ROCKEMORE v. CITY OF THOMASTON
Plaintiff: KELSEY ROCKEMORE
Defendant: CITY OF THOMASTON and PHILLIP TOBIN
Case Number: 5:2016cv00325
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Upson
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Amended Motion; granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Section 1983 claims against Officer Tobin for unlawful detent ion, unlawful search, and false arrest, as well as his state-law claim against Officer Tobin for battery, will proceed to trial during the Court's August 2019 trial term. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the City of Thomaston as a party. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 5/21/2019. (tlw)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and reserving ruling on 32 Amended Motion; granting in part and reserving ruling on 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's federal claims for malicious prosecution under Sect ion 1983, conspiracy under Section 1985, and failure to prevent under Section 1986 are DISMISSED. Plaintiff's state-law claims against the City are also DISMISSED.The Court RESERVES RULING on Plaintiff's Section 1983 claims against Officer Tobin for false arrest, unlawful search, and excessive force; Plaintiff's Section 1983 Monell liability claims against the City; and Plaintiff's state-law claims against Officer Tobin for battery and intentional infliction of emotional dist ress. These claims are hereby STAYED pending the completion of Plaintiff's state court criminal proceedings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close this action. Plaintiff may file a motion to reopen this action within 30 days after the conclusion of his state criminal proceeding. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 8/30/2018. (tlw)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 6 Motion to Seal Document; granting 6 Motion for Protective Order. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to refile an Amended Summons with Defendant Tobins home address redacted Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 12/22/16 (lap)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROCKEMORE v. CITY OF THOMASTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELSEY ROCKEMORE
Represented By: JORDAN JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF THOMASTON
Represented By: WILLIAM T MITCHELL
Represented By: Karen Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP TOBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?