MOSS v. KNOX et al
Plaintiff: |
JEFFREY EDWARD MOSS |
Defendant: |
ALLEN RUSTY KNOX, DOUGLAS P SMITH, ADAM BLANKS, RICHARD MILAN and ALLEN HENDERSON |
Case Number: |
5:2016cv00010 |
Filed: |
January 7, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia |
Office: |
Macon Office |
County: |
Monroe |
Presiding Judge: |
STEPHEN HYLES |
Presiding Judge: |
MARC THOMAS TREADWELL |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 8, 2018 |
Filing
134
ORDER ADOPTING 129 Report and Recommendations; GRANTING 73 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING 103 Motion for Summary Judgment; and DENYING 126 Motion to Amend/Correct. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/8/2018. (tlh)
|
November 6, 2017 |
Filing
124
ORDER DENYING 89 Motion for Reconsideration of this Court's 84 Order denying 81 Motion to Amend. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 11/6/2017. (tlh)
|
September 21, 2017 |
Filing
117
ORDER ADOPTING 94 Report and Recommendations concerning 78 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and TRO. The Court DENIED 78 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and TRO. The Court does not ma ke a ruling concerning the Magistrate Judges recommendation to grant 73 Defendant Prescott's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies. Instead, the Court REFERS the new allegations in the Plaintiff's Objection concerning his efforts to exhaust his administrative remedies, which the Court construes as a motion to amend or supplement the record, to the Magistrate Judge for consideration. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 9/21/2017. (tlh)
|
April 20, 2017 |
Filing
84
ORDER ADOPTNG 57 Report and Recommendations; DENYING 72 , 77 , 80 , and 81 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Plaintiff's denial of dental care claim against Defendant Prescott and his malicious prosecuti on claims against Defendants Blanks and Henderson regarding the illegal weapons and child exploitation charges are allowed to proceed for further factual development. The Plaintiff's remaining claims against Defendants Blanks, Henderson, and Prescott as well as his claims against all other defendants are DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/20/2017. (tlh)
|
May 4, 2016 |
Filing
32
ORDER ADOPTING 22 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 5/4/2016. (tlh)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?