GUMM v. JACOBS et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY DENVER GUMM
Defendant: RICK JACOBS, BRUCE CHAPMAN, RODNEY MCCLOUD and WILLIAM POWELL
Case Number: 5:2015cv00041
Filed: February 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Butts
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Presiding Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER DENYING 264 Motion to Intervene. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/20/2020. (kat)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER DENYING 273 and 275 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; and TERMINATING as moot 274 Motion to Review IFP Request Without Account Certification and Statement. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the custodian of the prison in which the Movant is incarcerated. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 7/12/2019. (kat)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER DENYING 228 Motion to Intervene by Jeffrey Bourassa. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 5/10/2019. (kat)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ***VACATED*** SETTLEMENT ORDER (Final Approval of Class Action Settlement). The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of the Court shall issue a writ of injunction. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 5/6/2019. (kat) Text Modified on 5/6/2019 (kat). Modified on 5/6/2019 (ggs).
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER DENYING 124 Motion to Vacate. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 2/16/2018. (tlh)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER ADOPTING 100 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 80 Daker's Motion to Intervene. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 9/15/2017. (tlh)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ADOPTING as modified 29 Report and Recommendations; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 26 Motion for Leave to File; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 16 Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that service be made on Margaret Washington, June Bishop, Rufus Logan, and Dwayne Williams and that they file an Answer or such other response as may be appropriate under Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, 28 U.S.C. § 1915, and the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/31/2016. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUMM v. JACOBS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY DENVER GUMM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK JACOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODNEY MCCLOUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?