BUTTS (DEATH PENALTY) v. CHATMAN et al
Defendant: BRUCE CHATMAN
Petitioner: ROBERT EARL BUTTS
Respondent: GEORGIA DIAGNOSTIC AND CLASSIFICATION PRISON
Case Number: 5:2013cv00194
Filed: May 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Butts
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING 54 Motion Relief From a Final Judgment, Order, Or Proceeding Pursuant to Federal Rule 60(b) and DENYING 60 Motion to Stay. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/23/2018. (tlh)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ROBERT EARL BUTTS. The Court issues a COA on the following issue: Trial and appellate counsel were ineffective for failing to investigate, develop, and present mitigating evidence during the sentencing phase of Butts's trial. In relation to all other claims, grounds, and issues raised in 1 Butts's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, the Court finds the standard for the grant of a COA has not been met. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 10/16/2015. (tlh)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING 19 Motion for Discovery and an Evidentiary Hearing and instructs the Parties to comply with the September 30, 2013 Scheduling Order for future briefs. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 1/15/2014. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUTTS (DEATH PENALTY) v. CHATMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROBERT EARL BUTTS
Represented By: PHILIP E HOLLADAY, JR
Represented By: W. Ray Persons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GEORGIA DIAGNOSTIC AND CLASSIFICATION PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE CHATMAN
Represented By: SABRINA D GRAHAM
Represented By: Richard Tangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?