Thiele Kaolin Company et al v. BNSF Railway Compay

Plaintiff: Thiele Kaolin Company and Kamin LLC
Defendant: BNSF Railway Compay
Case Number: 5:2010cv00218
Filed: June 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: C. Ashley Royal
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING 33 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 3/29/2011. (tlh)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. BNSFs Third-Party Complaint is dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) for lack of personal jurisdiction. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 2/18/2011. (tlh)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING 20 Motion To Strike, Sever or Try the Third-Party Complaint separately. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 12/23/2010. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thiele Kaolin Company et al v. BNSF Railway Compay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thiele Kaolin Company
Represented By: Thomas F. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamin LLC
Represented By: Thomas F. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Compay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?