WRIGHT v. YOUMANS et al

Plaintiff: KATHERINE WRIGHT
Defendant: YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY, ROBINS FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION and GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR
Case Number: 5:2019cv00142
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal by KATHERINE WRIGHT as to GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificat of Service)(DIVIS, ROBERT)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KATHERINE WRIGHT re #17 Response to Motion, (DIVIS, ROBERT)
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by KATHERINE WRIGHT re #12 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's ante litem demand, #2 Exhibit Defendants' response to Plaintiff's ante litem demand, #3 Exhibit Youmans Chevrolet Annual Registration)(DIVIS, ROBERT)
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/5/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 06/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(chc)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Set Aside Default. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 05/29/2019. (chc)
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY (WELSH, STEPHEN)
May 28, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #13 Answer to Complaint filed by YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY, GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (vs)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Arbitration Agreement)(WELSH, STEPHEN)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Set Aside Default by GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY filed by STEPHEN M WELSH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of George E. Youmans, Jr., #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Arbitration Agreement, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default)(WELSH, STEPHEN)
May 24, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #11 Answer to Complaint filed by YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY, GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, #10 Motion to Set Aside Default filed by YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY, GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. (vs)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 ***Document refiled at #13 *** ANSWER to Complaint by GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement)(WELSH, STEPHEN) Modified on 5/28/2019 to add docket text(vs).
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 ***Motion refiled at #12 *** MOTION to Set Aside Default by GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY filed by STEPHEN M WELSH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Affidavit of George E. Youmans, Jr., #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Arbitration Agreement)(WELSH, STEPHEN) Modified on 5/28/2019 (to add docket text (vs).
May 21, 2019 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY - Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment within 21 days. The motion for default judgment shall state whether a hearing is necessary to determine damages, and if a hearing is not necessary, the motion shall include all evidence supporting the damages sought in the motion and a proposed order granting the motion. Failure to comply with this notice may result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. (vs)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR, YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support of Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Certificate of Service Certificat of Service, motion for clerk's entry of default and affidavit in support of motion for clerk's entry of default)(DIVIS, ROBERT)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KATHERINE WRIGHT re #7 Stipulation of Dismissal (DIVIS, ROBERT)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal by KATHERINE WRIGHT as to ROBINS FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION (DIVIS, ROBERT)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KATHERINE WRIGHT (DIVIS, ROBERT)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KATHERINE WRIGHT as to All Parties. (DIVIS, ROBERT)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY. (ans)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to KATHERINE WRIGHT (ans)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Youmans Chevrolet, #2 Summons Robins Financial Credit Union)(ans) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/18/2019) (ans).
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by KATHERINE WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Chevrolet CPO Website, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - GM CPO Webstie, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Suburban Ads, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - First Buyer's Order, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Gap Waiver, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Second Buyer's Order, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Receipt for Battery, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Text Messages May 31, 2018, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - NOAA Rain Data, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J - Invoice for Water Damage Repair, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K - Text Messages June 15, 2018, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L - Receipt for rear hatch service, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M - CPO-related documents, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N - Plaintiff's FBPA demand, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O - Youmans Reply to FBPA Demand, #16 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Summons Youmans Chevrolet Summons, #18 Summons Robins Financial Summons, #19 Summons George Youmans Summons)(DIVIS, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT v. YOUMANS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YOUMANS CHEVROLET COMPANY
Represented By: STEPHEN M WELSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBINS FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE E YOUMANS, JR
Represented By: STEPHEN M WELSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERINE WRIGHT
Represented By: ROBERT ANDREW DIVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?