NOLLEY v. NELSON et al
Plaintiff: |
DARNELL NOLLEY |
Defendant: |
CYNTHIA NELSON, GREGORY MCLAUGHLIN, DON BLAKELY, TREVONZA BOBBITT, SAMUEL RIDLEY, STEPHEN BOSTICK and D GILES |
Case Number: |
5:2015cv00075 |
Filed: |
March 9, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia |
Office: |
Macon Office |
County: |
Macon |
Presiding Judge: |
STEPHEN HYLES |
Presiding Judge: |
C ASHLEY ROYAL |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 5, 2017 |
Filing
161
ORDER denying 156 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the custodian of the prison in which Plaintiff is incarcerated. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 12/5/2017 (lap)
|
September 21, 2017 |
Filing
142
ORDER adopting 132 Report and Recommendations; granting 81 Motion to Amend Complaint; granting 86 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing 136 Motion to Vacate. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter Judgment in favor of Defendants. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 9/21/2017 (lap)
|
August 23, 2017 |
Filing
132
ORDER denying 83 Motion to Relate; granting 92 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying 97 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply; denying 98 Motion for Documents at Government Expense; denying 102 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 115 Motion to Correct Certain Filings. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 86 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8/23/2017 (efw)
|
July 18, 2017 |
Filing
128
ORDER denying 117 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 117 Motion to Vacate ; denying 120 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 7/18/2017 (lap)
|
May 10, 2017 |
Filing
114
ORDER denying 109 Motion to Intervene. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 5/10/2017 (efw)
|
August 16, 2016 |
Filing
78
ORDER DENYING 66 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; DENYING 72 Motion for Extension of Time; DENYING 75 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; and GRANTING 71 Motion for Copies. The CLERK is DIRECTED to provide Plaintiff with copies of the requested documents and a copy of the Docket free of charge. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 8/16/2016. (tlh)
|
June 24, 2016 |
Filing
65
ORDER GRANTING 58 Motion for Reconsideration to properly consider Plaintiff's Objections at this time. However, after conducting a de novo review of the matters raised therein, the Court still adopts the findings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, as noted in its previous 54 Order, the Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIESINPART Defendants Gregory McLaughlin, Tevonza Bobbitt,Samuel Ridley, Stephen Bostick, and Dorian Giless 21 Moti on to Dismiss.Plaintiff's claims against Defendant McLaughlin in his official capacity and Plaintiff's claims for compensatory and punitive damages are DISMISSED; but Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment claims against Defendants in their individual capacities for nominal damages may go forward. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs [19, 35, 46, 48] Motions to Supplement, and DENIES [31-1 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Thus, the 50 Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge is hereby ADOPTED and MADE THE ORDER OFTHE COURT. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 6/24/2016. (tlh)
|
March 29, 2016 |
Filing
54
ORDER adopting 50 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss Complaint; denying 35 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 46 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 48 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 19 Motion to Amend/Correct. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 3/29/16 (lap)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?