PITTS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Plaintiff: JAMES WALTER PITTS
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Undetermined: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 5:2019cv00064
Filed: March 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (vs)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (vs)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Attorney General, #2 USM 285 Office of the Regional Chief of Counsel)(vs)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons Office of the Regional Chief Counsel)(vs)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Attorney General, #2 USM 285 Office of the Regional Chief of Counsel)(vs)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JAMES WALTER PITTS (vs)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H. WEIGLE on 3/4/19. (aob)
March 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES WALTER PITTS filed by JOEL GRIST. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summonses). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(GRIST, JOEL)
March 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION filed by JAMES WALTER PITTS (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(GRIST, JOEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PITTS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES WALTER PITTS
Represented By: JOEL GRIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?