 4, 2023 Filing 16 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 1/12/2024. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/4/2023. (esl)
December 4, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ROBERT M HAMMERS, JR on behalf of ANGELA FARLEY Attorney ROBERT M HAMMERS, JR added to party ANGELA FARLEY(pty:pla)(HAMMERS, ROBERT)
November 16, 2023 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Darin Schanker, Jere Bachus, and John Elliott. Counsel are notified they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. Defendants' counsel complied with the initial notice, yet there has been nothing from plaintiff's counsel. If plaintiff's counsel does not comply with all admittance requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice admissions fees, within 14 days of this notice, the presiding judge will be notified that a show cause hearing is required. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements (tlf).
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by CHRISTOPHER PAUL GRAMLING (mdm)
November 10, 2023 Filing 13 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4501436, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Jason S. Allard, 660305 and Joshua L. Becker, 046046. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - List of Middle Georgia Pro Hac Cases intended to be filed, #2 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(GRAMLING, CHRISTOPHER)
November 9, 2023 Filing 12 Jurisdictional Statement by SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC (ALLARD, JASON)
November 9, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC identifying Corporate Parent SANOFI for SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC. (ALLARD, JASON)
November 9, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JASON ALLARD on behalf of SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC Attorney JASON ALLARD added to party SANOFI US SERVICES INC(pty:dft), Attorney JASON ALLARD added to party SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC(pty:dft)(ALLARD, JASON)
November 9, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JOSHUA L BECKER on behalf of SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC Attorney JOSHUA L BECKER added to party SANOFI US SERVICES INC(pty:dft), Attorney JOSHUA L BECKER added to party SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC(pty:dft)(BECKER, JOSHUA)
October 31, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-15540. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to Middle District of Georgia. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go) [Transferred from laed on 10/31/2023.]
October 31, 2023 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Darin Schanker, Jere Bachus, John Elliott, and Christopher Gramling. Counsel are notified they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing may be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements (tlf).
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Byard, Adrienne) [Transferred from laed on 10/31/2023.]
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 10/31/2023.]
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 10/31/2023.]
January 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (cc) [Transferred from laed on 10/31/2023.]
December 13, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from laed on 10/31/2023.]
December 7, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6520537) filed by Angela Farley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)Attorney Jere Kyle Bachus added to party Angela Farley(pty:pla).(Bachus, Jere) [Transferred from laed on 10/31/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FARLEY v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAUL GRAMLING
Represented By: JASON ALLARD
Represented By: JOSHUA L BECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAUL GRAMLING
Represented By: JASON ALLARD
Represented By: JOSHUA L BECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC doing business as WINTHROP US
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAUL GRAMLING
Represented By: JASON ALLARD
Represented By: JOSHUA L BECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARACO PHARMACEUTICAL LABORATORIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA FARLEY
Represented By: ROBERT M HAMMERS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?