BRIGHT v. HOWELL et al
Plaintiff: ROY BOONE BRIGHT
Defendant: RUSSELL PHOPHAM, DONNA WILLIAMS, KIMBERLY CALDWELL and MIKE HOWELL
Case Number: 5:2018cv00355
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY to Response filed by KIMBERLY CALDWELL, MIKE HOWELL re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue, Improper Service, and Younger Abstention (JACKSON, WESLEY)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by ROY BOONE BRIGHT re #5 Order for Response, Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint, RESPONSE filed by ROY BOONE BRIGHT re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue, Improper Service, and Younger Abstention (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Search Warrant Application and Search Warrant, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from Sheriff Tim Pounds, #3 Exhibit C - Traffic Citation, #4 Exhibit D - Arrest Warrant and Bond Denial, #5 Exhibit E - Transcript excerpts and Reports of Mr. Howell, #6 Exhibit G - Indictment) ***NOTE: There was no Exhibit "F" enclosed.(ggs)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE filed by ROY BOONE BRIGHT re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue, Improper Service, and Younger Abstention (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support (SUPPLEMENTAL) filed by KIMBERLY CALDWELL, MIKE HOWELL re: #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue, Improper Service, and Younger Abstention (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's State Court Filed Motion for Immediate Habeas Hearing, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's State Court Filed Motion to Change Monetary Relief Sought to Immediate Release)(JACKSON, WESLEY) Modified on 10/17/2018 to edit docket text. (ggs).
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Response re: #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue, Improper Service, and Younger Abstention; ORDER to Amend Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file a brief in opposition to a motion to dismiss, a final judgment may be rendered against him if otherwise appropriate under law. Any amendment, response brief, affidavits and/or other documents must be filed WITHIN 21 DAYS of receipt of this Order. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B); M.D.Ga. Civ. R. 7.2. Thereafter, the Court will consider the Defendants Motion to Dismiss and any opposition to the same filed by Plaintiff and will issue its ruling. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 10/16/2018. (ggs)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue, Improper Service, and Younger Abstention by KIMBERLY CALDWELL, MIKE HOWELL filed by WESLEY C JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A--Search Warrant, #3 Exhibit B--Arrest Warrant, #4 Exhibit C--Indictment, #5 Exhibit D--Order Granting New Trial, #6 Exhibit E--Order Concerning Notices of Appeal, #7 Exhibit F--Notice of E-Filing Index). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(JACKSON, WESLEY)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ROY BOONE BRIGHT (ggs)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles H. Weigle issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against ROY BOONE BRIGHT Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2985971, $400 filed by KIMBERLY CALDWELL, MIKE HOWELL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Non-Service (M. Howell), #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Non-Service (K. Caldwell), #4 Exhibit D - Second Affidavit of Non-Service (M. Howell), #5 Exhibit E - Second Affidavit of Non-Service (K. Caldwell), #6 Exhibit F - Superior Court Pleadings, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(CHOY, SUN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRIGHT v. HOWELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSSELL PHOPHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY CALDWELL
Represented By: SUN S CHOY
Represented By: WESLEY C JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE HOWELL
Represented By: SUN S CHOY
Represented By: WESLEY C JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROY BOONE BRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?