HINES v. NAZAIRE et al
Plaintiff: |
DEBORAH HINES |
Defendant: |
NAZAIRE and BELINDA DAVIS |
Case Number: |
5:2014cv00147 |
Filed: |
April 15, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia |
Office: |
Macon Office |
County: |
Jones |
Presiding Judge: |
MARC THOMAS TREADWELL |
Presiding Judge: |
CHARLES H WEIGLE |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 3, 2017 |
Filing
108
ORDER DENYING 106 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. If Hines wishes to proceed with her appeal, she must pay the entire $505 appellate filing fee. Because Hines has stated that she cannot pa y the fee immediately, she must pay using the partial payment plan described under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b). Pursuant to § 1915(b), the prison account custodian where Hines is confined shall cause to be remitted to the Clerk of this Court month ly payments of 20% of the preceding months income credited to Hiness account (to the extent the account balance exceeds $10) until the $505 appellate filing fee has been paid in full. Checks should be made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the custodian of the prison in which Plaintiff is incarcerated. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/3/2017. (tlh)
|
December 21, 2016 |
Filing
101
ORDER ADOPTING as modified 97 Report and Recommendations and GRANTING 83 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 12/21/2016. (tlh)
|
June 21, 2016 |
Filing
95
ORDER ADOPTING 90 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 88 Motion for TRO. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 6/21/2016. (tlh)
|
October 26, 2015 |
Filing
67
ORDER DENYING 64 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 10/26/2015. (tlh)
|
August 18, 2015 |
Filing
55
ORDER ADOPTING, except as modified, 42 Report and Recommendations; GRANTING 20 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel; DENYING as moot 39 Motion to Compel; and finding as MOOT 54 Mot ion for summons. Because some of the Plaintiff's claims in her amended complaint are allowed to proceed, it is ORDERED that service be made on Dr. Billy Nichols and Georgia Correctional Healthcare and that they file an answer, or such other re sponse as may be appropriate under Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, 28 U.S.C. § 1915, and the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Defendants are reminded of the duty to avoid unnecessary service expenses and of the possible imposition of expenses for failure to waive service pursuant to Rule 4(d). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 8/18/2015 (tlh)
|
July 30, 2014 |
Filing
11
ORDER ADOPTING 8 Report and Recommendations. Warden Davis is DISMISSED from this action. The Plaintiff is allowed to go forward with her claim against Dr. Nazaire. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 7/30/2014. (tlh)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?