MERILIEN v. SINGLETON et al
Plaintiff: JEAN JOCELYN MERILIEN
Defendant: WARDEN ARTIS SINGLETON, CAMPBELL, DOCTOR LAWSON, DEPUTY WARDEN STEVE EADY, FORMER WARDEN SHAWN EMMON, UNIT MANAGER TALITHA BRYANT, CHAPLAIN TAYLOR, COUNSELOR CHILI, CAPTAIN MELISSA LAWSON, UNIT MANAGER TYRONE ROZIER and UNIT MANAGER MICHAEL WILLIAMS
Case Number: 5:2019cv00124
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Referring Judge: CHARLES H WEIGLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing proposed summons by JEAN JOCELYN MERILIEN (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 RECAST #1 Complaint, against TALITHA BRYANT, CAMPBELL, CHILI, STEVE EADY, SHAWN EMMON, LAWSON, MELISSA LAWSON, TYRONE ROZIER, ARTIS SINGLETON, TAYLOR, MICHAEL WILLIAMS by JEAN JOCELYN MERILIEN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter to Warden Emmons dated 05/16/2018, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter to Mr. Singleton dated 08/15/2018, #3 Exhibit 3 - Offender Grievance Form dated 12/04/2018, #4 Exhibit 4 - Appeal Grievance Number: 283545, #5 Exhibit 5 - Warden's/Superintendent's Grievance Response, #6 Exhibit 6 - Sworn Affidavit of Testimony, #7 Envelope)(vs)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, Filed by JEAN JOCELYN MERILIEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Counselor Request Form dated 05/27/2019, #2 Exhibit B - Counselor Request Form dated 05/21/2019, #3 Exhibit C - Counselor Request Form dated 06/06/2019, #4 Exhibit D - Counselor Request Form dated 05/16/2019, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Jean Jocelyn Merilien, #6 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(vs)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Recast Complaint. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to forward a 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form together with a copy of this Order (both showing the civil action number) to Plaintiff. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 06/21/2019. (vs)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, Filed by JEAN JOCELYN MERILIEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter dated 05/06/2018 to Mr. Shawn Emmons from Jean J. Merilien, #2 Exhibit B - Letter dated 08/15/2018 to Warden Singleton from Jean J. Merilien, #3 Exhibit C - Emergency Offender Grievance Form, #4 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(vs)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JEAN JOCELYN MERILIEN (vs)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by JEAN JOCELYN MERILIEN. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(vs)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TALITHA BRYANT, CAMPBELL, CHILI, STEVE EADY, SHAWN EMMON, LAWSON, MELISSA LAWSON, TYRONE ROZIER, ARTIS SINGLETON, TAYLOR, MICHAEL WILLIAMS,filed by JEAN JOCELYN MERILIEN. (Attachments: #1 Witness Statement (This document is unable to be legibly scanned and the original shall be maintained on the shelf in the clerks office"), #2 Envelope)(vs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERILIEN v. SINGLETON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN ARTIS SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTOR LAWSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY WARDEN STEVE EADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORMER WARDEN SHAWN EMMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIT MANAGER TALITHA BRYANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAPLAIN TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNSELOR CHILI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN MELISSA LAWSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIT MANAGER TYRONE ROZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIT MANAGER MICHAEL WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN JOCELYN MERILIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?