SIRLS v. MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL NURSES STAFF
Plaintiff: JAMES SIRLS
Defendant: MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL NURSES STAFF
Case Number: 4:2023cv00204
Filed: December 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for release and request for copies of case documents - Filed by JAMES SIRLS. (Attachments: #1 Grievance re: Request to facility for Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(tlp)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 1-30-24. (jdl)
January 24, 2024 Filing 5 Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerks Extension re #3 ORDER to file Motion to Proceed IFP by JAMES SIRLS - The clerk cannot grant an extension in this circumstance. Plaintiff has filed a separate motion for the same relief at ECF #4 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(esl)
January 24, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Proceed IFP. Filed by JAMES SIRLS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(esl)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Plaintiff to pay the filing fee or submit a proper and complete motion to proceed IFP. The Clerk is directed to provide Plaintiff with the appropriate forms. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 1-2-24. (jdl)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
December 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by JAMES SIRLS against MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL NURSES STAFF (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIRLS v. MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL NURSES STAFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES SIRLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL NURSES STAFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?