Wright v. Henderson et al
Plaintiff: Willie Wright
Defendant: Dr. Henderson, Brian Owens and Anthony Henderson
Case Number: 5:2010cv00201
Filed: May 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING 47 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 8/15/2012. (tlh)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER adopting 43 Report and Recommendations and granting 32 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 7/27/2012. (tlh)
August 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING 5 Report and Recommendations. The claims against Defendant Brian Owens and Defendant Anthony Henderson are DISMISSED. The claims against the remaining Defendant Dr. Henderson shall remain pending. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 8/21/2010. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Henderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?