WESTON v. HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC et al

Plaintiff: MATTHEW W WESTON
Defendant: HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL, LLC, SAMEERA TILLMAN and HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00124
Filed: April 16, 2018
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Macon Office
County: Bibb
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2018 21 JOINT MOTION for Approval of Settlement by MATTHEW W WESTON filed by TYLER BRAND KASPERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order)(KASPERS, TYLER)
August 10, 2018 20 Featured Case ORDER re #19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by MATTHEW W WESTON. The Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk to dismiss the claims against individual defendant Sameera Tillman from this action,without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 8/10/2018. (tlh)
August 2, 2018 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MATTHEW W WESTON (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(KASPERS, TYLER)
July 24, 2018 18 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney AMBER H REED terminated. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 07/24/2018. (aj)
July 19, 2018 17 FIRST MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC filed by AMBER H REED.(REED, AMBER)
June 25, 2018 16 RESPONSE filed by MATTHEW W WESTON re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #4 Amended Complaint : (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Termination email)(KASPERS, TYLER)
June 22, 2018 15 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 12/18/2018. Dispositive motions due by 1/17/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 6/22/2018. (tlh)
June 22, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #14 Notice (Other) filed by HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC ); The Proposed Order must be submitted by e-mail to macon.ecf@gamd.uscourts.gov in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Do not convert the Proposed Order to PDF. (vs)
June 21, 2018 14 NOTICE Notice of Joint Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order by HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC (SAUNDERS, AMBER)
June 4, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #12 Motion for Leave to File filed by HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC, SAMEERA TILLMAN ); Document it is not signed. Please sign the document and refile. (vs)
June 3, 2018 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #4 Amended Complaint : by HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC, SAMEERA TILLMAN filed by AMBER C SAUNDERS.(SAUNDERS, AMBER)
June 3, 2018 12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer by HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC, SAMEERA TILLMAN filed by AMBER C SAUNDERS.(SAUNDERS, AMBER)
May 22, 2018 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC (SAUNDERS, AMBER)
May 22, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC ); Document must be refiled using correct event Corporate Disclosure Statement. This event is located under Civil - Other Filings - Other Documents. (vs)
May 22, 2018 10 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 6/21/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 5/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Required Form) (tlh)
May 22, 2018 9 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC with Jury Demand. Related document: #4 Amended Complaint filed by MATTHEW W WESTON.(SAUNDERS, AMBER)
May 21, 2018 8 Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by AMBER C SAUNDERS (nop)
May 17, 2018 7 MOTION Conditional Certification and Issuance of Notice by MATTHEW W WESTON filed by TYLER BRAND KASPERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Notice, #2 Exhibit Proposed Consent Form, #3 Exhibit Weston Declaration, #4 Exhibit HELP job postings)(KASPERS, TYLER)
May 14, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC, SAMEERA TILLMAN ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement - Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately as to Highway Emergency Local Patrol LLC. (vs)
May 11, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AMBER C SAUNDERS - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (vs)
May 10, 2018 6 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC, SAMEERA TILLMAN with Jury Demand. Related document: #4 Amended Complaint filed by MATTHEW W WESTON.(REED, AMBER)
May 10, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #5 Answer to Complaint filed by HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC, SAMEERA TILLMAN ); The Attorney who filed Document #5 is not the same Attorney the signed the Answer. (vs)
May 9, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint by HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC, SAMEERA TILLMAN with Jury Demand.(REED, AMBER)Attorney AMBER H REED added to party HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC(pty:dft), Attorney AMBER H REED added to party SAMEERA TILLMAN(pty:dft)
April 19, 2018 4 AMENDED #1 Complaint (IFP), against HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC, SAMEERA TILLMAN by MATTHEW W WESTON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form, #2 Exhibit Damages Calculation Table)(KASPERS, TYLER)
April 17, 2018 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to MATTHEW W WESTON (vs)
April 17, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL, LLC, SAMEERA TILLMAN. (Attachments: #1 Summons Sameera Tillman)(vs)
April 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL, LLC, SAMEERA TILLMAN filed by MATTHEW W WESTON. Filing Fee Paid: Receipt Number 113G-2853749 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form, #2 Exhibit Demand Calculation Table, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Highway Emergency Local Patrol, LLC, #5 Summons Tillman)(Kaspers, Tyler) Modified on 4/17/2018 to add Receipt Number (vs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESTON v. HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMEERA TILLMAN
Represented By: AMBER C SAUNDERS
Represented By: AMBER H REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHWAY EMERGENCY LOCAL PATROL LLC
Represented By: AMBER C SAUNDERS
Represented By: AMBER H REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW W WESTON
Represented By: TYLER BRAND KASPERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?