NAPIER et al v. ROCKY COTTOM TIMBER et al
Plaintiff: KENDRICK DUMES, FREDRICK NAPIER and CHRIS NAPIER
Defendant: WILLIAM ELDER PARKER, IV and ROCKY BOTTOM TIMBER COMPANY LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00422
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT of Dismissal. (vs)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 This is a text only entry; no document issued. The Plaintiff moved to dismiss his complaint and the Court construed Defendants' response as a stipulation of dismissal under FRCP 41(a)(1). Accordingly, the Court grants Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss #7 and ORDERS the Clerk to close the case. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 01/03/2019 (TES)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by WILLIAM ELDER PARKER, IV, ROCKY BOTTOM TIMBER COMPANY LLC re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Above-Styled Case (GREENE, STEVEN)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILLIAM ELDER PARKER, IV, ROCKY BOTTOM TIMBER COMPANY LLC (GREENE, STEVEN)
January 3, 2019 Second Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Answer to Complaint filed by WILLIAM ELDER PARKER, IV, ROCKY BOTTOM TIMBER COMPANY LLC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (vs)
January 2, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Answer to Complaint filed by WILLIAM ELDER PARKER, IV, ROCKY BOTTOM TIMBER COMPANY LLC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (vs)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Above-Styled Case by KENDRICK DUMES, CHRIS NAPIER, FREDRICK NAPIER filed by MCNEILL STOKES.(STOKES, MCNEILL)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by WILLIAM ELDER PARKER, IV, ROCKY BOTTOM TIMBER COMPANY LLC.(GREENE, STEVEN)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by WILLIAM ELDER PARKER, IV, ROCKY BOTTOM TIMBER COMPANY LLC. (GREENE, STEVEN)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FREDRICK NAPIER, KENDRICK DUMES, CHRIS NAPIER as to KENDRICK DUMES, CHRIS NAPIER (STOKES, MCNEILL)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WILLIAM ELDER PARKER, IV, ROCKY BOTTOM TIMBER. (Attachments: #1 Summons Rocky Bottom Timber Company LLC)(vs)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to KENDRICK DUMES, CHRIS NAPIER, FREDRICK NAPIER (vs)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3019208, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons William Parker Summons, #3 Summons Rocky Bottom Summons)(STOKES, MCNEILL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NAPIER et al v. ROCKY COTTOM TIMBER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM ELDER PARKER, IV
Represented By: STEVEN SOMERS GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKY BOTTOM TIMBER COMPANY LLC
Represented By: STEVEN SOMERS GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENDRICK DUMES
Represented By: MCNEILL STOKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDRICK NAPIER
Represented By: MCNEILL STOKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS NAPIER
Represented By: MCNEILL STOKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?