FREEMAN v. HOTEL EQUITIES INC

Plaintiff: MARCUS M FREEMAN
Defendant: HOTEL EQUITIES INC
Case Number: 5:2016cv00250
Filed: June 28, 2016
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Macon Office
County: Bibb
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 15 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 11/6/2017. (tlh)
August 23, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's hostile work environment claim is DISMISSED without prejudice. Because the Plaintiff has sufficiently alleged an ADEA retaliation claim, the Court ORDERS that the United States Marshal serve a copy of the complaint and supplemental complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 8/23/2016. (tlh)
July 28, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel and GRANTING 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If the Plaintiff wishes to assert a hostile work environment claim in addition to his retaliation claim, the Plaintiff is ORDERED to recast his complaint within 30 days of the entry of this Order to sufficiently allege such a claim. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 7/28/2016. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FREEMAN v. HOTEL EQUITIES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS M FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOTEL EQUITIES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?