Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company v. Thigpen et al
Plaintiff: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Defendant: William Thomas Thigpen, III, Kellie Amanda Thigpen, Jennie Lorin Thigpen and Judy Thigpen
Case Number: 5:2010cv00264
Filed: July 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Discharge. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 2/2/2011. (nbp)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER for Response to Motion re: 24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Judy Thigpen. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 1/24/2011. (nbp)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing Plaintiff to respond in writing to the Court not later than 12/1/2010 as to status of service. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 11/23/2010. (nbp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company v. Thigpen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bondurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Thomas Thigpen, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellie Amanda Thigpen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennie Lorin Thigpen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Thigpen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?