BRADLEY et al v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION et al
Plaintiff: CHERRYE E BRADLEY and PAUL E BRADLEY
Defendant: CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC and PROMISS SOLUTIONS LLC
Case Number: 5:2013cv00180
Filed: May 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Butts
Presiding Judge: Marc Thomas Treadwell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING 31 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 1/3/2014. (tlh)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING 28 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 12/10/2013. (tlh)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING 24 Rule 60 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 11/12/2013. (tlh)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and GRANTING 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The case is dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 9/18/2013. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRADLEY et al v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC
Represented By: Shanon J McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Shanon J McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC
Represented By: Shanon J McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROMISS SOLUTIONS LLC
Represented By: BRETT C GIORDANO
Represented By: Jimmy Thomas Howell, Jr.
Represented By: KYLE CLARK SPURGEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERRYE E BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL E BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?