STRICKLAND et al v. DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS
Plaintiff: PATRICIA STRICKLAND and ANDRA STRICKLAND
Defendant: DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS, BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER LEVINE AND BLOCK LLP, WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE and JOHN/JANE DOES
Case Number: 5:2018cv00003
Filed: January 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Butts
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 34 Motion to Vacate and Set Aside Judgment. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 11/13/2018. (chc)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER to dismiss case. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 5/23/2018. (chc)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying 15 Motion for Reconsideration and Motion for Recusal; denying 16 Motion for Sanctions. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 2/5/2018 (lap)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRICKLAND et al v. DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA STRICKLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRA STRICKLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS
Represented By: Jennifer Saffold Collins
Represented By: ARTHUR ALLEN EBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER LEVINE AND BLOCK LLP
Represented By: John Taylor Weitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE
Represented By: Jennifer Saffold Collins
Represented By: ARTHUR ALLEN EBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?