VINSON v. CITY OF FORT VALLEY GEORGIA et al

Plaintiff: KARIN D VINSON
Defendant: BARBARA WILLIAMS, CITY OF FORT VALLEY GEORGIA, BRYANT JUANITA and JUANITA BRYANT
Case Number: 5:2019cv00195
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/19/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(kat)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BRENTON S BEAN on behalf of All Defendants Attorney BRENTON S BEAN added to party JUANITA BRYANT(pty:dft), Attorney BRENTON S BEAN added to party CITY OF FORT VALLEY GEORGIA(pty:dft), Attorney BRENTON S BEAN added to party BARBARA WILLIAMS(pty:dft) (BEAN, BRENTON)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by BARBARA WILLIAMS.(BOUGHEY, TIMOTHY)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by CITY OF FORT VALLEY GEORGIA.(BOUGHEY, TIMOTHY)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by JUANITA BRYANT.(BOUGHEY, TIMOTHY)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint as to All Defendants. The Defendants have through and including July 16, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 7/9/2019. (kat)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JUANITA BRYANT, CITY OF FORT VALLEY GEORGIA, BARBARA WILLIAMS filed by TIMOTHY MICHAEL BOUGHEY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(BOUGHEY, TIMOTHY)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KARIN D VINSON as to JUANITA BRYANT, CITY OF FORT VALLEY GEORGIA, BARBARA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Summons- City of Fort Valley, GA, #2 Exhibit Executed Summons- Barbara Williams, #3 Exhibit Executed Summons- Bryant)(KASPERS, TYLER)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by KARIN D VINSON (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KASPERS, TYLER) Modified on 5/24/2019 Exhibit not re-filed. Exhibits still located at #1 Complaint (cma).
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Certificate of Interested Persons by KARIN D VINSON (KASPERS, TYLER)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to KARIN D VINSON (cma)
May 22, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by KARIN D VINSON ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. (cma)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JUANITA BRYANT, CITY OF FORT VALLEY GEORGIA, BARBARA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Barbara Williams, #2 Juanita Bryant)(cma)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 DISREGARD-COMPLAINT against CITY OF FORT VALLEY GEORGIA, BRYANT JUANITA, BARBARA WILLIAMS Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3166221, $400 filed by KARIN D VINSON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ante litem notice, #2 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #3 Exhibit Right to Sue letter, #4 Exhibit Complaint re Barnes, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(KASPERS, TYLER) Modified on 5/24/2019 Re-filed at #5 Complaint (cma).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VINSON v. CITY OF FORT VALLEY GEORGIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARIN D VINSON
Represented By: TYLER BRAND KASPERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA WILLIAMS
Represented By: BRENTON S BEAN
Represented By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL BOUGHEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF FORT VALLEY GEORGIA
Represented By: BRENTON S BEAN
Represented By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL BOUGHEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYANT JUANITA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUANITA BRYANT
Represented By: BRENTON S BEAN
Represented By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL BOUGHEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?