OWENS v. GEORGIA DIAGNOSTIC AND CLASSIFICATION PRISON et al
Plaintiff: |
JACKIE DEWAYNE OWENS |
Defendant: |
GEORGIA DIAGNOSTIC AND CLASSIFICATION PRISON, JOHN DOE, COCHRAN and CARTER |
Case Number: |
5:2013cv00299 |
Filed: |
August 20, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia |
Office: |
Macon Office |
County: |
Butts |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen Hyles |
Presiding Judge: |
Marc Thomas Treadwell |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 22, 2016 |
Filing
116
ORDER ADOPTING 115 Report and Recommendations and GRANTING 111 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 12/22/2016. (tlh)
|
March 30, 2016 |
Filing
108
ORDER ADOPTING 90 Report and Recommendations and GRANTING 61 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. The Plaintiff's claims against Cochran and Fowlkes are DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/30/2016. (tlh)
|
January 21, 2016 |
Filing
106
ORDER DENYING 98 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. To the extent Plaintiff's motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis can also be construed as a motion for an extension of time to appeal, it is DENIED as moot. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 1/21/2016. (tlh)
|
February 26, 2015 |
Filing
53
ORDER DENYING 52 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court is mindful of the fact that it will be difficult for the Plaintiff to refile any exhibits or declarations should they become relevant at a later time. Thus, the Court DIRECTS the clerk to mail the Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet. If the Plaintiff later believes a specific exhibit or declaration is relevant, he can reference it and the Court will determine whether it should be considered. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 2/26/2015. (tlh)
|
January 13, 2015 |
Filing
50
ORDER denying 46 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 47 Motion to Transfer; denying 48 Motion to Identify Defendants. Ordered by US Magistrate Judge STEPHEN HYLES on 1-13-15 (mpm)
|
January 12, 2015 |
Filing
49
ORDER ADOPTING as modified 40 Report and Recommendations. The Plaintiff's official capacity claims, ADA claim, First Amendment claims, Fifth Amendment claims, Fourteenth Amendment claims, and claims against Defendants Butts, Caldwell, Chatman, Jackson, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, Medical College of Georgia, Morton, and Pitman are DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 1/12/2015. (tlh)
|
June 4, 2014 |
Filing
37
ORDER denying 30 Motion to Clarify; denying 32 Motion for Court order; denying 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 34 Motion for Court order; denying 26 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 13 Motion to Withdraw Document; finding as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by US Magistrate Judge STEPHEN HYLES on 6-4-14 (mpm)
|
November 5, 2013 |
Filing
22
ORDER ADOPTING 8 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 4 Motion for TRO/Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The claims against the GDCP are DISMISSED, and the claims against C.O. John Doe and Inmate John Doe are DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 11/5/2013. (tlh)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?