VERDI v. WILKINSON COUNTY GEORGIA et al
Plaintiff: BILLIE JEAN VERDI
Defendant: R AND R LAND SALES, JOHN W ROBERTS, JOHN AND OR JANE DOE and WILKINSON COUNTY GEORGIA
Case Number: 5:2012cv00488
Filed: December 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Wilkinson
Presiding Judge: Marc Thomas Treadwell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:3114 Motion for Return of Seized Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 23 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 8/27/2013. (tlh)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING 17 Motion to Amend/Restate; DENYING 18 Motion for Review. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 3/11/2013. (tlh)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING 13 Petitioner's Second Motion to Amend and Restate Civil Case and DENYING 14 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 1/31/2013. (tlh)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING 2 and 7 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 1 Complaint. 5 Motion for Emergency Return of Danny Verdi is MOOT. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 1/9/2013. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VERDI v. WILKINSON COUNTY GEORGIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R AND R LAND SALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN W ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND OR JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILKINSON COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLIE JEAN VERDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?