SEPTOO v. DICKERSON
Petitioner: GARY SEPTOO
Respondent: TERRENCE DICKERSON and ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Other: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Case Number: 4:2024cv00029
Filed: February 27, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Filing 15 SURREPLY filed by TERRENCE DICKERSON re #13 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply (GRANTHAM, ROGER)
April 24, 2024 Filing 14 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting Respondent's #13 Motion for Leave to File. Respondent's surreply shall not exceed five (5) pages and shall be filed within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4/24/2024. (mlb)
April 24, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by TERRENCE DICKERSON filed by ROGER GRANTHAM, JR.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(GRANTHAM, ROGER)
April 22, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Petitioner as to #9 RESPONSE in Opposition to #1 Petition (URENA, RAFAEL) Modified on 4/23/2024 - to modify text for clarity (tlp).
April 11, 2024 Filing 11 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting Petitioner's #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall have through and including April 22, 2024, to file his reply brief. The Court assumes that Petitioner's proposed order [10-1] shows the correct date sought by Petitioner, as Petitioner's motion #10 appears to contain several typographical errors in regard to the date sought by Petitioner. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4/11/2024. (mlb)
April 10, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Reply to Response. by GARY SEPTOO filed by RAFAEL URENA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(URENA, RAFAEL)
April 1, 2024 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Declaration of DO Barry P. Jansen, #2 Exhibit A - Notice and Order of Expedited Removal, dated 5-18-2021, #3 Exhibit B - Notice to Alien Ordered Removed/Departure Verification, dated 5-18-2021, #4 Exhibit C - Warrant Documents, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Intent/Decision to Reinstate Prior Order, dated 1-13-2023, #6 Exhibit E - USDC Sentencing Sheet, #7 Exhibit F - Notice of Referral to IJ, dated 3-13-2023, #8 Exhibit G - Order of the IJ, placing Petitioner in WH proceedings, dated 3-17-2023, #9 Exhibit H - Motion for Bond and Custody Redetermination, dated 5-9-2023, #10 Exhibit I - Bond Request Denied April 2023, #11 Exhibit J - Order from IJ, dated 5-9-2023, #12 Exhibit K - BIA Decision, dated 11-30-2023, #13 Exhibit L - Decision to Continue Detention Letter, dated 5-25-2023, #14 Exhibit M - Decision to Continue Detention Letter, dated 8-24-2023, #15 Exhibit N - November 2023 POCR decision, #16 Exhibit O - Petitioners Request for Redetermination, 11-2023, #17 Exhibit P - Bond Order, dated 11-28-2023, #18 Exhibit Q - Order from IJ, dated 2-29-2024, #19 Exhibit R - Criminal Complaint & Affidavit, dated 1-17-2023)(GRANTHAM, ROGER)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 3/1/2024. (mlb)
March 1, 2024 Filing 7 RETURN RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by TERRENCE DICKERSON (GRANTHAM, ROGER)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by RAFAEL URENA. (mdm)
February 28, 2024 Filing 5 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of GARY SEPTOO Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4587291, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Helen L. Parsonage, 435330. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(URENA, RAFAEL)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner. The Clerk is directed to correct the docket to reflect Terrence Dickerson, Warden of Stewart Detention Center, as the sole Respondent. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 2/27/2024. (mlb)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
February 27, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by HELEN LOUISE PARSONAGE on behalf of Gary Septoo Attorney HELEN LOUISE PARSONAGE added to party Gary Septoo(pty:pet)(PARSONAGE, HELEN)
February 27, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst Terrance Dickenson, Alejandro Mayorkas Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4585972, $5 filed by Gary Septoo (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(URENA, RAFAEL)
February 27, 2024 Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by GARY SEPTOO; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager (tlf).
February 27, 2024 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RAFAEL URENA: Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements (tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEPTOO v. DICKERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GARY SEPTOO
Represented By: HELEN LOUISE PARSONAGE
Represented By: RAFAEL URENA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TERRENCE DICKERSON
Represented By: ROGER GRANTHAM, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?