Tharpe (DEATH PENALTY) v. Upton
Petitioner: Keith Tharpe (DEATH PENALTY)
Respondent: Stephen Upton
Case Number: 5:2010cv00433
Filed: November 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Butts
Presiding Judge: C. Ashley Royal
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Denying 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Keith Tharpe (DEATH PENALTY). Ordered by U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL on 3/6/14. (lap)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner's final merits brief is due within 60 days from the date of this Order. Respondent has 60 days from the date Petitioner files his brief to submit his Response. Petitioner has 30 days to file a Reply. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 5/18/12. (lap)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 42 Motion for Discovery. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 1/20/12 (lap)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER on Procedural Default and Exhaustion. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 8/18/2011. (lap)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Brian S. Kammer is appointed to represent Petitioner. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 11/23/10 (lap)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tharpe (DEATH PENALTY) v. Upton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith Tharpe (DEATH PENALTY)
Represented By: Brian S. Kammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Upton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?