MAY v LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Plaintiff: Ms. Julie Y May
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2019cv00295
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #6 Recast Complaint. Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America has until Monday, September 30, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs #6 Recast Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF, III on 8/28/2019. (ech)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA filed by NIKOLE MARIE CROW. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Consent Order))(CROW, NIKOLE)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA (CROW, NIKOLE)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by NIKOLE MARIE CROW on behalf of LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA Attorney NIKOLE MARIE CROW added to party LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA(pty:dft) (CROW, NIKOLE)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ELIZABETH J BONDURANT on behalf of LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA Attorney ELIZABETH J BONDURANT added to party LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA(pty:dft) (BONDURANT, ELIZABETH)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 RECAST #1 Complaint against All Defendants by JULIE Y MAY (Jones, Ronny)
August 7, 2019 SECOND Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 Recast Complaint/Petition filed by JULIE Y MAY ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. (cma)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JULIE Y MAY as to All Defendants. (Jones, Ronny)
July 25, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 Recast Complaint/Petition filed by JULIE Y MAY ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. Please refer to Page 9 of CM/ECF Administrative Procedures located on our website. (cma)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 RECAST #1 Complaint against LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA by JULIE Y MAY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Jones, Ronny)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (cma)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JULIE Y MAY (cma)
July 24, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by JULIE Y MAY ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed.When re-filing please file the complaint as one document and attach the Civil Cover Sheet as one document and attach the Summons as one document.(cma)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Julie Y May Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3218133, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet and summons)(Jones, Ronny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAY v LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Julie Y May
Represented By: Ronny E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: ELIZABETH J BONDURANT
Represented By: NIKOLE MARIE CROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?