VAN NESS v. COUNTRYMAN et al
Petitioner: KEVIS VAN NESS
Respondent: Sheriff GREGORY COUNTRYMAN and MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL
Case Number: 4:2024cv00031
Filed: March 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: STEPHEN HYLES
Referring Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4/17/2024. (mlb)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner shall have FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order to pay the $5.00 filing fee. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 3-27-24. (jdl)
March 26, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by KEVIS VAN NESS (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge STEPHEN HYLES (tlf).
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to pay the filing fee or submit a proper motion to proceed IFP including a Prisoner Account Statement (Certified Copy). The Clerk is directed to forward the proper forms to Plaintiff. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 3/6/2024. (mlb)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tlp)
March 4, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst GREGORY COUNTRYMAN, MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL - filed by KEVIS VAN NESS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VAN NESS v. COUNTRYMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KEVIS VAN NESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff GREGORY COUNTRYMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?