JOHNSON v. WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE NA et al
Plaintiff: DALLAS CADWIN JOHNSON
Defendant: DOES 1 to 100 and WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE NA
Case Number: 5:2019cv00021
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Pending Legal Action (Lis Pendens) by DALLAS CADWIN JOHNSON (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pending Legal Action by DALLAS CADWIN JOHNSON (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by DALLAS CADWIN JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ggs)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to DALLAS CADWIN JOHNSON (ggs)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by DALLAS CADWIN JOHNSON.(ggs)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants,filed by DALLAS CADWIN JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ggs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2019: #2 Waiver of Service (signed by plaintiff)) (ggs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALLAS CADWIN JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?