ALEXANDER v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: GERMAINE M ALEXANDER
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Undetermined: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 5:2019cv00071
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Civil Process Clerk and Regional Chief Counsel) (ggs)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, #2 USM 285 Attorney General)(vs)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. ATTORNEY, U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL. (ggs)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ggs)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H. WEIGLE on 3/6/19. (aob)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to GERMAINE M ALEXANDER (ggs)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles H. Weigle issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs)
March 5, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #2 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, filed by GERMAINE M ALEXANDER ); Wrong event used, the correct event is "MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PUPERIS". The event selected is for use for IFP motions for appeals to the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals. NO NEED TO REFILE - docket entry will be corrected by case manager. (ggs)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed forma pauperis by GERMAINE M. ALEXANDER filed by EMMETT L GOODMAN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of in forma pauperis, #2 Proposed Order Granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Summons on the Attorney General, #4 Summons on the Assistant US Attorney, #5 Summons on the Commissioner of Social Security, #6 USM 285 on the Attorney General, #7 USM 285 on the Assistant US Attorney, #8 USM 285 on the Commissioner of Social Security). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(GOODMAN, EMMETT) Modified on 3/5/2019 to correct event. (ggs).
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by GERMAINE M. ALEXANDER (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GOODMAN, EMMETT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALEXANDER v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERMAINE M ALEXANDER
Represented By: DANIEL LEWIS WILDER
Represented By: EMMETT L GOODMAN, JR
Represented By: MEGAN ASHLEY GLIMMERVEEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?