Martin v. McDaniel et al.
Plaintiff: |
James M Martin |
Defendant: |
Wakenya Harris and Johnny McDaniel |
Case Number: |
5:2011cv00192 |
Filed: |
May 19, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia |
Office: |
Macon Office |
County: |
Wilcox |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen Hyles |
Presiding Judge: |
Marc Thomas Treadwell |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 10, 2013 |
Filing
66
ORDER DENYING 64 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 7/10/2013. (tlh)
|
May 22, 2013 |
Filing
62
ORDER DENYING 61 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, which the Court construes as a Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 5/22/2013. (tlh)
|
April 11, 2013 |
Filing
58
ORDER DENYING 57 Request for Enbanc Ruling on Magistrate Judges Err. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 4/11/2013. (tlh)
|
March 6, 2013 |
Filing
55
ORDER ADOPTING 53 Report and Recommendations, GRANTING 38 Motion to Dismiss Complaint, DENYING AS MOOT 33 Motion Quasi in rem jurisdiction; DENYING AS MOOT 36 Motion for Court to Enforce Administrative Summons; DENYING AS MOOT 41 Motio n to Stay; DENYING AS MOOT 44 Motion to Amend/Correct; DENYING AS MOOT 46 Motion to Reinstitute and Process Summons; DENYING AS MOOT 49 Motion; DENYING AS MOOT 50 Motion to Amend/Correct. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 3/6/2013. (tlh)
|
December 20, 2011 |
Filing
25
ORDER directing service on Brian Owens, the Commissioner of the Department of Corrections, for the limited purpose of allowing Plaintiff to discover Defendant Johnny McDaniel's proper address for personal service. 24 MOTION for Court to order Warden Robert Toole to give the Court the address of defendant Lt. Johnny McDaniel is denied at this time. Ordered by US Mag Judge Stephen Hyles on 12/20/11. (AGH)
|
October 24, 2011 |
Filing
21
ORDER ADOPTING 16 Report and Recommendations. The Plaintiff may amend his complaint to add an allegation that Defendant McDaniel ordered inmate Wakenya Harris to attack him. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 10/24/2011. (tlh)
|
October 14, 2011 |
Filing
20
ORDER denying 15 Motion for Entry of Default and requiring Plaintiff to provide current address for Defendant McDaniel within thirty (30) days. Ordered by US Mag Judge Stephen Hyles on 10/14/11. (AGH)
|
September 19, 2011 |
Filing
16
ORDER granting 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 11 Amended Complaint - It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's claims against WARDEN TOOLE and the GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS be DISMISSED. Ordered by US Mag Judge Stephen Hyles on 9/19/11. (AGH) Modified on 9/19/2011 (ans).
|
July 1, 2011 |
Filing
7
ORDER ADOPTING 5 Report and Recommendations. All claims against Defendant Harris, the FTCA claim against Defendant McDaniel, and the property deprivation claim against Defendant McDaniel are DISMISSED. The Plaintiffs § 1983 claim against Defendant McDaniel shall remain pending. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 7/1/2011. (tlh)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?