MOODY v. SHOULTS et al
Plaintiff: |
JEREMY MOODY |
Defendant: |
SHOULTS, CRYSTAL HUGHES WHITERS and LASHWAND JORDAN |
Case Number: |
5:2015cv00325 |
Filed: |
August 24, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia |
Office: |
Macon Office |
County: |
Butts |
Presiding Judge: |
MARC THOMAS TREADWELL |
Presiding Judge: |
CHARLES H WEIGLE |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 2, 2018 |
Filing
84
ORDER GRANTING Shoultes's motion to exclude Sealeys testimony. Sealey will not be permitted to testify at trial. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 5/2/2018. (tlh)
|
February 16, 2018 |
Filing
74
ORDER ADOPTING 72 Report and Recommendations; and GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 61 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff is permitted to pursue his Eighth Amendment claims for nominal damages, but not for compensatory or punitive damages. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 2/16/2018. (tlh)
|
June 20, 2017 |
Filing
57
ORDER ADOPTING 53 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 43 Defendant Soultes's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Whiters and Jordan are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Pla intiff's 54 motion for leave to amend is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part for undue delay and futility, so that the Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend his claims against Defendants Whiters and Jordan and his already-dismissed claims against Defendant Shoultes is denied, but his motion for leave to amend his complaint as to his surviving claims against Defendant Shoultes is granted. Further, the Plaintiff's 54 motion for injunctive relief is DENIED. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 6/20/2017. (tlh)
|
March 9, 2017 |
Filing
50
ORDER: For the reasons stated in the Magistrate Judge's 33 Report and Recommendation, 19 Shoultes's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Plaint iff's claims against Shoultes for deliberate indifference to medical needs and injunctive relief and his claims against Shoultes in her official capacity are accordingly DISMISSED without prejudice. To the extent that the Plaintiff moves for injunctive relief, his motion is DENIED. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/9/2017. (tlh)
|
February 15, 2017 |
Filing
47
ORDER ADOPTING in part and REJECTING in part 33 Report and Recommendations. The Court DECLINES to dismiss the Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Shoultes for failure to comply with Court orders and failu re to prosecute. The Court orders the Plaintiff to REDRAFT his complaint within 14 days if he believes he can allege facts sufficient to cure the deficiencies in his complaint. The Plaintiff's 23 motion for reconsideration of the 23 Magistrate Judges order denying the Plaintiffs 13 motion to appoint counsel is DENIED. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 2/15/2017. (tlh)
|
August 19, 2016 |
Filing
38
ORDER REJECTING 10 Report and Recommendations and GRANTING 32 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Plaintiff has 21 days from the date of this order to amend his complaint. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail the Plaintiff a copy of his complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 8/19/2016. (tlh)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?