TABATABEE v. HOLDER et al
Petitioner: CASEY KIA TABATABEE
Respondent: ERIC HOLDER, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, DAVID BARROW and WASHINGTON STATE PRISON
Case Number: 5:2012cv00217
Filed: June 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Bibb
Presiding Judge: Stephen Hyles
Presiding Judge: Marc Thomas Treadwell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING 18 Motion for Certificate of Appealability and DENYING 20 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 10/4/2012. (tlh)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING 10 Report and Recommendations, DISMISSING 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, FINDING AS MOOT 14 Motion for Reconsideration, and FINDING AS MOOT 15 Motion to Strike for Sanctions. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 9/7/2012. (tlh)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Except as stated in this Order, Petitioner's (8) Motion for Clarification is DENIED in case 5:12-cv-00217-MTT-MSH; Except as stated in this Order, Petitioner's (7) Motion for Clarification is DENIED in case 5:12-cv-00219-MTT-MSH. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 6/28/2012. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TABATABEE v. HOLDER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CASEY KIA TABATABEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ERIC HOLDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAVID BARROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WASHINGTON STATE PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?