HENDERSON v. DELUCIO et al
Plaintiff: JOHNNY HENDERSON
Defendant: ANDREW L SCOTT, PEYTON T DELUCIO and GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00224
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Second Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): Notice of Deficiency ); Document must be re-filed using correct event - Motion to Withdraw as Attorney(vs)
July 26, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #8 Notice (Other) filed by PEYTON T DELUCIO, ANDREW L SCOTT ); Document must be re-filed using correct event - Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (vs)
July 26, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Notice (Other) filed by JOHNNY HENDERSON ); Pursuant to Local Rule 5.1 Discovery is not filed in the Middle District of Georgia. (vs)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Substitution of Counsel by PEYTON T DELUCIO, ANDREW L SCOTT (PARKER, LEAH)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Notice of Deposition by JOHNNY HENDERSON (DOZIER, J W)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 1/6/2020. Dispositive motions due by 2/4/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 7/10/2019. (chc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY INC. for GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (MILLER, WALLACE)
June 17, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by PEYTON T DELUCIO ); In the future, a Notice of Attorney Appearance must be filed by each attorney individually. No need to re-file. (ans)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by DAVID N NELSON on behalf of PEYTON T DELUCIO Attorney DAVID N NELSON added to party PEYTON T DELUCIO(pty:dft) (NELSON, DAVID)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/11/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 06/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(chc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to PEYTON T DELUCIO, ANDREW L SCOTT (vs)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (IFP) against All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer of Geico, #3 Exhibit C - State Court pleadings, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Removal to State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(ALFONSO, ASHLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HENDERSON v. DELUCIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNY HENDERSON
Represented By: J W DAVID DOZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW L SCOTT
Represented By: ELEANOR G JOLLEY
Represented By: ASHLEY D ALFONSO
Represented By: LEAH F PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEYTON T DELUCIO
Represented By: ELEANOR G JOLLEY
Represented By: ASHLEY D ALFONSO
Represented By: JON TRAVIS HALL
Represented By: LEAH F PARKER
Represented By: DAVID N NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: WALLACE MILLER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?