HOSPITAL AUTHORITY OF BLECKLEY COUNTY v. AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL AUTHORITY OF BLECKLEY COUNTY
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, PURDUE PHARMA LP, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY INC, ALLERGAN PLC, CEPHALON INC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, PURDUE PHARMA INC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, NORAMCO INC, CARDINAL HEALTH INC, ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC and WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00366
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 Acknowledgment of Electronic Case Transfer Out by District of Northern District of Ohio; Case Number 1:18-op-46170. (ggs)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring proceedings Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (ggs)
October 23, 2018 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern District of Ohio. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 11/6/2018. (ggs)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 Jurisdictional Statement by HOSPITAL AUTHORITY OF BLECKLEY COUNTY (Marigliano, Jonathan)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOSPITAL AUTHORITY OF BLECKLEY COUNTY (Marigliano, Jonathan)
October 11, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by HOSPITAL AUTHORITY OF BLECKLEY COUNTY ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (ggs)
October 9, 2018 Case REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III. US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL no longer assigned to the case. (ggs)
October 5, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by HOSPITAL AUTHORITY OF BLECKLEY COUNTY ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (ggs)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to HOSPITAL AUTHORITY OF BLECKLEY COUNTY (ggs)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2991021, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marigliano, Jonathan) Modified on 10/4/2018 to remove duplicate text. (ggs).
October 4, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL DANIEL J PRIETO - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ggs)
October 4, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by HOSPITAL AUTHORITY OF BLECKLEY COUNTY d/b/a BLECKLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ); Notice to Counsel - MATTHEW S. COLES Your contact information (address and telephone number) in CM/ECF is not current. Please login as soon as possible and update your user account via Utilities - Your Account. (ggs)
October 4, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by HOSPITAL AUTHORITY OF BLECKLEY COUNTY d/b/a BLECKLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. Additionally, some party names were added with a d/b/a, n/k/a and f/k/a as part of their name. Do not add d/b/a, etc. as part of the party name, but instead add as an alias. The alias is then addressed as part of the party text. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE - corrections made by case manager. (ggs)
October 4, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by HOSPITAL AUTHORITY OF BLECKLEY COUNTY ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. ***Please disregard the previous Notice of Deficiency filed earlier today (wrong notice selected during docketing. Please follow the instructions in this notice.*** (ggs)
October 4, 2018 ***DISREGARD - WRONG NOTICE *** Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by HOSPITAL AUTHORITY OF BLECKLEY COUNTY ); Document must be refiled to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. (ggs) Modified on 10/5/2018 (ggs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOSPITAL AUTHORITY OF BLECKLEY COUNTY v. AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEPHALON INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON LABORATORIES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORAMCO INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL HEALTH INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL AUTHORITY OF BLECKLEY COUNTY
Represented By: Jonathan Marigliano
Represented By: DANIEL J PRIETO
Represented By: Matthew S Coles
Represented By: WILLIAM TODD HARVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?