MILLER et al v. BIBB COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT et al

Plaintiff: LESTER M MILLER, GARY BECHTEL and BRENDA SUTTON
Defendant: MACON BIBB COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND VOTER REGISTRATION, ELAINE CARR and BIBB COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Case Number: 5:2012cv00239
Filed: June 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Bibb
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 21 Motion to Extend Time. The Court will not stay the briefing schedule and orders parties to file briefs in accordance with traditional briefing schedule. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 10/03/2012. (nbp)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Motion Regarding Advance Voting. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 7/16/2012. (nbp)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on June 29, 2012. (mbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER et al v. BIBB COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACON BIBB COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND VOTER REGISTRATION
Represented By: Virgil Louis Adams
Represented By: Donald James Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELAINE CARR
Represented By: Virgil Louis Adams
Represented By: Donald James Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIBB COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Andrea L. Jolliffe
Represented By: Patrick Neill Millsaps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESTER M MILLER
Represented By: David Frank Walbert
Represented By: Allan Leroy Parks, Jr.
Represented By: CHARLES E COX, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY BECHTEL
Represented By: Allan Leroy Parks, Jr.
Represented By: CHARLES E COX, JR
Represented By: David Frank Walbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA SUTTON
Represented By: CHARLES E COX, JR
Represented By: Allan Leroy Parks, Jr.
Represented By: David Frank Walbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?